SANCHEZ-CANETE v. BOQUIN BANEGAS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00905

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 8:23 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JESUS SANCHEZ-CANETE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by JESUS SANCHEZ-CANETE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JESUS SANCHEZ-CANETE
v.
No Logo ALEX MAURICIO AMADOR ULLOA, Defendant
No Logo ALEXANDER ENRIQUE AMADOR AMADOR, Defendant
No Logo ALFRED L. ROBERTSON, JR., Defendant
No Logo ANA CASTILLO MARTINEZ, Defendant
No Logo BLANCA ESTEFANY ORTIZ-RODRIGUEZ, Defendant
No Logo DELISA CASTILLO MARTINEZ, Defendant
No Logo DIANA NICOLE ORTIZ-RODRIGUEZ, Defendant
No Logo ELIZABETH MARIA BACA CASTILLO, Defendant
No Logo EMERSON BAIRES ARIAS, Defendant
No Logo GREGORY VANDERWOUDE, Defendant
No Logo JOSUE NEHEMIAS ORTIZ-CHAVEZ, Defendant
No Logo KALA ESTEFANY RODRIGUEZ DE ORTIZ, Defendant
No Logo MARGERY CHANTAL CRAWLEY, Defendant
No Logo MIRIAN LORENI CATILLO FLORES, Defendant
No Logo MIRIAN Y. BOQUIN BANEGAS, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Law Office, PLLC, Defendant
No Logo SUANY LISSETH CARDENAS BOQUIN, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause, 2 , this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice on the Court's own motion for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/31/2017. (lcrdm2, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 8 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?