TALARICO v. PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 5:17-cv-02165-JLS
District Judge JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2021 at 5:56 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RALPH TALARICO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by arnoldbeyerkatz.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RICHARD A. KATZ +1 717 394 7204 rkatz@arnoldbeyerkatz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miriam Rose Nemeth +1 202 408 4600 mnemeth@cohenmilstein.com
v.
No Logo Public Partnerships LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WALTER M. FOSTER +1 617 342 6899
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JONATHAN R. NADLER +1 215 851 8410 jnadler@eckertseamans.com
  Entries (236) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/26/2021, Entered: None Motion Hearing
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 6/30/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 6/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/25/2021, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Seal Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None Certify Class
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None USCA Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Status Conference
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Redaction Request - Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal (Credit Card Payment)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Motion for order
                                                                        MOTION for Order Allowing Late Opt Ins filed by RALPH TALARICO.Memorandum, Declaration. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum Memorandum in Suport of Motion, # (2) Declaration Declaration of Christine Webber, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice - other
                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS [188] MOTION IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEBORAH KNIGHT IS HEREBY REMOVED FROM THE CLASS ACTION IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/2/19.10/2/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019, Terminated: 10/2/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to R 41(a)(2) filed by DEBORAH KNIGHT.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service.(WEINBERG, MARC)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by MARC A. WEINBERG on behalf of DEBORAH KNIGHT (WEINBERG, MARC)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/27/2019, Entered: 7/27/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: 7/16/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Motion Hearing held on 7/10/19. RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (#[158]). Attorney Foster argued motion. Attorney Webber responded. Court questioned counsel. Matter taken under advisement; ruling to be issued. Court Reporter: ESR. (mas, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: 7/8/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                        STIPULATION (Joint) of Undisputed Material Facts by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. (FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO re [165] Response in Opposition to Motion,, of FIling Corrected Brief and Exhibit (Attachments: # (1) Brief Corrected Opposition, # (2) Exhibit Corrected Ex. 1)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/5/2019 Order
                                                                                                                ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANT'S PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT WAS PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 21, 2019, SHALL BE HELD ON JULY 10, 2019, AT 10:00 A.M., IN THE COURTROOM OF THE UNDERSIGNED, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/5/19. 6/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO re [102] Notice (Other), [34] Notice (Other), [93] Notice (Other), [109] Notice (Other) of Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiffs (WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/25/2019, Entered: 5/25/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Consent Filing of Blatch, Susan (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Consent to Join)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE ORAL ARGUMENT PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 17, 2019 IS RESCHEDULED TO FRIDAY, JUNE 21, 2019 AT 1:30 P.M. IN THE READING CHAMBERS, THE MADISON BUILDING, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/16/19. 5/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 Order
                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT SHALL BE HELD ON DEFENDANT'S PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON MONDAY, JUNE 17, 2019, AT 2:00 P.M., IN THE COURTROOM OF THE UNDERSIGNED, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/2/19. 5/2/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [158] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT [167] PPLS ASSENTED-TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/11/19.4/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019, Terminated: 4/12/2019 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [165] Response in Opposition to Motion,, (DEFENDANT'S ASSENTED TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: 4/9/2019 Order on Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S [164] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN EXHIBITS TO HIS OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 4/9/19.4/9/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [158] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH TALARICO. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 8, # (8) Exhibit 9 part 1, # (9) Exhibit 9 part 2, # (10) Exhibit 9 part 3, # (11) Exhibit 14, # (12) Exhibit 16, # (13) Exhibit 17, # (14) Exhibit 18, # (15) Exhibit 19, # (16) Exhibit 22, # (17) Exhibit 23, # (18) Exhibit 24, # (19) Exhibit 25, # (20) Exhibit 31, # (21) Exhibit 36, # (22) Exhibit 46, # (23) Exhibit 52, # (24) Exhibit 53, # (25) Exhibit 54, # (26) Exhibit 55, # (27) Exhibit 56, # (28) Exhibit 57)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019, Terminated: 4/9/2019 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal filed by RALPH TALARICO.Motion for Leave to File Certain Exhibits to His Opposition to Summary Judgment Under Seal. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 3/28/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MIRIAM R. NEMETH on behalf of RALPH TALARICO(NEMETH, MIRIAM)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/27/2019, Entered: 3/27/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: 3/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/11/2019 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT PPL'S [157] MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT IS GRANTED; AND FURTHER ORDERED THAT PPL MAY SUBMIT A BRIEF OF NO MORE THAN 40 PAGES IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND THAT PLAINTIFFS BE PERMITTED TO FILE A BRIEF OF NO MORE THAN 40 PAGES IN OPPOSITION TO PPL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/8/19.3/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas, )
