GRELL v. TRUMP
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00939

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2019 at 6:41 PM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD GRELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHARD GRELL

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD GRELL +1 850 960 0350
v.
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SALVATORE T. ALFANO +1 973 743 9390 stalfano@aol.com
Space HUGH J. BRACKEN +1 610 565 4776 hjbracken@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PETER S. PANTALEO

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard L. Posen +1 212 728 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roxane Sokolove Marenberg +1 202 861 3900 +1 202 689 7415 roxane.marenberg@piperrudnick.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allyson Newton Ho +1 214 466 4180 +1 214 466 4001 aho@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J. SHANE CREAMER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. SHANE CREAMER

Toggle Switch Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. BARRY +1 973 622 4444

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred Fisher Fielding +1 202 739 5560 +1 202 739 3001 fred.fielding@morganlewis.com
Space Michael E. Kenneally +1 202 739 5893 michael.kenneally@morganlewis.com
Space Jason R. Scherr +1 202 373 6709 jr.scherr@morganlewis.com
Space Eric W. Sitarchuk +1 215 963 5840 +1 215 963 5001 eric.sitarchuk@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SPRAGUE & SPRAGUE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RICHARD A. SPRAGUE +1 215 561 7681 rasprague@spragueandsprague.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stark & Stark PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN LEWIS LASKEY +1 609 945 7638 jlaskey@stark-stark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space Judith E. Coleman +1 202 637 5600 judith.coleman@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph A. Darrow +1 202 598 2445 joseph.a.darrow@usdoj.gov
Space Ethan Price Davis +1 202 514 9242 +1 202 616 8470 ethan.p.davis@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
Space Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Space David Bernard Glazer +1 415 744 6477 +1 415 744 6476 david.glazer@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher Robert Healy +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8470 christopher.healy@usdoj.gov
Space Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
Space Coby Healy Howell +1 503 727 1023 +1 503 727 1117 coby.howell@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Lanier Kade +1 202 616 8491 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.l.kade@usdoj.gov
Space REBECCA M. KOPPLIN +1 202 514 3953 rebecca.m.kopplin@usdoj.gov
Space Jacqueline Margaret Leonard +1 202 305 0493 +1 202 305 0506 jacqueline.leonard@usdoj.gov
Space Joel Lunsford McElvain +1 202 514 2988 +1 202 616 8202 joel.mcelvain@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Romney Sharpe Philpott +1 202 305 0258 romney.philpott@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Samuel Press +1 202 305 0106 +1 202 305 7000 joshua.press@usdoj.gov
Space SCOTT WEBSTER REID +1 215 861 8358 scott.reid@usdoj.gov
Space Brad P. Rosenberg +1 202 514 3374 +1 202 616 8460 brad.rosenberg@usdoj.gov
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
Space Nikhel Sus +1 202 514 2071 +1 202 616 8470 nikhel.s.sus@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Irwin Warden +1 202 616 5084 +1 202 616 8460 andrew.warden@usdoj.gov
Space Kristina Ann Wolfe +1 202 353 4519 kristina.wolfe@usdoj.gov
Space Kathryn L. Wyer +1 202 616 8475 kathryn.wyer@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES MATTIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Secretary of Defense Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Kathryn Celia Davis +1 202 616 8298 +1 202 616 8470 Kathryn.C.Davis@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Stephen McCoy Elliott +1 202 305 8177 stephen.elliott@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Colin A. Kisor , +1 202 532 4331 colin.kisor@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Elianis N. Perez +1 202 616 9124 elianis.perez@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense Carlton Frederick Sheffield +1 202 532 4737 carlton.f.sheffield@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense NATHAN MICHAEL SWINTON +1 202 305 7667 +1 202 616 8470 nathan.m.swinton@usdoj.gov
Secretary of Defense SARAH L VUONG +1 202 532 4281 sarah.l.vuong@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOSEPH DUNFORD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Chairman, Joint Chief of Staffs Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "MITCH MCCONNELL"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Senator - R-KY Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
No Logo Paul, Ryan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
R-WI William Bullock Pittard, IV +1 202 640 2850 wpittard@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
R-WI Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM OPINION re 22 Order granting Defendants' motion to dismiss, granting Defendants' motion to strike the remaining complaint, and granting Plaintiff to permission to re-file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 9/12/2018. (lccrc2)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Denied
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  WITHDRAWAL of Motion by RICHARD GRELL . (GRELL, RICHARD)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: 1/5/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by RICHARD GRELL (GRELL, RICHARD)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/29/2017, Entered: 12/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, MITCH MCCONNELL, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Field, Brian)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP (Field, Brian)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by RICHARD GRELL. (GRELL, RICHARD)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by RICHARD GRELL (GRELL, RICHARD)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Order advising plaintiff to respond by November 6, 2017, to defendants' motion to dismiss or risk summary dismissal of the case on what may be treated as a conceded motion (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/2/17.(ah)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (see written order for details). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/2/17.(ah)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Appoint Counsel by RICHARD GRELL (GRELL, RICHARD) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, MITCH MCCONNELL, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, MITCH MCCONNELL, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/7/17., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/12/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/11/2017.) (td) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Supplemental Notice of Jury Demand by RICHARD GRELL (td) Modified on 6/7/2017 (td). "Let this be filed" by Judge Christopher C. Cooper. Modified per chambers on 6/8/2017 (td). (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, MITCH MCCONNELL, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP with Jury Demand.(GRELL, RICHARD)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION for CM/ECF Password by RICHARD GRELL (td) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: 5/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        SUMMONS (7) Issued as to JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, MITCH MCCONNELL, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zrdj) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2017: # 1 Corrected -James Mattis) (zrdj).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD GRELL (jf) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                COMPLAINT against JOSEPH DUNFORD, JAMES MATTIS, MITCH MCCONNELL, PAUL RYAN, DONALD J. TRUMP (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by RICHARD GRELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 213 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?