Elizabeth Alvarado v. University of Southern California
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03671

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 17, 2018 at 1:59 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elizabeth Alvarado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaines and Gaines APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F Gaines +1 818 703 8985 +1 818 703 8984 daniel@gaineslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Steven Gaines +1 818 703 8985 +1 818 703 8984 kenneth@gaineslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex P Katofsky +1 818 703 8985 +1 818 703 8984 alex@gaineslawfirm.com
No Logo Jose Ramos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaines and Gaines APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel F Gaines +1 818 703 8985 +1 818 703 8984 daniel@gaineslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth Steven Gaines +1 818 703 8985 +1 818 703 8984 kenneth@gaineslawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex P Katofsky +1 818 703 8985 +1 818 703 8984 alex@gaineslawfirm.com
v.
No Logo DOES, Defendant
University of Southern California University of Southern California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew McTernan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 am@birdmarella.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
IN CHAMBERS - RULING ON DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT 16 by Judge George H. Wu remanding case to SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, Case number BC658703: The case is ordered remanded back to state court forthwith. Please refer to the Court's order for further details. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER TO CONTINUE MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING 24 by Judge George H. Wu: In light of the foregoing stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the September 7, 2017 hearing regarding Defendants Motion to Dismiss in the above-captioned matter is hereby continued to September 21, 2017, at 8:30 a.m. (cr) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant University of Southern California. correcting Stipulation to Continue, 24 Hearing Date Continued to September 21, 2017 (McTernan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing On Motion to Dismiss Complaint from September 7, 2017 to September 28, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McTernan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (McTernan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Alvarado, Jose Ramos. correcting Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 21 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related) 20 (Katofsky, Alex) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              OPPOSITION opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Alvarado, Jose Ramos. (Katofsky, Alex) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                To Defendants Motion To Dismiss Complaint opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 16 filed by Plaintiffs Elizabeth Alvarado, Jose Ramos. (Katofsky, Alex) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCEheld before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification for December 7, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. All briefs must be filed by November 22, 2017. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/25/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: 7/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Case Management Statement ; estimated length of trial 2 weeks, filed by Defendant University of Southern California.. (McTernan, Andrew)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Elizabeth Alvarado, (Katofsky, Alex) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant University of Southern California. Motion set for hearing on 9/7/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (McTernan, Andrew)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE 14 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS ORDERED that the June 22, 2017 scheduling conference is hereby continued to July 24, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. (lom) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 22, 2017 to July 14, 2017 filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR RELIEF FROM LOCAL RULE 23-3 by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation for Relief 10 . GOOD CAUSE APPEARING THEREFORE, the Court hereby approves the parties' Stipulation and relieves Plaintiffs of the requirement set forth in L.R. 23-3 that a motion for class certification be filed within 90 days of the removal of this action. The Court ADVANCES the Scheduling Conference set for July 13, 2017 to June 22, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. A joint report is to be filed by June 19, 2017. (mrgo) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu: The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for July 13, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court no later than June 29, 2017. See Local Rule 26-1. (cr)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu: You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth "Local Rules") 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          STIPULATION for Relief from From Local Rule 23-3 filed by plaintiff Elizabeth Alvarado. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulation For Relief From Local Rule 23-3)(Katofsky, Alex) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (jtil) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant University of Southern California, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 4 , Notice of Appearance 5 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 3 served on May 16, 2017. (McTernan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant University of Southern California.(McTernan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew McTernan on behalf of Defendant University of Southern California (Attorney Andrew McTernan added to party University of Southern California(pty:dft))(McTernan, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant University of Southern California, (Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant University of Southern California identifying 'No Parent Corporation' as Corporate Parent. (Rhow, Ekwan)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: 5/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Rhow, Ekwan)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA Los Angeles County, case number BC658703 Receipt No: 0973-19858329 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant University of Southern California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Ekwan E Rhow added to party University of Southern California(pty:dft))(Rhow, Ekwan) (Entered: 05/16/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?