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Brief. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Memorandum)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019, Terminated: 3/8/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Page Limit) filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Brief. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019 order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT PPL'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EXHIBITS TO ITS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT UNDER SEAL IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/7/19.3/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: 3/7/2019, Terminated: 3/7/2019 motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion for Summary Judgment Under Seal filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: 2/28/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: 2/25/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: 2/21/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: 2/13/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/12/2019, Entered: 2/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: 2/5/2019 order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET NO. 144), IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY MARCH 8, 2019. PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY APRIL 8, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/5/19.2/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 3/8/2019. RESPONSES DUE BY 4/8/2019. (er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [144] MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RALPH TALARICO. (WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: 1/31/2019, Terminated: 2/5/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(FOSTER, WALTER) Modified on 2/1/2019 (afm, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/17/2019, Entered: 1/17/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: 1/7/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF 1/2/2019 THAT THE APPLICATION OF CAROLINE E. BRESSMAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/2/2019. 1/2/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED WITH ECF APPLICATION. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice Fee Letter sent to Caroline Bressman, Esq. on 12/19/18. (kw, ) (Filing fee paid on 12/24/18) Modified on 12/26/2018 (kw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018, Terminated: 1/2/2019 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by RALPH TALARICO.motion.(KATZ, RICHARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: 12/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: 12/6/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF 12/6/2018 THAT AFTER A STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL ON DECEMBER 4, 2018, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: EACH SIDE SHALL NOTIFY THE COURT BY DECEMBER 10, 2018, IF REFERRAL TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR PURPOSES OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS REQUESTED; DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY JANUARY 31, 2019; PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SHALL BE FILED BY FEBRUARY 28, 2019; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION PURSUANT TO RULE 23 OF THE FRCP SHALL BE HELD IN ABEYANCE UNTIL AFTER DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DECIDED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. 12/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: 12/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL: Status/Settlment Conference held on 12/4/18. Court Reporter: None. (DUPLICATE FILING - FILED IN ERROR)(er, ) Modified on 12/6/2018 (er, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: 12/4/2018 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. A Status Conference was held on 12/4/2018 and not placed on the record. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: 11/15/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: 11/14/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018 Order on Motion to Substitute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF 11/13/2018 THAT THE UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE AS TO DEPOSITION SUBPOENA, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT SAID MOTION BE GRANTED. THE DEPOSITION OF SUBPOENA TO E.W. MAY BE SERVED BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS, WHICH METHODS MAY INCLUDE: a) SUBSTITUTE SERVICE BY CERTIFIED FIRST CLASS MAIL TO E.W. b) SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY FIRST CLASS MAIL TO E.W.'S CURRENT DIRECT CARE WORKER(S), WITH INSTRUCTIONS FROM PPL TO THE DIRECT CARE WORKER(S) TO PROVIDE THE SUBPOENA TO E.W. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. 11/13/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: 11/13/2018, Terminated: 11/13/2018 Motion to Substitute
