Oper/Eng. Pension Fd v. Md. Circuit Board, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-02002-WEB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Downs +1 202 424 7500 +1 202 424 7643

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milissa Ann Murray +1 202 373 6511 +1 202 424 7643 m.murray@bingham.com
No Logo Anita Jacobs, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George W. White, Jr. +8251 825 825 1050

Toggle Switch Represented by fgow.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Omer Foard +1 410 296 1440 +1 410 823 7037 pfoard@fgow.com
v.
No Logo Anita Jacobs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George W. White, Jr. +8251 825 825 1050

Toggle Switch Represented by fgow.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Omer Foard +1 410 296 1440 +1 410 823 7037 pfoard@fgow.com
No Logo Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation, Defendant
No Logo National Circuits, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Shopco Reisterstown Associates Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Y. Hatchette +1 410 333 8341

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Feinblatt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence S Greenwald +1 410 576 4000 +1 410 576 4269 lgreenwald@gfrlaw.com
No Logo Signet Bank/maryland, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie E. Goldsborough, III +1 410 347 8700
Space Carol A Zuckerman +1 410 347 8700 +1 410 752 7092

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Ryan, Jr. +1 410 347 8741 +1 410 223 4161 wryan@wtplaw.com
No Logo Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M. Downs +1 202 424 7500 +1 202 424 7643

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Milissa Ann Murray +1 202 373 6511 +1 202 424 7643 m.murray@bingham.com
No Logo Anita Jacobs, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George W. White, Jr. +8251 825 825 1050

Toggle Switch Represented by fgow.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Omer Foard +1 410 296 1440 +1 410 823 7037 pfoard@fgow.com
No Logo Shopco Reisterstown Associates Limited Partnership, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Y. Hatchette +1 410 333 8341

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Feinblatt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence S Greenwald +1 410 576 4000 +1 410 576 4269 lgreenwald@gfrlaw.com
No Logo Signet Bank/maryland, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie E. Goldsborough, III +1 410 347 8700
Space Carol A Zuckerman +1 410 347 8700 +1 410 752 7092

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Ryan, Jr. +1 410 347 8741 +1 410 223 4161 wryan@wtplaw.com
No Logo Anita Jacobs, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Electronics, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo National Circuits, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Robert G. Jacobs, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Azrael, Gann & Franz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Albert Azrael +1 410 821 6800 +1 410 821 1265 JAzrael@agflaw.com
No Logo Shopco Reisterstown Associates Limited Partnership, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joy Y. Hatchette +1 410 333 8341

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon Feinblatt LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence S Greenwald +1 410 576 4000 +1 410 576 4269 lgreenwald@gfrlaw.com
No Logo Signet Bank/maryland, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie E. Goldsborough, III +1 410 347 8700
Space Carol A Zuckerman +1 410 347 8700 +1 410 752 7092

Toggle Switch Represented by Whiteford Taylor Preston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William F. Ryan, Jr. +1 410 347 8741 +1 410 223 4161 wryan@wtplaw.com
Office Baltimore
Filed 7/24/1990
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 9607 Real Property Tort to Land
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Other
County Baltimore City
Terminated 11/29/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (254) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 204 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/5/1998 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT and Dismissal of action and APPROVAL J. BLACK dated 1/5/98. (c/m & microfilmed 1/5/98) (slf, Deputy Clerk)
    LREF
    Blank 203 Filed: 12/18/1996, Entered: 12/19/1996 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER granting [202-1] motion of Plaintiff To Liquidate Declaratory Judgment as to Cercla Response Costs Incurred Through July 1996; "ENTERING" Judgment against National Circuits, Inc. and Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation, jointly and severally, in favor of Plaintiff in the Amount of One Million One Hundred Thirteen Thousand Seventy-Three Dollars and Ninety Cents ($1,113,073.90) plus interest at the legal rate from the date hereof until this Judgment is fully satisfied; "DIRECTING" that the amount of Judgment granted represents recoverable CERCLA response costs incurred by Plaintiff through July 31, 1996 which have not been recovered from any other potentially responsible parties which are not duplicative of those response costs which formed the basis of this Court's November 1, 1993 Order of Judgment; and "DIRECTING" this Court shall retain Jurisdiction over this matter for purposes of liquidating any further response costs. ( signed by Sr. Judge Walter E. Black Jr. 12/16/96 ) (c/m 12/18/96-cl) (JB 5.45%) (cag, Deputy Clerk)
      LREF
      Blank 202 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996, Terminated: 12/18/1996 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
      MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd To Liquidate Declaratory Judgment as to Cercla Response Costs Incurred Through July 1996 and Exhibits A-C. (c/s) (Corrected Exhibits Received 11/7/96) (cag, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/08/1996
        LREF
        Blank 201 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) dated November 24, 1993 "CLOSING" the above-captioned case administratively. (c/m 12/2/93 cmh) (microfilmed 12/3/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
          LREF
          Blank 200 Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 CorrespondenceCourt Filing
          CORRESPONDENCE from Attorney Jonathan A. Azrael to Chief Judge Black dated November 22, 1993 advising the Court that Robert G. Jacobs does not intend to seek a lifting of the automatic stay which is in effect as to Mr. Jacobs' suit against Atlantic Electronics, Inc. (Received in Chambers 11/23/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Add and Terminate Judges
            CASE NO LONGER REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 11/29/1993, Entered: 12/3/1993 Terminated Case
              Case closed (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                LREF
                Blank 199 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER OF JUDGMENT dated November 2, 1993 granting [191-1] motion of Shopco Reisterstown Associates to Determine Damages for Default Judgment against Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc.; and "ENTERING" judgment against Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. in the amount of Six Hundred Twenty-Five Thousand Dollars ($625,000), plus interest at the legal rate until the judgment is fully satisfied. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/3/93 am) (microfilmed 11/15/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                  LREF
