Ragusa v. City of New York
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-07294
District Judge Valerie E. Caproni, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 2:41 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gene Ragusa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/30/2015 Christopher R. Fenton +1 212 848 4000 +1 212 848 7179 christopher.fenton@shearman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Patrick Mitchell +1 212 848 4338 +1 646 848 4338 michael.mitchell@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Nathanson +1 212 848 8611 +1 646 848 8611 john.nathanson@shearman.com
v.
No Logo Ahmed Khan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Horton +1 212 356 2647 +1 212 788 9776 jhorton@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Horton +1 212 356 2647 +1 212 788 9776 jhorton@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Kevin Dimino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Horton +1 212 356 2647 +1 212 788 9776 jhorton@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
No Logo MATHEW PERRONE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Horton +1 212 356 2647 +1 212 788 9776 jhorton@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Horton +1 212 356 2647 +1 212 788 9776 jhorton@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Police Officers John and Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Raymond Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Marie Savino +1 212 788 0987 +1 212 788 9776 ksavino@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James F. Horton +1 212 356 2647 +1 212 788 9776 jhorton@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noreen M. Stackhouse +1 212 788 9736 +1 212 788 9776 nstackho@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Oliver McCann +1 212 788 0861 +1 212 788 9776 mmccann@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: WHEREAS, the parties have reached a settlement agreement and now desire to resolve the remaining issues raised in this litigation, without further proceedings and without admitting any fault or liability; NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that 1. The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed with prejudice; and 2. Notwithstanding the dismissal of this action in accordance with this agreement, the District Court shall continue to maintain jurisdiction over this action for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement reached between the parties and set forth in the Stipulation and Settlement executed by the parties in this matter. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/29/2016) (mro) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, as follows: The City of New York hereby agrees to pay counsel for plaintiff, Shearman & Sterling LLP, the sum of FIFTY EIGHT THOUSAND FIFTY DOLLARS AND 45 CENTS ($58,050.45) in full satisfaction of all claims for costs, expenses and attorney's fees which were or could have been alleged by plaintiff in this action. In consideration for the payment of this sum, plaintiff and plaintiff's counsel agree to release the defendants City of New York, former New York City Mayor Michael Bloomberg, former New York City Police Department Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Police Officer Kevin Dimino, Sergeant Ahmed Khan, and Police Officer Matthew Perrone, and any present or former employees and agents of the City of New York, and the City of New York or any entity represented by the Office of the Corporation Counsel, from any and all liability, claims, or rights of action for costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees which were or could have been alleged or asserted in the Action. (As further set forth in this Stipulation and Order of Dismissal.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/29/2016) (mro) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, as follows: 1. The above-referenced action is hereby dismissed against defendants, with prejudice, and without costs, expenses, or attorneys' fees except as specified in paragraphs "2" and "3" below. 2. Defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay plaintiff Gene Ragusa the sum of FORTY ONE THOUSAND NINE HUNDRED FORTY NINE DOLLARS AND FIFTY FIVE CENTS ($41,949.55) in full satisfaction of all claims that were asserted or that could have been asserted in the Action, including claims for costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. In consideration for the payment of this sum, plaintiff agrees to dismissal of all the claims against the defendants and to release defendants City of New York, former New York City Mayor Michael Bloomberg, former New York City Police Department Commissioner Raymond Kelly, Police Officer Kevin Dimino, Sergeant Ahmed Khan, and Police Officer Matthew Perrone; their successors or assigns; and all past and present officials, employees, representatives, and agents of the City of New York or any entity represented by the Office of the Corporation Counsel, from any and all liability, claims, or rights of action alleging a violation of plaintiff's civil rights and any and all related state law claims, from the beginning of the world to the date the General Release is executed, including claims for costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees. 3. Plaintiff has assigned his rights to attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs to his attorneys, Shearman & Sterling LLP. (As further set forth in this Stipulation of Settlement.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/29/2016) (mro) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John A. Nathanson on behalf of Gene Ragusa. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting 121 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request GRANTED, in part. Plaintiff's second amended complaint must be filed no later than April 6, 2016. The status conference currently scheduled for March 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., and the parties' joint submission in anticipation of that conference, are ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2016. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/04/2016) (ama) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this action will be dismissed without costs (including attorneys' fees) to either party on April 8, 2016 unless before that date one or more of the parties files a letter with the Court requesting that the action not be dismissed and stating the reasons why the Court should retain jurisdiction over this action in light of the parties' settlement. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction over their settlement agreement, not later than April 1, 2016, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court in accordance with Rule 5.A of the Court's Individual Practices, along with a request that the Court issue an order expressly retaining jurisdiction to enforce their settlement agreement. See Hendrickson v. United States, 791 F.3d 354 (2d Cir. 2015). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/4/2016) (spo) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael Mitchell dated March 3, 2016. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 119 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Request GRANTED, in part. The deadline for Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint on ECF is ADJOURNED until March 7, 2016. The status conference currently scheduled for February 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. is ADJOURNED until March 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. No later than March 18, 2016, the parties must submit a joint letter to the Court reporting on the status of the case and proposing how to proceed with the case and any briefing on attorney's fees. The parties are reminded that they may jointly contact Chambers at any time if they wish to be referred to a Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/7/2016.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/3/2016) (spo) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint and Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael Mitchell dated February 1, 2016. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    OPINION AND ORDER denying re: 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly. MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Mathew Perrone, Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Kevin Dimino, City of New York. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Post-Trial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's remaining claims against Defendants, City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly, and to Alter the Judgment (Dkt. 110) is hereby DENIED. Plaintiff must file any Amended Complaint on ECF no later than February 5, 2016. Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for a status conference in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse on February 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. No later than February 12, 2016, the parties must submit a joint letter to the Court reporting on the status of the case and proposing how to proceed with the case and any briefing on attorney's fees. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close Docket Entry 110. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/22/2016) (tro) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly. MOTION to Alter Judgment . . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perrone. (Joyce, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DECLARATION of Michael P. Mitchell in Opposition re: 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly. MOTION to Alter Judgment .. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly. MOTION to Alter Judgment . . Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 113 Letter filed by Gene Ragusa. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will set a briefing schedule for Plaintiff's intended motion for attorneys' fees and costs after the Court has decided Defendant's motion to alter judgment. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/2/2015) (mro) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael Mitchell dated October 30, 2015 re: Plaintiff's Intention To Seek Attorney's Fees and Costs. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly. MOTION to Alter Judgment . . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perrone. (Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DECLARATION of Noreen Stackhouse in Support re: 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly. MOTION to Alter Judgment .. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perrone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Remaining Claims Against Defendants City of New York, Bloomberg and Kelly., MOTION to Alter Judgment . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perrone.(Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/29/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/29/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a TRIAL proceeding held on 9/28/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: TRIAL held on 9/28/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              COURT EX #5 (dated 9/29/15, 5:49). ***Docket and file instructions by chambers. (tn) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COURT EX # 3 (dated 9/29/15, 5:36 pm). ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COURT EX # 2 (dated 9/29/15, 4:28 pm). ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    COURT EX #1 (dated 9/29/15). ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      VERDICT SHEET (COURT EX #4): if favor of plaintiff, awarding damages in the amount of $40,001.00. ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn) Modified on 10/2/2015 (tn). (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        COURT EX #7 (dated 9/29/2015, 6:15 pm). ***Docket and file instructions from chambers. (tn) Modified on 10/2/2015 (tn). (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Defendants' motion to set aside or amend the verdict and to dismiss any remaining claims in the Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than October 30, 2015. Plaintiff's response shall be filed no later than November 20, 2015, and Defendants' reply no later than December 4, 2015. 2. The Court has reconsidered the briefing schedule for Plaintiff's motion for attorneys' fees. No later than October 30, 2015, Plaintiff shall notify the Court whether he will seek any such fees; the Court will set a briefing schedule for any such motion by separate order. 3. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to amend the official caption to reflect the above-listed spelling of Defendant Perrone's last name. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Motions due by 10/30/2015.) (Responses due by 11/20/2015.) (Replies due by 12/4/2015.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/30/2015) (spo) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: The following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Ragusa v. Perone, et al., No. 12-cv-7294. The date(s) for which such authorization is provided is (are) Sept. 28-30, 2015. Attorney: 1. Michael Mitchell. Device(s) Laptop computer, cell phone, blackberry. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/25/2015) (spo) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 08/06/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/6/2015 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2015.(Grant, Patricia) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion in Limine. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's motions to preclude evidence of his prior arrest and detention and evidence of his prior aborted charge against the NYPD are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate docket entries 77 and 80. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/11/2015) (spo) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the jury trial previously scheduled to begin August 10, 2015, is adjourned until September 28, 2015, at 9:30 a.m. (As is further set forth in this Order.) (Jury Trial set for 9/28/2015 at 09:30 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/10/2015) (spo) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER: The following Order is subject to the definitions, obligations and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. Upon submission of written application to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Ragusa v. Perone et al., No. 12-CV-7294. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/6/2015) (kl) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: The following Order is subject to the definitions, obligations and restrictions imposed pursuant to Standing Order M10-468, as Revised. Upon submission of written application to this Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned Ragusa v. Perone et al., No. 12-CV-7294. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/6/2015) (kl) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Michael Mitchell dated August 3, 2015 re: Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            DECLARATION of Noreen Stackhouse in Opposition re: 80 FIRST MOTION in Limine .. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 80 FIRST MOTION in Limine . . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 87 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Kevin Dimino, Mathew Perone, City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate Mr. Fenton as an attorney of record for Plaintiff in the above-captioned matter. (Attorney Christopher Richard Fenton terminated.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/30/2015) (spo) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Joyce on behalf of Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Joyce, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REQUEST TO CHARGE. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        PROPOSED VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          JOINT PRELIMINARY TRIAL REPORT. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Michael P. Mitchell in Support re: 80 FIRST MOTION in Limine .. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration)(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 FIRST MOTION in Limine . . Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                FIRST MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 77 FIRST MOTION in Limine . . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Noreen Stackhouse in Support re: 77 FIRST MOTION in Limine .. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      FIRST MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Noreen Stackhouse in Support re: 75 FIRST MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stackhouse, Noreen) Modified on 7/22/2015 (db). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Stackhouse, Noreen) Modified on 7/22/2015 (db). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: In light of the parties' ex parte letters and the agreement of all counsel, the settlement conference scheduled for Monday, July 13, 2015, is adjourned. The parties shall proceed to trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/7/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER: The settlement conference in this matter scheduled for Tuesday, May 19, 2015 is ADJOURNED and RESCHEDULED for Monday, July 13, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219 at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY. The parties may file supplemental ex parte letters by Monday, July 6, 2015. If the parties or the Court believe that this settlement conference will not be productive, it shall be cancelled and the parties shall proceed to trial. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 7/13/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/18/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting 71 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Request GRANTED. The trial scheduled for July 20, 2015, is ADJOURNED to August 10, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. The final pretrial conference scheduled for July 15, 2015, is ADJOURNED to August 6, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. Motions in limine shall be filed no later than July 22, 2015, and the Joint Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than July 27, 2015. (Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2015 at 02:00 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Jury Trial set for 8/10/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/15/2015) (spo) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for July 15, 2015, and Trial Scheduled for July 20, 2015 addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James F. Horton dated May 15, 2015. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noreen M. Stackhouse on behalf of Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Stackhouse, Noreen) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      AMENDED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: The conference in this matter, previously scheduled for Tuesday, May 12, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED for Tuesday, May 19, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 5/19/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/16/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: On March 6, 2015, the Honorable Valerie E. Caproni referred this matter to my docket. A settlement conference is scheduled for Tuesday, May 12, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Procedures for Cases Referred for Settlement to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, a copy of which is available on the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Netburn. As further explained in my Procedures, all parties not just the attorneys must attend the settlement conference in person. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Tuesday, May 05, 2015. Should the parties resolve the litigation before the conference date, they must notify the Court in writing immediately. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 5/12/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/10/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/6/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER: WHEREAS a conference was held in this matter on March 6, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED: 1. A jury trial will be held on July 20, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. The final pretrial conference will be held on July 15, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. 2. The parties Final Pretrial Order shall be filed no later than July 8, 2015. Motions in limine shall be filed no later than June 24, 2015. Responses shall be due July 1, 2015. 3. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Netburn for a settlement conference. Within one week after the completion of the settlement conference, the parties shall submit a joint letter notifying the Court whether settlement efforts were successful. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 6/24/2015. Responses due by 7/1/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Pretrial Order due by 7/8/2015. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/6/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Richard Fenton on behalf of Gene Ragusa. (Fenton, Christopher) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Patrick Mitchell on behalf of Gene Ragusa. (Mitchell, Michael) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 62 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Request GRANTED. The conference scheduled for February 27, 2015, is ADJOURNED to March 6, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendants is directed to notify Plaintiff of this change, and the Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Status Conference set for 3/6/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/9/2015) (mro) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James F. Horton dated February 5, 2015. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The conference scheduled for February 6, 2015, is ADJOURNED to February 27, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se party. Defendants' counsel is directed to contact Plaintiff to provide him with notice of this Order. ( Status Conference set for 2/27/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/4/2015) (mro) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER. On December 9, Plaintiff requested that the Court seek a different pro bono counsel. The Court agrees to make one more attempt at locating pro bono counsel. Plaintiff is cautioned that if the Court locates a second pro bono counsel and Plaintiff declines the second offer, then he will be required to locate his own counsel or proceed to trial pro se. Plaintiff is further advised that the Court's website contains information on locating pro bono counsel should he wish to find his own counsel. That information can be found at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/courtrules_prose.php?prose=attorney. The deadline for Plaintiff to submit his Pretrial Statement is held in abeyance pending further order of this Court. If no counsel has appeared on behalf of Plaintiff by January 30, 2015, a status conference in this matter will be held on February 6, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. to set a trial date. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se party. (Status Conference set for 2/6/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/31/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gene Ragusa, dated 12/17/14 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court provide him with a second referral for pro bono counsel; that the submission of his Pretrial Statement remain in abeyance; and that his jury trial remain adjourned until he is able to obtain suitable counsel. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(sc) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: WHEREAS On November 7, the pro se Plaintiff informed the Court that he would like the Court to request pro bono counsel; WHEREAS on November 18, 2014, the Court granted Plaintiff's application; WHEREAS no attorney has appeared on Plaintiff's behalf; and WHEREAS Plaintiff's pretrial statement is due on December 19, 2014; it is hereby ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiff to submit his Pretrial Statement is held in abeyance. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff notify the Court no later than December 19, 2014, whether he still wishes for the Court to seek pro bono counsel or intends to proceed pro se. The deadline for Defendants to file their Pretrial Statement, the Final Pretrial Conference, and the January 19, 2015, jury trial are ADJOURNED sine die. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se party. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/9/2014) (mro) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: WHEREAS on November 7, 2014, the pro se Plaintiff informed the Court that he would like the Court to request pro bono counsel, Plaintiff's application is GRANTED. If an attorney volunteers, the attorney will contact Plaintiff directly. Of course, if an attorney offers to take the case, it is entirely Plaintiff's decision whether to retain that attorney or not. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se party. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/18/2014) (mro) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gene Ragusa dated 11/7/14 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court request pro bono counsel to represent him at trial in this action. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(sc) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: WHEREAS the parties appeared for a status conference on October 1, 2014, it is hereby ORDERED: Plaintiff's claims against the City of New York and certain high-level officials pursuant to Monell v. Department of Social Services of the City of New York, 436 U.S. 658 (1978), shall be bifurcated from his claims against the individually-named police officers. Plaintiff's request to depose Raymond Kelly, former Commissioner of the New York City Police Department, is DENIED. A jury trial in this matter will be held on January 19, 2015. No later than December 19, 2014, Plaintiff shall submit a Pretrial Statement containing the following as set forth herein... The Final Pretrial Conference will be held on January 14, 2015, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The Clerk of Court is requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se party. (See Order) (Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/2/2014) The Clerks Office Has Mailed Copies. (ja) Modified on 10/3/2014 (ja). (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status conference in this matter shall be held on October 1, 2014, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The parties should come prepared to set a date for trial. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se party and note service on the docket. (Status Conference set for 10/1/2014 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.)(Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/2/2014) (djc) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from James F. Horton dated August 29, 2014 re: Status Update. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court directs the parties to file a letter updating the Court on the status of this action by August 29, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 8/19/2014) Copies Mailed by Chambers. (ajs) Modified on 8/21/2014 (ajs). (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Gene Ragusa, dated 4/8/14 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court grant him an extension of time until 4/15/14 in which to prepare and submit his status letter to the Court pursuant to the Court's Order dated 3/11/14. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(sc) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James F. Horton dated April 1, 2014 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The Court GRANTS the defendants' motion for a protective order barring the depositions of former Mayor Michael Bloomberg and former NYPD Commissioner Raymond Kelly, without prejudice to Ragusa making a future application for leave to depose these former high-ranking officials based upon new information showing that they had unique first-hand knowledge related to his claims, that the information sought cannot be obtained through less burdensome discovery requests, or other similarly exceptional circumstances. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/14/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (rjm) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 3/21/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. The parties are strongly encouraged to engage in good-faith settlement negotiations before the settlement conference and preferably before the submission to the Court of the Ex Parte Settlement Letter, which is to be submitted by Friday, March 14, 2014. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 3/11/2014) (tn) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Whereas this case has been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED that counsel and pro se parties review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Pro Se Cases (available at the Court's website, http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Caproni). After conferring with all pro se parties, counsel for all represented parties are further directed to submit a letter to the Court no later than April 1, 2014. Pro se parties may, but are not required to, submit an alternative proposal prior to the Conference. The parties should append the most recent complaint and the most recent scheduling order to the status letter. The letter must be filed on ECF in accordance with the Individual Rules. The status letter may not exceed 5 pages and must include the following as further set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/11/2014) (djc) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gene Ragusa, dated 3/8/14 re: Plaintiff requests, in the interest of justice, that the Court order the defendants' attorney to respond to the enclosed letter and Notices of Depostion(as indicated) on or before 3/17/14 and to produce the defendants, Michael Bloomberg and Raymond Kelly, for the taking of their depositions on or before 3/31/14 etc. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(sc) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from James F. Horton dated March 7, 2014 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER:..regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/15/2014) (ama) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 42 Letter, filed by Michael Bloomberg, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Kevin Dimino, Mathew Perone, City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' time to respond to the Court's December 31, 2013 order is extended to February 19, 2014. SO ORDERED, ( Responses due by 2/19/2014) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 1/15/2014) (ama) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from James F. Horton dated January 14, 2014 re: Stipulation and Protective Order. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Protective Order for the Court's Endorsement)(Horton, James) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Accordingly, information and documents concerning the defendant officers prior misconduct shall be produced by January 14, 2014, upon the execution by the parties or order by the Court of a protective order.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/31/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 38 Letter, filed by Gene Ragusa. ENDORSEMENT: The request for an extension of discovery until January 17, 2014 is GRANTED. By December 27, 2013, the defendants shall submit to the Court for in camera review unredacted copies of documents that were attached to the plaintiff's December 17, 2013 letter. In addition, by the same date, the defendants shall file a letter explaining counsel's basis for the instruction to the deponents not to answer certain questions that were subsequently marked for a judicial ruling. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 1/17/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 12/20/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ja) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from James F. Horton dated December 20, 2013 re: Plaintiff's December 17, 2013 Letter. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Relevant Excerpts of Officer Khan's Deposition, # 2 Exhibit Relevant Excerpts of Officer Dimino's Deposition)(Horton, James) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gene Ragusa dated 12/17/2013 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court compel the Defendants to provide him with unredacted copies of the attached documents which were provided to him by Defendants' counsel. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(tro) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 Letter, filed by Gene Ragusa. ENDORSEMENT: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff's request to extend the close of all discovery to December 20, 2013. On that date, the parties shall submit a letter to the Court regarding the status of settlement negotiations and whether the parties would like to appear before the Court for a settlement conference., ( Discovery due by 12/20/2013.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/19/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (lmb) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Gene Ragusa, dated 11/16/13 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court grant him an extension of time to complete discovery from 11/18/13 to 12/20/13, because discovery is continuing on both sides. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(sc) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: In light of the plaintiff's notification to the Court that he has complied with his discovery obligations as identified in the defendants October 10, 2013 letter, the Court ADJOURNS the discovery conference set for October 24, 2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/23/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ft) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On October 15, 2013, the Honorable Colleen McMahon referred to me a specific discovery dispute. The Court schedules a discovery conference for October 24, 2013, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 219, Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, to address the defendants' October 10, 2013 letter requesting that the Court compel the plaintiff to respond to the defendants' first set of interrogatories and request for production of documents. Mr. Ragusa is to notify the Court by telephone at (212) 805-0286 if he complies with his discovery obligations as identified in the plaintiff's letter by October 23, 2013. In this event, the Court will adjourn the conference. (Discovery Hearing set for 10/24/2013 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 219, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 10/16/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ja) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute: Discovery Disputes. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/15/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from James F. Horton dated October 10, 2013 re: Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Discovery Requests. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: On June 13, 2013, the Honorable Colleen McMahon referred to me a specific discovery dispute. On July 15, 2013, the parties appeared by telephone for a discovery conference, and the Court ordered plaintiff to respond to defendants' specified questions. At that conference, defendants also informed the Court that they no longer intend to file a motion for summary judgment based on qualified immunity. Accordingly, the following schedule is set for the completion of discovery: Pleadings and Parties. The parties may amend the pleadings or join additional parties until August 19, 2013. Discovery. All discovery must be completed by November 18, 2013. The parties are directed to refer to Judge McMahon's Individual Rules of Practice for all other scheduling issues. Having resolved the specific discovery dispute, the Clerk of Court is directed to close the referral at Docket No. 28. Amended Pleadings due by 8/19/2013. Joinder of Parties due by 8/19/2013. Discovery due by 11/18/2013. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/19/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ja) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn, from James F. Horton, dated 6/19/2013, re: response to the Court's Order dated June 18, 2013, requesting that defendants provide the portions of plaintiff's deposition transcript relevant to the discovery dispute between the parties. Defendants request an extension of their time to respond to the Court's Order from June 19, 2013 until July 9, 2013. Defendants also request an adjournment of the conference relating to this dispute from June 21, 2013, until a date and time thereafter that is convenient to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' request is GRANTED. Defendants must produce to Chambers the portions of the deposition transcript that reflect the relevant questions and refusals to answer by July 9, 2013. The telephone conference scheduled for June 21, 2013, is rescheduled for July 15, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. Defendants must inform plaintiff about this change in the schedule. Moreover, defendants must contact plaintiff to arrange the phone call and, at the appointed time, call Chambers at (212) 805-0286 with plaintiff also on the line. ( Telephone Conference set for 7/15/2013 at 02:00 PM before Judge Colleen McMahon.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/20/2013) (ja) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: A telephone discovery conference is scheduled for June 21, 2013, at 3:00 p.m., to address defendants' letter requesting that the Court compel plaintiff to provide complete responses to questions he allegedly refused to answer during his deposition. By Wednesday, June 19, 2013, defendants shall provide the Court with the portions of the deposition transcript that reflect the relevant questions and refusals to answer. Because plaintiff is pro se, counsel for defendants should contact plaintiff to arrange the phone call and, at the appointed time, call Chambers at (212) 805-0286 with plaintiff also on the line. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/21/2013 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/17/2013) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ja) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Dispute: See letter from Assistant Corp. Counsel dated 6/12/13. Referred to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Copies Mailed By Chambers (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/13/2013) (cd) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment on Qualified Immunity Grounds. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, Mathew Perone.(Horton, James) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Summons and Amended Complaint served. Mathew Perone served on 4/30/2013, answer due 5/21/2013. Service was accepted by Sgt. Grullon, Badge #4631, New York City Police Dept. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (sc) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from James F. Horton dated 4/24/2013 re: Accordingly, defendants Dimino and Khan respectfully request that the Court extend their time to respond to the complaint until 21 days after Officer Perrone is served with process. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/26/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers(cd) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Kevin Dimino, Shield #8394, served on 4/12/2013, answer due 5/3/2013. Service was accepted by Sergeant Cornejo, Desk Sgt. at 123rd Precinct. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (sc) Modified on 4/15/2013 (sc). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Mathew Perone, Shield #3004. Attempted Service of Summons and Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 04/12/13. Desk Officer informed server that Mattehw Perrone was not presently employed at 61st Precinct. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (sc) Modified on 4/15/2013 (sc). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Ahmed Khan served on 4/12/2013, answer due 5/3/2013. Service was accepted by Officer Shafida, Desk Officer, 61st Precinct, NYC Police Dept. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (sc) (Main Document 21 replaced on 5/1/2013) (sc). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 2 Complaint against Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Kevin Dimino, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Ahmed Khan, New York City Police Officers John and Jane Doe, Mathew Perone.Document filed by Gene Ragusa. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by Gene Ragusa.(rdz) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Fredrick Horton on behalf of Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly (Horton, James) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Max McCann dated 3/1/2013 re: In response to the Court's Valentin Order, this office has now identified the following individual who, upon information and belief, may be served with process at the address set forth in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Process must be served within 45 days of March 1, 2013 - by April 15, 2013., ( Service due by 4/15/2013.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/4/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Max McCann dated 2/21/2013 re: I am an Assistant Corporation Counsel in the office of Michael A. Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, representing defendants City of New York, Mayor Bloomberg, and Commissioner Kelly ("defendants") in the above-referenced matter. The undersigned writes respectfully in response to the Court's Valentin Order dated October 23,2012, directing this office to provide the identities and service addresses of the three John Doe defendants named in the complaint. As set forth below, this office has identified two of the three John Does named in the complaint. In order to conti11ue our efforts to identify the third John Doe defendant, the undersigned respectfully requests a brief, one-week extension of our time to respond to the Court's Order. This is the undersigned's third request for an extension of time to respond to the Court's Order ENDORSEMENT: Granted and LAST. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/22/2013) (djc) Modified on 2/22/2013 (djc). Modified on 2/22/2013 (djc). (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Max McCann dated 01/23/2013 re: I am an Assistant Corporation Counsel in the Office of Michael A. Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, representing defendants City of New York, Mayor Bloomberg, and Commissioner Kelly ("defendants") in the above-referenced matter. The undersigned writes respectfully to request that the Court extend this office's time to respond to the Valentin Order from 01/23/2013, until 02/22/2013. ENDORSEMENT: Ok. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 01/24/2013) (jcs) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Raymond Kelly served on 11/19/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. Service was accepted by Dmitry Aronov. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (rdz) (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/28/2012) (rdz). (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok) served on 11/19/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. Service was accepted by Dmitry Aronov. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (rdz) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. City of New York served on 11/19/2012, answer due 12/10/2012. Service was accepted by Dmitry Aronov. Document filed by Gene Ragusa. (rdz) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Plaintiff shall provide to defendants, on or before January 7, 2013, (1) the precise location and time of the alleged incident and (2) a physical description of each unnamed defendant. Defendants are relieved of their obligation to comply with the October 22, 2012, Valentin Order until thirty (30) days after receipt of this information from plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/20/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers via Mail and ECF. (rjm) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Max McCann dated 12/17/2012 re: Counsel for the defendants requests that the Court compel plaintiff to provide counsel's office with the additional information necessary to identify the John Doe Defendants and extend their time to respond to the Court's Valentin Order until 30 days after plaintiff provides the requested information. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel: Please draft + submit an order for me to sign. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/18/2012) (mro) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly.(McCann, Max) (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Oliver McCann on behalf of Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly (McCann, Max) (Entered: 11/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED UNEXECUTED as to Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, Police Officers. Document filed by Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, New York City Police Officers John and Jane Doe. (Pinnock, Nadene) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to issue a Summons as to the City of New York, Police Commissioner Raymond Kelly, and Mayor Michael Bloomberg, and Plaintiff is directed to serve the Summons and Complaint upon the City of New York, Police Commissioner Raymond Kelly, and Mayor Michael Bloomberg within 120 days of the issuance of the Summons. If service has not been made within the 120 days, and Plaintiff fails to show good cause, in writing, why service has not been made, the Complaint may be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rules 4 and 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/22/2012) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (pl) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without payment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/19/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 10/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Se Acknowledgment Letter Mailed: Pro Se acknowledgment letter mailed to the plaintiff via USPS to the address noted on the Complaint on 10/16/2012. (laq) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg(Mayor of the City of New Yrok), Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Raymond Kelly, Raymond Kelly, New York City Police Officers John and Jane Doe. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(ft) (laq). (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Gene Ragusa.(ft) (laq). (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?