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Substitute Service of Process as to Deposition Subpoena filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Affidavit, Certificate of Counsel. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Walter M. Foster, Esq., # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents, # (6) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: 11/6/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF 11/6/2018 THAT FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED FROM NOVEMBER 2, 2018 TO NOVEMBER 30, 2018. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. 11/6/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018, Terminated: 11/2/2018 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION TO EXTEND FACT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.**(FILED IN ERROR, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**.(FOSTER, WALTER) Modified on 11/5/2018 (tjd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: 10/30/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: 10/23/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents, # (6) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: 10/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: 10/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents, # (6) Exhibit consents, # (7) Exhibit consents, # (8) Exhibit consents, # (9) Exhibit consents, # (10) Exhibit consents, # (11) Exhibit consents, # (12) Exhibit consents, # (13) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents, # (6) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: 10/4/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: 10/3/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents, # (6) Exhibit consents, # (7) Exhibit consents, # (8) Exhibit consents, # (9) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: 10/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: 10/1/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: 9/28/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: 9/27/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: 9/26/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Consent Filing (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form (1))(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: 9/21/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: 9/20/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consents, # (2) Exhibit consents, # (3) Exhibit consents, # (4) Exhibit consents, # (5) Exhibit consents)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF 9/19/2018 THAT AFTER A STATUS CONFERENCE WITH COUNSEL ON SEPTEMBER 19, 2018, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: THE PARTIES MAY BEGIN DEPOSITIONS OF OPT-IN PLAINTIFFS AFTER SEPTEMBER 30, 2018; AND A STATUS/SETTLMENT CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON DECEMBER 4, 2018 AT 2:30PM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED ON 9/19/2018. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: 9/19/2018 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL Status Conference held on 09/19/2018 and not placed on the record. (DT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC, filed by RALPH TALARICO.(er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Order on motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND SCHEDULING ORDER (DOCKET NO. 75) IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, ATTACHED AS EXHIBIT A TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION, IS DEEMED FILED AS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. THIS ORDER DOES NOT MODIFY ANY OTHER CASE MANAGEMENT DATES IN THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/14/18.9/14/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint and Scheduling Order (Unopposed) filed by RALPH TALARICO. Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Complaint First Amended Collective Action and Class Action Complaint)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE) Modified on 9/18/2018 (tjd).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: 9/6/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 14, 2018 IS RESCHEDULED TO WEDNESDAY, SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 AT 10:00 A.M. IN THE READING CHAMBERS, THE MADISON BUILDING, 400 WASHINGTON STREET, READING, PENNSYLVANIA, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 9/6/18. 9/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (er, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: 9/5/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION/ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION (DOCKET 47) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/20/18. 8/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: 8/20/2018 Memorandum and/or Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM/OPINION THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 8/20/18. 8/20/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: 8/13/2018 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL re: A Telephone Conference was held on 8/10/18. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: 8/10/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent, # (2) Certificate of Service)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: 7/25/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 9/5/18 IS RESCHEDULED TO 9/14/2018 AT 2:00 P.M. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/28/18. 6/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: 6/25/2018, Terminated: 6/29/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Status Conference (Assented-to) filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service.(FOSTER, WALTER) Modified on 11/15/2018 (nd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 8/9/18 IS RESCHEDULED TO 9/5/2018 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/19/18. 6/19/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO re [47] MOTION to Certify Class (Motion for Conditional Certification) of Filing Proposed Form of Notice (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Form of Notice)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 7/20/18 IS RESCHEDULED TO 8/9/2018 AT 2:30 P.M. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/18/18. 6/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: 5/29/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 6/28/18 IS RESCHEDULED TO 7/20/2018 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL.SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/29/18. 5/29/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: 5/16/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 6/28/2018 AT 10:00 A.M. IN PHILADELPHIA CHAMBERS BEFORE THE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/15/18. 5/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: 5/15/2018 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL re: A Status Conference was held on 5/14/18. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER THAT SHALL GOVERN THE USE AND DISCLOSURE OF CONFIDENTIAL, HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL AND PROTECTED INFORMATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/27/18. 3/28/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: 3/22/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Consent Filing (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form)(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018, Terminated: 3/28/2018 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order) filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: 3/19/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: 3/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: 3/9/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [47] MOTION to Certify Class (Motion for Conditional Certification) filed by RALPH TALARICO. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: 3/6/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER AND STIPULATION THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH PLAINTIFF RALPH TALARICO MAY FILE A REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION BE EXTENDED THREE DAYS TO 3/9/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/6/18. 3/6/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Pretrial Conference - Initial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL re: A Rule 16 Conference was held on 3/1/18. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: 3/2/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT ALL PARTIES SHALL BE ADDED AND ALL PLEADINGS SHALL BE AMENDED BY 3/30/18. ALL FACT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 11/2/2018; AND A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 5/14/2018 AT 10:00 A.M. IN THE PHILADELPHIA CHAMBERS OF THE UNDERSIGNED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 3/1/18. 3/2/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: 2/27/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [47] MOTION to Certify Class (Motion for Conditional Certification) and Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 216(B) filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/23/2018, Entered: 2/23/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER AND STIPULATION THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT MAY RESPOND TO THE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONDITIONAL CERTIFICATION BE EXTENDED FIVE DAYS TO FEBRUARY 27, 2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 2/23/18. 2/23/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: 2/12/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: 2/8/2018, Terminated: 8/20/2018 motion to certify class
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class (Motion for Conditional Certification) filed by RALPH TALARICO.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Declarations. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # (3) Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit 9, # (12) Exhibit 10, # (13) Exhibit 11, # (14) Exhibit 12, # (15) Exhibit 13, # (16) Text of Proposed Order)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Withdrawal of Opt-In Plaintiff (WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: 2/1/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to [1] Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: 1/17/2018 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT A RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 3/1/2018 AT 2:00 P.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/17/18. 1/17/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Order on motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO REFILE AFTER THE CLOSE OF DISCOVERY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE UNTIL JANUARY 31, 2018 TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/16/18. 1/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent to join)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC of Supplemental Authority (FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (DOCKETED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE OF [38]) Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL. Motion Hearing held on 11/15/17. RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (#[11]). Atty. Foster argues motion on behalf of defendant. Atty. Webber responds on behalf of plaintiff. Atty. Foster offers rebuttal. Court questions counsel. Court takes matter under advisement. Ruling will be issued. Court Reporter: ESR. (DOCKETED IN ERROR, DUPLICATE OF [38]) (mas, ) Modified on 11/16/2017 (mas, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/17 re: MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. Court Reporter: None. (er, ) (Main Document 38 replaced on 11/16/2017) (er, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit consent)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Consent Filing (Attachments: # (1) Consent to Join)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Plaintiffs' Consent Filing (Attachments: # (1) Consent Form)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT SHALL BE HELD ON DEFENDANT'S PENDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 11/15/2017 AT 3:00 P.M. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 10/5/17. 10/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO Consent to Join (WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Consent Filing (Attachments: # (1) Consents (2))(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Filing Consent (Attachments: # (1) Consent)(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Filing Consent (Attachments: # (1) Consent)(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Supplemental Declaration of Regina Stewart)(FOSTER, WALTER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Filing Consent (Attachments: # (1) Consent (1))(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER AND STIPULATION THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT MAY FILE AND SERVE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEREBY EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING AUGUST 2, 2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/20/17. 