                  Blank 198 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER OF JUDGMENT dated November 2, 1993 granting [190-1] motion of Anita F. Jacobs for Default Judgment against Nat'l. Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Boards Corporation; and "ENTERING" judgment against National Circuits, Inc. and Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation in the amount of Sixty Thousand Dollars ($60,000), plus interest at the legal rate until the judgment is fully satisfied. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/3/93 am) (microfilmed 11/15/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                    LREF
                    Blank 197 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER OF JUDGMENT dated November 2, 1993 granting [185-1] motion of Robert G. Jacobs for Default Judgment against Nat'l Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Boards Corporation; and "ENTERING" judgment against National Circuits, Inc. and Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation in the amount of Six Hundred Thousand Dollars ($600,000), plus interest at the legal rate until the judgment is fully satisfied. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/3/93 am) (microfilmed 11/15/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                      LREF
                      Blank 196 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER OF JUDGMENT dated November 1, 1993 granting [192-1] motion of Plaintiff for Default Judgment against Nat'l. Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Boards Corporation; "ENTERING" judgment against NCI and MCBC, jointly and severally, in favor of Operating Engineers Local No. 37 Pension Fund in the amount of One Million Nine Hundred and Thirty-Nine Thousand Four Hundred and Twenty-One Dollars and Seventy-Three Cents ($1,939,421.73), plus interest at the legal rate from the date hereof until the judgment is fully satisfied; "DIRECTING" that MCBC and NCI are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiff for any and all necessary future costs of response incurred by Plaintiff consistent with The National Contingency Plan; and "DIRECTING" that this Court shall retain jurisdiction over this matter for purposes of liquidating this judgment for future response costs after such costs have been actually incurred. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/3/93 am) (microfilmed 11/15/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/15/1993
                        LREF
                        Blank 195 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER (Marginal) dated November 2, 1993 denying as moot [29-1] motion of Atlantic Electronics, Inc. for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/3/93 am) (For Pleading #195 - See Pleading #29) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                          LREF
                          Blank 194 Filed: 11/4/1993, Entered: 11/15/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER (Marginal) dated November 2, 1993 denying as moot [27-1] motion of Shopco Reisterstown Associates for Default Judgment against Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/3/93 am) (For Pleading #194 - See Pleading #27) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                            LREF
                            Blank 193 Filed: 10/6/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 10/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER dated October 5, 1993 granting [193-1] motion by Robert G. Jacobs for Warren K. Rich to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs, attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs, attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs, attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs, attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 10/6/93 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                              LREF
                              Blank 193 Filed: 10/6/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 10/6/1993 Motion to Withdraw
                              MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Warren K. Rich to Withdraw as Attorney (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                LREF
                                Blank 192 Filed: 9/30/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd for Default Judgment against Nat'l. Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Boards Corporation , and Exhibits A through G. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 191 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                  MOTION by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Determine Damages for Default Judgment , and Affidavit of Roy Praver in Support of. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 190 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                    MOTION by Anita Jacobs for Default Judgment against Nat'l. Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Boards Corporation , and Affidavit of Anita F. Jacobs in Support of Default Judgment. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 189 Filed: 9/29/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993 Motion to Withdraw
                                      MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Inez Smith Reid to Withdraw as Attorney (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 188 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 9/27/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER dated September 24, 1993 granting [188-1] motion of Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of its Third-Party Complaint against Atlantic Electronics, Inc., defendant and third-party defendant. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 9/28/93 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 188 Filed: 9/27/1993, Entered: 10/8/1993, Terminated: 9/27/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                          MOTION by Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of its Third-Party Complaint against Atlantic Electronics, Inc., defendant and third-party defendant (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 187 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: 9/27/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [186-1] motion of plaintiff to Dismiss without prejudice its second amendec complaint against Atlantic Electronics, Inc., with each side to bear its own costs ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. September 23, 1993). (c/m 9/24/93-cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 186 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: 9/27/1993, Terminated: 9/24/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Dismiss its second amendec complaint against Atlantic Electronics, Inc., . (c/s) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 185 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: 9/27/1993, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert G. Jacobs for Default Judgment against Nat'l Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Board . (c/s to Mag. Chasanow and chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 9/24/1993, Entered: 9/27/1993 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Robert G. Jacobs by Jonathan A. Azrael. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/20/1993, Entered: 8/25/1993 Status Conference
