Daly v. McFarland
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03461

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 11, 2020 at 5:39 PM EST (11.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Edward Ivey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated Marc Lawrence Godino +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mgodino@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
No Logo Sean Daly, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated Marc Lawrence Godino +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mgodino@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lesley Frank Portnoy +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 LPortnoy@glancylaw.com
v.
No Logo Billy McFarland, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Atkins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Silverman Sclar Shin and Byrne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and as Co-Founder of Fyre Media, Inc Thomas Hunter Herndon +1 212 779 8600 +1 212 779 8858 therndon@silverfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Individually and as Co-Founder of Fyre Media, Inc Ryan Hayden Smith +1 919 809 3807 ryan@nclawyernow.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332oc
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
      FILING ERROR - Summons not linked to corresponding pleading - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Grant Margolin, re: (47 in 1:17-cv-03296-PKC) Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Jung, Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(Feldman, Lori) Modified on 6/6/2018 (laq). (Entered: 06/05/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Grant Margolin, re: (44 in 1:17-cv-03296-PKC) Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Jung, Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Grant Margolin, re: (41 in 1:17-cv-03296-PKC) Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Jung, Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
            CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Tina Wolfson and Bradley K. King, New Attorney: Lori Feldman Joint Consent Motion to Substitute Counsel for Plaintiffs Ritu Jutla and Zenovia Pittas and Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Daniel Sepulveda addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Bradley K. King, Tina Wolfson, and Lori Feldman dated May 18, 2018. Document filed by Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas, Daniel Sepulveda.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(King, Bradley) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              STIPULATED DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE (JEFFREY ATKINS): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by and between the Plaintiffs and Defendant Jeffrey Atkins through their undersigned counsel that Plaintiffs' Complaint and all claims for relief alleged therein in Plaintiffs' individual capacity and not on behalf of any class they are alleged to represent, shall be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). Plaintiffs and Defendant Jeffrey Atkins shall each bear their own costs and fees. (As further set forth in this Order.) Jeffrey Atkins (an individual ) and Jeffrey Atkins (an individual ) terminated. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/9/2018) (cf) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Revised Proposed Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the plaintiffs and defendant Jeffrey Atkins in all five cases above in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3), Fed. R. Civ. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. ?? 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC") to be filed by April 20, 2018. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than November 15, 208. Depositions to be completed by 9/28/18. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 10 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for November 30, 2018 at 11:00. (As further set forth in this Order.) Deposition due by 9/28/2018. Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2018. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(cf) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cf). (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As a result of a Pre-Trial Conference held before the Court today, the following is ORDERED: 1. The above five actions are consolidated under docket 17 cv 3296. 2. The plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint by April 20, 2018. 3. The caption is amended to read "IN RE FYRE Festival Litagation". 4. Geragos & Geragos is appointed lead counsel on consent. The next Case Management Conference will be held on November 30 at 11 am. Any conference scheduled for a date prior thereto is adjourned. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2018., Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(cf) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER denying 28 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. 1. What responsible lawyer would enter an appearance and substitution unless and until he or she was prepared to take over the case? Your firm's decision to appear is your firm's problem and your client's problem and not anyone else's problem. 2. That you are a North Carolina law firm (a point is make) is of no moment. 3. Having different dates for this conclusion of discovery in two of the five actions before the undersigned is a non-starter. Application DENIED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/5/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ryan Hayden Smith dated 03/05/2018. Document filed by Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 26 Motion for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Good Standing Certs., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14753777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit electronic and physical signature, # 2 motion, # 3 order)(Smith, Ryan) Modified on 2/28/2018 (ma). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: A conference is scheduled for March 13, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/23/2018) (cf) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Thomas H. Herndon, Jr. dated November 30, 2017 re: Joint Response to November 17, 2017 Order. Document filed by Jeffrey Atkins.(Herndon, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: Let the parties to the above-captioned actions show cause in writing by November 30, 2017 why the three actions ought not be consolidated, a consolidated amended complaint be ordered filed by December 29, 2017 and that 17 cv 3541 and 17 cv 3461, the higher numbered actions, be administratively closed and the consolidated action proceed under 17 cv 3296 under the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order filed on October 17, 2017. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/16/2017) (cf) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 5 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than April 27, 2018. Depositions to be completed by 4/2/18. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 10 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for 5/17/2018 at 10:30am. (As further set forth in this Order.) Deposition due by 4/2/2018. Fact Discovery due by 4/27/2018. Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/17/2017) (cf) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Marc L. Godino, Rosemary M. Rivas, and Thomas H. Herndon, Jr. dated October 10, 2017 re: Pretrial Conference and Civil Case Management Plan. Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Godino, Marc) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/17/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/19/2017) (cf) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland. Document filed by Jeffrey Atkins.(Herndon, Thomas) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: With apologies, the Court must reschedule the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for Tuesday, September 19, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. The conference will now be held on Thursday, September 28, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest.) (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/29/2017) (ap) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned that the time for defendant, Jeffery Atkins ("Defendant"), to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended up to and including September 11, 2017; as further set forth in this Order. So Ordered. (You can proceed with extension requests by just letter in the future, not stips. -- recite "consent" is the letter.) Jeffrey Atkins answer due 9/11/2017., Motions terminated: 15 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Thomas H.Herndon, Jr. dated August 25, 2017. filed by Jeffrey Atkins. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/28/2017) (cf) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Katherine B. Forrest from Thomas H.Herndon, Jr. dated August 25, 2017. Document filed by Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation Between Plaintiff and Atkins)(Herndon, Thomas) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Hunter Herndon, II on behalf of Jeffrey Atkins. (Herndon, Thomas) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Court Orders served on Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland, and Jeffrey Atkins p/k/a Ja Rule on August 8, 2017. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Godino, Marc) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF MDL ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL DENYING TRANSFER....that the motion, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407(c), for transfer of the action to the United States District Court - Southern District of New York, be, and the same hereby is denied. (Signed by MDL Panel on 8/2/2017) (sjo) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-03296-PKC. Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey.(Godino, Marc) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that: Lead counsel for all parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference ("IPTC") on Tuesday, September 19, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. All counsel in receipt of this order shall notify all other parties (or, if known, their attorneys) of the IPTC by serving each of them with a copy of this order and with a copy of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. Counsel shall file proof of such service with the Court. Initial Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 01:00 PM before Judge Katherine B. Forrest. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 8/3/2017) (js) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jeffrey Atkins served on 6/2/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. Document filed by Sean Daly; Edward Ivey. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Billy McFarland served on 6/2/2017, answer due 6/23/2017. Document filed by Sean Daly; Edward Ivey. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER AMITTING MARC L. GODINO PRO HAC VICE: granting 6 Motion for Marc L. Godino to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ordered that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 6/5/2017) (js) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Marc L. Godino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13732706. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Of Marc Godino, # 2 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Godino, Marc) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Fyre Media, Inc. served on 5/16/2017, answer due 6/6/2017. Service was accepted by Sean O'Hara, Agent Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by Sean Daly; Edward Ivey. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Atkins, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland. (jvs) (Entered: 05/10/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Defendants BILLY MCFARLAND, JEFFREY ATKINS p/k/a JA RULE, and FYRE MEDIA, INC., re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey. (Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Atkins, p/k/a Ja Rule, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13642002)Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey.(Portnoy, Lesley) (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lori Feldman to RE-FILE Document No. 36 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS IS NOT LINKED UP TO ANY PLEADING WITHIN THIS CASE. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lori Gwen Feldman to Document No. 35 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE SUMMONS IS NOT LINKED UP TO ANY PLEADING. (pc)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lori Feldman to RE-FILE Document No. 34 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE SUMMONS IS NOT LINKED UP TO ANY PLEADING;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Case Management Conference held on 3/13/2018. The next case management conference is scheduled for November 30, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:17-cv-03296-PKC. (cf)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 26 MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 25 FIRST MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14753777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): MISSING CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING FROM THE SUPREME COURT OF NORTH CAROLINA, PLEASE FILE THE DOCUMENTS IN ORDER.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-03296-PKC. (jc)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/17/2017. The next case management conference is scheduled for May 17, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Katherine B. Forrest is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 6 MOTION for Marc L. Godino to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13732706. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jvs)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine B. Forrest. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jvs)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jvs)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF. (jvs)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy re: Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jvs)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lesley Frank Portnoy. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Sean Daly, Edward Ivey, Billy McFarland, Jeffrey Atkins, Fyre Media, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted; alias party name was entered in all caps;. (jvs)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Does 1 through 50, inclusive added. Party added pursuant to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Sean Daly, Edward Ivey.(Portnoy, Lesley)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?