7/21/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT PLFF'S REQUEST FOR AN EXCEPTION FROM THE PAGE LIMIT IN RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT PLFF MAY SUBMIT A BRIEF OF NO MORE THAN 29 PAGES IN RESPONSE TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/18/17.7/19/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO of Filing Consent (Attachments: # (1) Consent)(SREY, RACHHANA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Certificate of Service filed by RALPH TALARICO. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1 - HCBS Waiver, # (2) Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration of EW Redacted, # (3) Exhibit Ex. 3 - AI2014-2, # (4) Exhibit Ex. 4 - Declaration of Ralph Talarico, # (5) Exhibit Ex. 5 - Declaration of Shaneena Jackson, # (6) Exhibit Ex. 6 - Declaration of Christine Webber, # (7) Exhibit Ex. 7 - CMCS Informational Bulletin)(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017, Terminated: 7/19/2017 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Exception From the Page Limit In Response to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. 11) filed by RALPH TALARICO.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for an Exception from the Page Limit in Response to Defendant's Motion for SJ (Dkt. 11))(WEBBER, CHRISTINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: 7/13/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO CONSENTS TO JOIN.GREEN.McCONEGHY (KATZ, RICHARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISISON PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT SCHUG, ESQUIRE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/30/17.6/30/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, MAILED WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RACHHANA SREY, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/30/17. 6/30/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, MAILED WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER AND STIPULATION THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH PLAINTIFF MAY RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEREBY EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING 7/14/2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/26/17. 6/28/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO ROBERTS CONSENT TO JOIN (KATZ, RICHARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO ALLEN CONSENT TO JOIN (KATZ, RICHARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ROBERT SCHUG, ESQUIRE filed by RALPH TALARICO.Certificate of Service.(KATZ, RICHARD) (Filing Fee paid on 6/28/17) Modified on 6/29/2017 (kw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017, Terminated: 6/30/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of RACHHANA SREY filed by RALPH TALARICO. Certificate of Service.(KATZ, RICHARD) Modified on 6/26/2017 (tjd). (Filing Fee paid on 6/28/17) Modified on 6/29/2017 (kw, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by RALPH TALARICO CONSENTS TO JOIN (KATZ, RICHARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 MEMORANDUMCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in Support re [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC, PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael C. Hale, # (2) Declaration of Regina Stewart (Part 1), # (3) Declaration of Regina Stewart (Part 2), # (4) Appendix)(NADLER, JONATHAN) Modified on 6/19/2017 (tjd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/5/2017 with Judge's chambers permission) (nd, ). Modified on 7/5/2017 (nd, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017, Terminated: 1/16/2018 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC, PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service.(NADLER, JONATHAN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT THE [2] MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF CHRISTINE E. WEBBER IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/5/17. 6/7/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY'S ALONG WITH ECF REGISTRATION FORM, E-MAILED. (mas, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT ATTORNEY WALTER M FOSTER PRO HAC VICE, AND ANY RESPONSE THERETO, IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/2/17.6/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED, MAILED WITH ECF FORMS.(er, ) Modified on 6/5/2017 (er, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER AND STIPULATION THAT THE TIME IN WHICH DEFENDANT MAY ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE MOVE IS HEREBY EXTENDED UP TO AND INCLUDING JUNE 16, 2017. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/1/17. 6/2/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017, Terminated: 6/5/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Walter M. Foster, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12105217.) filed by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC, PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.Certificate of Service.(NADLER, JONATHAN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Disclosure Statement Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC, PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC.(NADLER, JONATHAN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R. NADLER on behalf of PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC, PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC with Certificate of Service(NADLER, JONATHAN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MIRIAM R. NEMETH, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/30/17. 5/31/17 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED WITH ECF APPLICATION, MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED. (ky, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 5/31/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12094136.) filed by RALPH TALARICO.Certificate of Service.(KATZ, RICHARD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017, Terminated: 6/6/2017 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Pro Hac Vice filed by RALPH TALARICO.Certificate of Service.(KATZ, RICHARD) (Filing Fee Paid - 6/1/17) Modified on 6/2/2017 (gs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: 5/11/2017 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 159509.), filed by RALPH TALARICO. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Case Management Track Form, # (3) Designation Form, # (4) Exhibit)(jwl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to PUBLIC PARTNERSHIPS, LLC. One given To: Counsel on 5/11/17 (jwl, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3,030 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?