                                                    Status conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 7/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER dated June 30, 1993 granting [182-1] motion by Robert G. Jacobs, Anita Jacobs and Shopco Reisterstown Associates Limited Partnership for Voluntary Dismissal of the cross-claims by Shopco Reisterstown Associates Limited Partnership against Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs with prejudice; the cross-claims by Robert G. Jacobs against Shopco with prejudice; and the cross-claims by Anita Jacobs against Robert G. Jacobs and Shopco with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 7/1/93 cr) (microfilmed 7/6/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 6/24/1993, Entered: 6/29/1993, Terminated: 6/30/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs, Anita Jacobs, Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice their cross-claims with each party to bear his own costs (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 6/24/1993, Entered: 6/28/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER "granting" [180-1] motion for Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice of its Second Amended Complaint as against Anita Jacobs, Defendant, and solely as to A. Jacobs and A. Counterclaim against Operating Engineers; and with each side to bear its own costs ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 6/24/93 cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 6/21/1993, Entered: 6/22/1993, Terminated: 6/24/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            MOTION by Operating Engineers Local No. 37 Pension Fund for Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice of its Second Amended Complaint as against Anita Jacobs, Defendant, and solely as to A. Jacobs and A. Jacobs' Counterclaim against Operating Engineers (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 4/13/1993, Entered: 4/16/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [178-1] motion to Dismiss its Second Amended Complaint as to Robert G.Jacobs defendant, solely ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m Chambers) (slf, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 04/19/1993
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 4/7/1993, Entered: 4/16/1993, Terminated: 4/13/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Dismiss its JSecond Amended Complaint as to Robert G.Jacobs defendant, solely (slf, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 1/19/1993, Entered: 1/25/1993 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER dated January 15, 1993 setting Bench trial set for 10:00 7/12/93 in Courtroom 7A ; Pretrial conference will be held in Chambers for 5:00 7/1/93 ; Pretrial order to be submitted in Chambers on or before 6/25/93 ; ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/1993, Entered: 1/22/1993 Status Conference
                                                                    Status conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 176 Filed: 12/31/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER dated December 30, 1992 granting [175-1] motion by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd and Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Voluntary Dismissal; "DISMISSING" the second amended complaint with prejudice as to Shopco Reisterstown Associates ("Shopco"), and solely as to Shopco; and "DISMISSING" Shopco's counterclaim with prejudice, each side to bear its own costs. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 1/4/93 cr) (microfilmed 1/6/93) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 175 Filed: 12/30/1992, Entered: 1/6/1993, Terminated: 12/31/1992 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Voluntary Dismissal (c/s) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 174 Filed: 10/22/1992, Entered: 10/28/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) dated October 22, 1992 "CONTINUING" Phase I of the bifurcated trial in the above-captioned action scheduled to commence on November 2, 1992; "CANCELLING" the pretrial schedule; "DIRECTING" that the Scheduling Order as amended from time to time and any other pending matter be and the same are hereby held in abeyance until further order of Court; and "DIRECTING" that the parties shall report back to the Court by December 1, 1992 as to whether and to what extent a new trial date and pretrial schedule will be required, as well as any other related matters to be addressed. (c/m 10/22/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/19/1992, Entered: 10/21/1992 Telephone Conference
                                                                            Telephone conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 10/16/1992, Entered: 10/21/1992 Objection to Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                                                                              OBJECTION by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Magistrate Judge's Memorandum and Order of October 6, 1992. (c/s Magistrate Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 172 Filed: 10/6/1992, Entered: 10/9/1992 Document Sealed
                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 10/6/1992, Entered: 10/9/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) dated October 6, 1992 "DIRECTING" that the Clerk place this material under seal; and "DIRECTING" that the envelope may only be opened on Order of Court. (c/m 10/6/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 10/6/1992, Entered: 10/8/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) dated October 6, 1992 "DENYING" Motion to Compel Robert Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions. (c/m 10/6/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 10/5/1992, Entered: 10/8/1992 Transcript
                                                                                      Transcript of proceedings before the Court (Black, C.J.) on April 3, 1992. (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 168 Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: 10/2/1992 Request for AdmissionsCourt Filing
