United States v. Leach
Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-00214

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 1, 2020 at 1:31 PM DT (11.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Status report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Stay
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Notice of Assignment Setting Deadline
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Litigation Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?