Lohman v. Beneficial Financial I, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00342

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 2, 2019 at 12:56 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Order to
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Count 1 is dismissed; Count 2 remains; granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 3/30/18. (ba)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Certificate of Service
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: None Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?