Johnson v. Instant Auto Credit Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-00115

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 23, 2019 at 2:23 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0045
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None judgmentCourt Filing
JUDGMENT pursuant to 8 Order, Johnson's claims against defendants Instant Auto Credit Corporation, Abernathy Motor Company, and Carl Oliver are dismissed without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/25/2018. (jak)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing this action in its entirety, consistent with this Court's prior Orders, and this Order. Judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 6/25/2018. (jak)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 9 Motion to dismiss ((Johnson II, Dkt. No. 9). The Court dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johnson's claim under TILA against Mr. Oliver and dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johnson's claim under GLBA against Mr. Oliver. The Cou rt also dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johnson's claims under TILA against Abernathy and Instant Auto and dismisses Mr. Johnson's claims under GLBA against Abernathy and Instant Auto. The Court also dismisses without prejudice Mr. Johns ons claims under the FTCA and Dodd-Frank Act against Instant Auto. Mr. Johnson has 21 days from the entry of this Order to move the Court for leave to amend. If Mr. Johnson does not seek leave to amend his complaint during that time, the Court will decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Mr. Johnson's remaining state law claims and dismiss without prejudice those claims, as well. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/30/2018. (jak)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: The Court orders the parties to show cause within 10 days of the entry date of this Order why the present suit should not be consolidated with Case No. 3:17-cv-00127. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/12/2018. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2018: # 1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and permitting Mr. Johnson to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 3/12/2018. (jak)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?