Herlihy et al v. Fyre Media, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03296
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2021 at 2:40 PM EST (1.6 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Anthony Lauriello, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Clisura +1 212 363 7500 aclisura@zlk.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Andrea Clisura +1 212 363 7500 aclisura@zlk.com
No Logo Matthew Herlihy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Clisura +1 212 363 7500 aclisura@zlk.com
individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated Andrea Clisura +1 212 363 7500 aclisura@zlk.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Grant Margolin, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Atkins, Defendant
McFarland, William McFarland, William, Defendant
Officially listed as "William McFarland"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332fr
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/3/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Proposed Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/2/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/1/2021, Entered: None Discovery
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/29/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/25/2021, Entered: None Conference
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/22/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/6/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Exhibit List
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/6/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Witness List
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Acknowledgment of Service Complaints
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/28/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an Initial Pretrial Conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on July 6, 2017 at 11:15 a.m. in Courtroom 11D at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF (OR THE REMOVING DEFENDANT) IS DIRECTED TO IMMEDIATELY SEND A COPY OF THIS NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES. Initial Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/5/2017) (ras) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Atkins, Fyre Media, Inc, Grant Margolin, William McFarland. (kl) (Main Document 4 replaced on 5/4/2017) (kl). (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fyre Media, Inc.; William McFarland; Jeffrey Atkins p/k/a Ja Rule; Grant Margolin, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Matthew Herlihy, Anthony Lauriello. (Clisura, Andrea) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Clisura, Andrea) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Atkins, Fyre Media, Inc, Grant Margolin, William McFarland. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13620867)Document filed by Matthew Herlihy, Anthony Lauriello.(Clisura, Andrea) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?