Torgerson v. Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota
Federal Civil Lawsuit South Dakota District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01050
District Judge Charles B. Kornmann, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 12:44 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Big Talk, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 970

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory King +1 605 225 2232 +1 605 225 2497 rking@bantzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
No Logo Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 970

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory King +1 605 225 2232 +1 605 225 2497 rking@bantzlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SARAH VOGEL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/04/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah M. Vogel +1 701 221 2911 +1 701 221 5842 sarahv@svogellaw.com
v.
No Logo Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gunderson, Palmer, Goodsell & Nelson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy K. Koenig akoenig@gpnalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Crisman Palmer +1 605 342 1078 +3429 342 342 9503 cpalmer@gpnalaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (King, Rory) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Status Conference held on 2/2/2009 before Charles B. Kornmann (Court Reporter Cheryl Hook) (SKK) (Entered: 02/05/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 69 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion in Limine; denying 55 Motion in Limine. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on February 3, 2009. (DLC) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER denying 60 motion for leave to file motion for summary judgment. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 2/2/2009. (JCM) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT of Rory King re 66 Response to Motion in Limine on Punitive Damages. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(King, Rory) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              RESPONSE to Motion re 55 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: Regarding Punitive Damages; filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (King, Rory) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE to Motion re 52 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: To strike specific forms of relief sought in the Amended Complaint; Part 2: To preclude the introduction of medical bills and records into evidence; Part 3: To preclude the introduction of additional documents into evidence t filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Rory King, # 2 Affidavit Terri Torgerson, # 3 Affidavit Les Torgerson, # 4 Affidavit Paul Anderson)(King, Rory) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE to Motion re 52 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: To strike specific forms of relief sought in the Amended Complaint; Part 2: To preclude the introduction of medical bills and records into evidence; Part 3: To preclude the introduction of additional documents into evidence t filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Rory King, # 2 Affidavit of Terri Torgerson, # 3 Affidavit Les Torgerson, # 4 Affidavit Paul Anderson)(King, Rory) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    RULE 26 Disclosures by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Amy K. Koenig on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota (Koenig, Amy) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 60 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RULE 26 Disclosures by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RULE 26 Disclosures by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (King, Rory) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re 55 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: Regarding Punitive Damages; filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Terri Torgerson, # 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Terri Torgerson, # 3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Les Torgerson)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 55 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: Regarding Punitive Damages; filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: Regarding Punitive Damages; by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/22/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re 52 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: To strike specific forms of relief sought in the Amended Complaint; Part 2: To preclude the introduction of medical bills and records into evidence; Part 3: To preclude the introduction of additional documents into evidence t filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Response Defendants First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs Initial Disclosures, # 3 Exhibit C - November 20, 2008, correspondence, # 4 Exhibit D - November 21, 2008, correspondence, # 5 Exhibit E - December 1, 2008, email, # 6 Exhibit F - Plaintiffs Responses to Defendants Second Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production, # 7 Exhibit G - January 5, 2009, Affidavit of Jerry Vrchota, # 8 Exhibit H - Deposition of Terri Torgerson, # 9 Exhibit I - December 1, 2008, McGregor Report, # 10 Exhibit J - December 1, 2008, email from Rory King, # 11 Exhibit K - Expert Report of Ralph Brown and Robert Rosacker, # 12 Exhibit L - Expert Report of Paul Thorstenson, # 13 Exhibit M - December 11, 2003, Correspondence, # 14 Exhibit N - February 25, 2004, Listing Agreement, # 15 Exhibit O - January 27, 2005, Closing Documents, # 16 Exhibit P - Arbitrators Decision, # 17 Exhibit Q - Deposition of Greg Ross, # 18 Exhibit R - January 5, 2009, Affidavit of Terri Torgerson, # 19 Exhibit S - January 5, 2009, Affidavit of Les Torgerson, # 20 Exhibit T - Affidavit of Bruce Frink, # 21 Exhibit U - Appraisal, # 22 Exhibit V - February 3, 2003, correspondence from Russell Hawkins)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 52 MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: To strike specific forms of relief sought in the Amended Complaint; Part 2: To preclude the introduction of medical bills and records into evidence; Part 3: To preclude the introduction of additional documents into evidence t filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION IN LIMINE: Part 1: To strike specific forms of relief sought in the Amended Complaint; Part 2: To preclude the introduction of medical bills and records into evidence; Part 3: To preclude the introduction of additional documents into evidence that were requested but not produced in discovery; Part 4: To preclude the submission of the Report produced to reflect the opinions of John McGregor; Part 5: To preclude testimony or evidence regarding purported lost profits from Taco Johns restaurants that were not pursued; Part 6: To preclude testimony or evidence related to the sales of two homes; Part 7: To preclude testimony or evidence related to damages allegedly suffered under a contract with a third party; Part 8: To preclude Plaintiffs from seeking recovery for damages related to harm purportedly suffered by an individual not a party to this litigation Part 9: Requesting the Court (1) instruct the jury that a fiduciary relationship did not exist between Wells Fargo and Torgerson; and (2) striking the second claim for relief from the Amended Complaint Part 10: To strike Plaintiffs fourth and eighth claims for relief by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Bruce Frink re 48 Reply. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT of James Crawford re 48 Reply. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Amy K. Koenig re 48 Reply. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition of Greg Ross)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY to 46 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Motion (Doc. 29) motion to dismiss plaintiffs first claim for relief. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 1/9/2009. (JCM) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavits and Exhibits)(King, Rory) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Terri LaFontaine Torgerson, # 2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C - October 29, 2002, Email from Mike Hahn, # 4 Exhibit D - November 1, 2002, Correspondence from John Hansen, # 5 Exhibit E - November 5, 2002, Correspondence from John Hansen, # 6 Exhibit F - November 13, 2002, Correspondence from John Hansen, # 7 Exhibit G - January 19, 2003, Appraisal, # 8 Exhibit H - February 3, 2003, Correspondence from Russell Hawkins, # 9 Exhibit I - November 19, 2003, Equityline w/ FlexAbility Agreement, # 10 Exhibit J - October 2, 2003, Credit Approval Presentation, # 11 Exhibit K - October 3, 2003, Reversal Approval Form, # 12 Exhibit L - November 26, 2003, Correspondence from Mark Wolff, # 13 Exhibit M - December 1, 2003, Correspondence from Torgerson, # 14 Exhibit N - December 11, 2003, Correspondence from Mark Wolff)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 41 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on December 11, 2008. (DLC) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Protective Order by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re 29 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - June 7, 2000, Loan Review, # 2 Exhibit 2 - September 27, 2000, Regional Credit Committee Minutes, # 3 Exhibit 3 - October 2, 2000, Commercial Security Agreement, # 4 Exhibit 4 - October 23, 2001, Loan Presentation, # 5 Exhibit 5 - August 28, 2002, Promissory Note, # 6 Exhibit 6 - November 19, 2003, EquityLine with Flexibility Account Agreement and Disclosure Statement)(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY to Motion Reponse re 29 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/05/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER denying 33 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 11/26/08. (SKK) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MEMORANDUM LETTER re: extension of deadlines Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 11/26/08. (SKK) (Entered: 11/28/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 11/25/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 29 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson. (King, Rory) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ANSWER to 27 Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota.(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 29 MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Rule 12(b)(6)) filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss (Federal Rule 12(b)(6)) by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/10/2008. Motions due by 12/15/2008. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 10/30/08. (SKK) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc..(King, Rory) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule 12(b)(6) by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint (Amended Complaint) by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota.(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ORDER ALLOWING AMENDED COMPLAINT re 22 Stipulation filed by Big Talk, Inc., Terri Lafontaine Torgerson. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 10/14/08. (SKK) (Entered: 10/14/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Amended Complaint by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Rory) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        FORM 52 REPORT of Parties Planning Meeting. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RULE 26 Disclosures by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (King, Rory) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah Vogel terminated. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 9/3/08. (SKK) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw by Sarah Vogel as Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc. (DLC) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ORDER extending time to answer the complaint, nunc pro tunc, until August 19, 2008; Jury Trial set for 2/9/2009 at 9:00 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 - Room 403 before Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on August 26, 2008. (DLC) (Entered: 08/27/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM LETTER re: case status. Signed by Charles B. Kornmann on 8/22/08. (SKK) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota.(Palmer, J.) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM LETTER re: status Signed by Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 2/2/07. (JAB) (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER TO ADMIT PRO HAC VICE granting 5 Motion for Attorney Sarah Vogel to appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 2/1/06. (JAB) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 10 Stipulation to extend time to answer filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota,. Signed by Judge Charles B. Kornmann on December 30, 2005. (DLC) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION re 1 Complaint to Extend Time for Answer by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by J. Crisman Palmer on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota (Palmer, J.) (Entered: 12/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SHERIFF'S RETURN OF SERVICE by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota on 12/1/05 (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  ADMISSION OF SERVICE Acknowledgement filed by Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE fee paid by Sarah Vogel Law Firm (JAB) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for attorney Sarah Vogel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(JAB) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2005 (JAB, ). (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        PRO HAC VICE Letter sent to Sarah Vogel (DLC) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota. (DLC) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET (DLC) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand. 2 Summons(es) issued - mailed. Receipt Number SDX82 in the amount of $ 250, filed by Terri Lafontaine Torgerson, Big Talk, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) copy of Receipt for filing fee)(DLC) (Entered: 11/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?