Metcalf v. Metcalf
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Eastern District Court, Case No. 7:17-cv-00094

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 6:09 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None judgment
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court adopts the M&R as its own, and for the reasons stated therein, this case is DISMISSED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, close this case, and mail a copy of this order to the perso nal representative of plaintiff's estate and next of kin, Kenneth Angermeier. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/29/2018. Copy sent to Kenneth Angermeier, 235 Eastbury Avenue NE, North Canton, OH 44720 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order on Memorandum and RecommendationsCourt Filing
    ORDER adopting 21 Report and Recommendations as its own. For the reasons stated, this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/29/2018. Copy sent to Kenneth Angermeier, 235 Eastbury Avenue NE, North Canton, OH 44720 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None response
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Memorandum and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Order Setting/Resetting Hearings
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Rule 26(f) Report (joint)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Notice-Other
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Financial Disclosure Statement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Order for Discovery Plan
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Notice-Other
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?