                                                                                        REQUESTS for Admissions and Exhibit A by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 167 Filed: 9/24/1992, Entered: 10/2/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) dated September 23, 1992 "EXTENDING" the deadline for filing Requests for Admissions to September 30, 1992 between the parties Operating Engineers Local No. 37 Pension Fund, Shopco Reisterstown Associates Limited Partnership, Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs; "DIRECTING" that any Response to be filed to a Request for Admissions shall be filed no later than October 23, 1992; and "DIRECTING" that except to the extent modified herein the Scheduling Order as amended from time to time shall remain unchanged. (c/m 9/24/92 pjc) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 166 Filed: 8/31/1992, Entered: 9/2/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER "GRANTING" Mr. Jacob's request for 2 week entension; and "DIRECTING" counsel any further submission must be received in chambers no later than 09/16/92, as therein set forth. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m chambers) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: 8/20/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER dated August 17, 1992 granting [161-1] motion by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions; granting [162-1] motion of Oper/Eng. Pension Fd. to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions; and "DIRECTING" that Mr. Jacobs is to appear and answer questions at a continued deposition within 30 days unless counsel for Mr. Jacobs submit to the undersigned within 10 days a supporting memorandum outlining the context and the basis for the assertion of the privilege. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m 8/17/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 8/7/1992, Entered: 8/11/1992 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                REPLY by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Opposition of Defendant Robert G. Jacobs to [161-1] motion of Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 163 Filed: 7/24/1992, Entered: 7/28/1992 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [161-1] motion of Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions, and [162-1] motion of Operating Engineers Local No. 37 Pension Fund to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 7/23/1992, Entered: 7/28/1992 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION with memorandum in support by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 161 Filed: 7/10/1992, Entered: 7/13/1992, Terminated: 8/18/1992 Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions and Exhibits 1, 2 and 3. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 160 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                        ANSWER by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Defendant Robert G. Jacobs' [151-1] counter claim. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 159 Filed: 5/14/1992, Entered: 5/21/1992 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                          ANSWER by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Defendant Anita Jacobs' [155-1] counter claim. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 158 Filed: 5/8/1992, Entered: 5/12/1992 Appeal Transcript Request
                                                                                                            Transcript of proceedings before the Court (Black, C.J.) on April 3, 1992. (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 157 Filed: 5/7/1992, Entered: 5/12/1992 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER setting Bench trial set for 10:00 11/2/92 in Courtroom 7A ; Pretrial conference for 4:30 10/22/92 ; Pretrial order to be submitted in Chambers on or before 10/16/92 ; The deposition of defendant Robert G. Jacobs shall be continued and completed on or before 6/30/92. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/6/1992, Entered: 5/8/1992 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                Telephone conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 4/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER dated April 21, 1992 granting [112-1] motion to Bifurcate ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/22/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 155 Filed: 4/22/1992, Entered: 4/28/1992 CounterclaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    COUNTERCLAIM by Anita Jacobs against Oper/Eng. Pension Fd (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 4/21/1992, Entered: 4/23/1992 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                      CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. (c/m 4/21/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 153 Filed: 4/21/1992, Entered: 4/23/1992 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                        CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. (c/m 4/21/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 152 Filed: 4/21/1992, Entered: 4/23/1992 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                                                                                                          CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. (c/m 4/21/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 4/16/1992, Entered: 4/21/1992 CounterclaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM by Robert G. Jacobs against Oper/Eng. Pension Fd. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER dated April 6, 1992 denying [144-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order; and "DIRECTING" that, if appropriate, Defendants Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs shall file their counterclaims against Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER dated April 6, 1992 denying [143-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order, [141-1] order ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated April 6, 1992 granting in part, denying in part [122-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates as therein set forth. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER dated April 6, 1992 granting [117-2] motion Declaration of Liability ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated April 6, 1992 granting [117-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER dated April 6, 1992 denying [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 4/7/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER dated April 6, 1992 granting in part, denying in part [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates as therein set forth. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/8/92 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/3/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 Remark
                                                                                                                                            Oral Opinion rendered by the Court. (Reporter: Simpkins) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/3/1992, Entered: 4/15/1992 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                              Motion hearing re: [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment, [117-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [117-2] motion Declaration of Liability, [122-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [143-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order, [141-1] order, [144-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1992, Entered: 3/5/1992 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                Tele-conference held before Black, J. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 149 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 2/24/1992 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [143-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order, [141-1] order, [144-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 148 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 2/24/1992 Answer to CrossclaimCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by Robert G. Jacobs to second amended crossclaim: [60-1] cross claim. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 147 Filed: 2/18/1992, Entered: 2/24/1992 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [143-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order, [141-1] order, [144-1] motion for Reconsideration of [141-1] order. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 2/12/1992, Entered: 2/20/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Shopco Reist/Assoc., Robert G. Jacobs Regarding Rescheduling of the Continuation of Deposition of Robert G. Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 2/10/1992, Entered: 2/18/1992 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to second amended crossclaim: [60-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 1/30/1992, Entered: 2/9/1992, Terminated: 4/7/1992 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Reconsideration of [141-1] order (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 1/30/1992, Entered: 2/9/1992 Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Reconsideration of [141-1] order, [141-1] order (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 142 Filed: 1/27/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 Answer to Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Anita Jacobs to second amended complaint. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 02/07/1992
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [100-1] motion to Reopen Discovery; and "DIRECTING" that the continued deposition be held at a mutually convenient time within the next 30 days. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m 1/24/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [103-2] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m 1/24/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying [103-1] motion for an Order to Limit Scope of His Deposition Examination ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m 1/24/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [99-1] motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Plaintiff Robert Jacobs ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m 1/24/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 1/24/1992, Entered: 2/7/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [91-1] motion to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions ( signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow ) (c/m 1/24/92 mmp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 1/6/1992, Entered: 1/13/1992 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Robert G. Jacobs to Opposition of Plaintiff to Rule 56(a) (SIC) [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [122-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates and Exhibit A. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 1/2/1992, Entered: 1/13/1992 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Opposition of Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs to [117-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [117-2] Declaration of Liability, Memorandum, Exhibit A and Exhibit 1. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 1/2/1992, Entered: 1/13/1992 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Oppositions of Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs to [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibit 1. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 1/2/1992, Entered: 1/13/1992 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Robert G. Jacobs to Opposition of Defendant Shopco to [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates and Exhibits A through E. (c/s Mag. Judge Chasanow and Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 12/24/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 01/28/1992
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 12/24/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [122-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates, Memorandum, Exhibits 1 through 13 and Appendix I with Exhibits A and B. (c/s) (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 12/23/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Anita Jacobs in opposition to [117-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Attachment. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 12/23/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Anita Jacobs in opposition to [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 1/2/1992 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE dated December 18, 1991 to Magistrate Judge Deborah K. Chasanow for hearing and determination of nondispositive pretrial matters, specifically, including papers 91, 99, 100 and 103. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 12/31/91 hsg) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER (Marginal) dated December 17, 1991 denying [107-1] motion for Protective Order as moot, in accordance with discussion at status conference. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 12/19/91 by Chambers) (For Pleading #131 - See Pleading #107) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment, Exhibits A and B and Exhibits 1 through 25. (c/s) (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [117-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [117-2] motion Declaration of Liability, Proposed Opposition of Defendant Robert G. Jacobs to Motion of Defendant Shopco for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1 through 17. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [116-1] motion for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 12/19/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (letter) dated December 18, 1991 granting [124-1] motion to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may respond to Motion of Defendant Robert Jacobs for Summary Judgment, and Response to Motion reset to 12/23/91 for [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates , and Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/10/92 for [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates; "DIRECTING" counsel that the Court deems it appropriate for Defendant Anita Jacobs to file an answer to the Second Amended Complaint as therein set forth; and "DIRECTING" counsel that in the event any rulings by the Magistrate Judge result in additional discovery in this case which require supplemental briefing of the substantive issues, any such supplement briefs shall be filed on or before February 13, 1992 as therein set forth ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m by Chambers) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 12/18/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [115-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [122-1] motion for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates and Exhibits 1 through 4. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/17/1991, Entered: 12/30/1991 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Courtroom Status conference held before Black, C.J. (Tape: Toomey) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 125 Filed: 12/16/1991, Entered: 12/16/1991, Terminated: 11/29/1993 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [124-1] motion to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may respond to Motion of Defendant Robert Jacobs for Summary Judgment and Exhibits A and B. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 124 Filed: 12/11/1991, Entered: 12/16/1991, Terminated: 12/19/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may respond to Motion of Defendant Robert Jacobs for Summary Judgment and Exhibits A and B. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 123 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [112-1] motion to Bifurcate (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 122 Filed: 12/9/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Anita Jacobs for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 121 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Robert G. Jacobs to Opposition of Plaintiff to [100-1] motion to Reopen Discovery and Exhibit A. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 120 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Robert G. Jacobs to Opposition of Plaintiff Operating Engineers and Defendant Shopco to [103-1] motion for an Order to Limit Scope of His Deposition Examination, [103-2] motion for Protective Order and Exhibits A, B and C. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 119 Filed: 12/6/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Anita Jacobs to [112-1] motion to Bifurcate (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 12/5/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to [112-1] motion to Bifurcate (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 117 Filed: 12/2/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd for Partial Summary Judgment , and Declaration of Liability and Appendix A Index to Exhibits 1 through 37 and Appendix B Index to Unreported Cases (Exhibits A, B and C). (c/s) (Filed Separately in 3 Envelopes) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 116 Filed: 12/2/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Summary Judgment and Exhibits #1 through 12. (c/s) (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 115 Filed: 12/2/1991, Entered: 12/10/1991 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert G. Jacobs for Summary Judgment as to the Liability Under CERCLA, of Plaintiff Operating Engineers Local #37 Pension Fund; Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. (During the Ownership of Joseph Powers and John Maas); and Shopco Reisterstown Associates and Appendix of Exhibits #1 through 26. (c/s) (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 114 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/27/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Opposition of Robert G. Jacobs to [99-1] motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Plaintiff Robert Jacobs, Memorandum and Exhibits A through F. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/27/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [103-1] motion for an Order to Limit Scope of His Deposition Examination, [103-2] motion for Protective Order, Memorandum and Exhibits A through F. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/27/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [100-1] motion to Reopen Discovery, Memorandum and Exhibits A through S. (c/s) (Filed Separately) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991, Terminated: 4/22/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION with memorandum in support by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Bifurcate (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [100-1] motion to Reopen Discovery and Exhibits 1, 2 and 3. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to opposition of Robert G. Jacobs to [91-1] motion to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 11/22/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [103-1] motion for an Order to Limit Scope of His Deposition Examination, [103-2] motion for Protective Order (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 11/21/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Shopco Reist/Assoc., Anita Jacobs, Robert G. Jacobs and Exhibit A. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 11/20/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [107-1] motion for Protective Order Relating to Deposition of Joseph G. Peeler and Exhibits 1 and 2. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 107 Filed: 11/19/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991, Terminated: 12/19/1991 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Protective Order and Attachment. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 106 Filed: 11/18/1991, Entered: 11/25/1991, Terminated: 11/18/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Withdraw [92-1] motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Motions for Summary Judgment Deadline by Forty-Five (45) Days , and to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may file Supplemental Answers to Shopco's Interrogatories (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 11/18/1991, Entered: 11/26/1991, Terminated: 11/18/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dated November 17, 1991 granting [106-1] joint motion to Withdraw [92-1] motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Motions for Summary Judgment Deadline by Forty-Five (45) Days and granting [106-2] joint motion to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may file Supplemental Answers to Shopco's Interrogatories on or before November 11, 1991. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/19/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 11/12/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [99-1] motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Plaintiff Robert Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 11/8/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Robert G. Jacobs in support of [103-1] motion for an Order to Limit Scope of His Deposition Examination, [103-2] motion for Protective Order and Exhibits A through F. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 11/8/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Robert G. Jacobs in opposition to [91-1] motion to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions and Exhibits A through F. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 11/8/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for an Order to Limit Scope of His Deposition Examination , and for Protective Order (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 11/6/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER (Marginal) dated November 1, 1991 granting [97-1] motion to Extend Time for Taking the Deposition of Joseph G. Peeler, Jr. to 11/30/91, in accordance with telephone conference. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/6/91 cr) (For Pleading #102 - See Pleading #97) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 11/6/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER (Marginal) dated October 31, 1991 withdrawing [92-1] motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Motions for Summary Judgment Deadline by Forty-Five (45) Days during telephone conference. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 11/6/91 cr) (For Pleading #101 - See Pleading #92, Page 2) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 11/5/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991, Terminated: 1/24/1992 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert G. Jacobs to Reopen Discovery and Exhibits A, B and C. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant/Cross-Defendant/Cross-Plaintiff Robert Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Shopco Reist/Assoc., Anita Jacobs, Robert G. Jacobs and Exhibit A. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/1/1991, Entered: 11/13/1991 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Telephone conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 10/31/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991, Terminated: 11/6/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs to Extend Time for Taking the Deposition of Joseph G. Peeler, Jr. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/31/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Telephone conference held before Black, C.J. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 10/29/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to opposition to [92-1] motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Motions for Summary Judgment Deadline and Exhibit A. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 10/28/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [92-1] motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Motions for Summary Judgment Deadline and Exhibits 1 and 2. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 10/25/1991, Entered: 11/7/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) dated October 23, 1991 "DISMISSING" with prejudice all claims filed by Local #37 against Signet; "DIRECTING" that Signet herein releases any and all claims against Local #37, Shopco, and/or Anita Jacobs, and/or each of their respective counsel, for Rule 11 Sanctions and any other claims arising out of the prosecution of this action; "DISMISSING" with prejudice respective cross-claims filed by Shopco and Anita Jacobs against Signet; and "DIRECTING" that Signet herein dismisses with prejudice the cross-claims that it has filed in this action against Shopco, Robert Jacobs and Anita Jacobs, and also dismisses without prejudice the cross-claims it has filed against Maryland Circuit Boards and National Circuits, Inc. (c/m 10/28/91 gp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 10/25/1991, Entered: 11/6/1991, Terminated: 10/25/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dated October 23, 1991 granting [93-1] motion for Randall M. Lutz, R. David Joseph and Smith, Somerville & Case for Leave to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Robert David Joseph for Atlantic Electronics, attorney Randall M. Lutz for Atlantic Electronics, attorney Randall M. Lutz for Atlantic Electronics, attorney Robert David Joseph for Atlantic Electronics ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 10/28/91 gp) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 10/25/1991, Entered: 11/6/1991, Terminated: 10/25/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Atlantic Electronics for Randall M. Lutz, R. David Joseph and Smith, Somerville & Case for Leave to Withdraw as Attorney (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 10/23/1991, Entered: 10/30/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Extend Discovery Deadline and Motions for Summary Judgment Deadline by Forty-Five (45) Days (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 10/22/1991, Entered: 10/30/1991 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION with memorandum in support by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Compel Robert G. Jacobs to Answer Deposition Questions and Exhibits 1, 2 and 3. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 10/9/1991, Entered: 10/10/1991 Suggestion of Bankruptcy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Atlantic Electronics as to Atlantic Electronics (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 8/26/1991, Entered: 8/27/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [29-1] motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits 1 through 6. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 8/20/1991, Entered: 8/21/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to [80-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 8/20/1991, Entered: 8/21/1991 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to second amended complaint (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 10/8/1993 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Attachment by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd. amending [41-1] amended complaint. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER dated 8/9/91 granting [65-1] motion of Plaintiff for Leave to Assert Claims Against Third Party Defendant, Atlantic Electronics, Inc., as reflected in Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed with the Court on July 3, 1991. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 8/12/91 cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/08/1993
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER (MARGINAL) dated 8/9/91, withdrawing [63-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Signet Bank/Maryland in accordance with Stipulation ordered by the Court on 8/9/91 ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 8/12/91 cr)(FOR MARGINAL ORDER SEE PLEADING #63) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER (MARGINAL) dated 8/9/91, withdrawing [62-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Shopco Reisterstown Associates in accordance with the Stipulation ordered by the Court on 8/9/91 ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 8/12/91 cr)(FOR MARGINAL ORDER SEE PLEADING #62) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (MARGINAL) dated 8/9/91, withdrawing [61-1] motion to Dismiss in accordance with Stipulation ordered by the court on August 9, 1991 ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 8/12/91 cr)(FOR MARGINAL ORDER SEE PLEADING #61) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991, Terminated: 8/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated 8/9/91, granting [82-1] joint motion to the court that no other party objects to the Motion of Plaintiff for leave to assert claims directly against Third-Party Defendant Atlantic Electronics or the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 8/12/91 cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991, Terminated: 8/12/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION to the court that no other party objects to the Motion of Plaintiff for leave to assert claims directly against Third-Party Defendant Atlantic Electronics or the Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Atlantic Electronics, Oper/Eng. Pension Fd (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991, Terminated: 8/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated 8/9/91, granting [81-1] joint motion to Withdraw [72-1] motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, [63-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Signet Bank/Maryland, [62-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [61-1] motion to Dismiss; Defendant Jacobs agrees to file an answer to Plaintiff's claims on or before August 7, 1991 ( signed by Chf Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 8/12/91 cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991, Terminated: 8/12/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION to Withdraw [72-1] motion for Rule 11 Sanctions, [63-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Signet Bank/Maryland, [62-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Shopco Reisterstown Associates, [61-1] motion to Dismiss by Robert G. Jacobs, Oper/Eng. Pension Fd (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSSCLAIM by Robert G. Jacobs against Atlantic Electronics, Nat'l Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Board, Shopco Reist/Assoc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by Robert G. Jacobs to second amended complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by Robert G. Jacobs to [47-1] cross claim of Shopco Reisterstown Assoc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 8/12/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Robert G. Jacobs to [48-1] cross claim of Signet Bank/Maryland (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 8/9/1991, Entered: 8/14/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by Robert G. Jacobs to [60-1] cross claim of Anita Jacobs (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 8/1/1991, Entered: 8/6/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Robert G. Jacobs by Inez Smith Reid (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 7/19/1991, Entered: 7/26/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Anita Jacobs to [48-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 7/18/1991, Entered: 7/26/1991, Terminated: 7/18/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dated July 17, 1991 granting [74-1] Stipulation to Extend Time within which Defendant Signet Bank/Maryland may serve discovery on Anita Jacobs to August 15, 1991; and within which Defendant Anita Jacobs may serve discovery on Signet to August 15, 1991; and within which Plaintiff Oper/Eng. Pension Fd may serve discovery on Anita Jacobs to August 15, 1991; and within which Anita Jacobs may serve discovery on Local No. 37 to August 15, 1991; and within which Local No. 37 may serve discovery on Robert Jacobs to August 1, 1991; and within which Robert Jacobs may serve discovery on Local No. 37 to August 1, 1991; and within which Anita Jacobs must respond to Signet's cross-claim to July 19, 1991. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 7/18/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 7/18/1991, Entered: 7/26/1991, Terminated: 7/18/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Anita Jacobs, Robert G. Jacobs, Signet Bank-Maryland, Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to Extend Time within which Defendant Signet Bank/Maryland may serve discovery on Anita Jacobs; and within which Defendant Anita Jacobs may serve discovery on Signet; and within which Plaintiff Oper/Eng. Pension Fd may serve discovery on Anita Jacobs; and within which Anita Jacobs may serve discovery on Local No. 37; and within which Local No. 37 may serve discovery on Robert Jacobs; and within which Robert Jacobs may serve discovery on Local No. 37; and within which Anita Jacobs must respond to Signet's cross-claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 7/18/1991, Entered: 7/25/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by Signet Bank-Maryland to [60-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: 7/25/1991 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd for Rule 11 Sanctions (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: 7/25/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd in opposition to [61-1] motion to Dismiss (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 7/15/1991, Entered: 7/25/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by Anita Jacobs to [47-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 7/10/1991, Entered: 7/12/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Robert G. Jacobs by Warren K. Rich, Douglas Brossman and Graham & James. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 7/10/1991, Entered: 7/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated July 9, 1991 granting [70-1] motion for Warren Rich & Douglas Brossman and Rich, Tucker & Rice to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs, attorney Warren K. Rich for Robert G. Jacobs ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 7/10/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 7/10/1991, Entered: 7/12/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Warren Rich & Douglas Brossman and Rich, Tucker & Rice to Withdraw as Attorney (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 7/9/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to [60-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 7/9/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Shopco Reist/Assoc. in opposition to [62-1] motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Shopco Reisterstown Associates (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 7/8/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 7/8/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER dated July 5, 1991 granting [67-1] Stipulation to Extend Time within which Shopco may file its Opposition to Atlantic's Motion for Summary Judgment for a period of forty-five days after the completion of the deposition of Atlantic's corporate designee; and directing that counsel shall submit a joint status report on September 3, 1991. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 7/8/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 7/8/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 7/8/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION by Atlantic Electronics, Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Extend Time within which Shopco may file its Opposition to Atlantic's Motion for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 7/8/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 7/8/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated July 5, 1991 granting [66-1] Stipulation to Extend Time within which Defendant Robert Jacobs may respond to Signet's Cross-Claim to and including July 15, 1991, provided that the time for Signet to file interrogatories and/or a request for production of documents to Robert Jacobs is extended from July 15, 1991 to August 15, 1991 ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 7/8/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 7/8/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 7/8/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION by Robert G. Jacobs, Signet Bank-Maryland to Extend Time within which Defendant Robert Jacobs may respond to Signet's Cross-Claim, provided that the time for Signet to file interrogatories and/or a request for production of documents to Robert Jacobs is extended from July 15, 1991 to August 15, 1991 (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 7/3/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 8/12/1991 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd for Leave to Assert Claims Against Third Party Defendant, Atlantic Electronics, Inc. and Attachment and Proposed Second Amended Complaint and Attachment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 7/2/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 7/2/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [64-1] Stipulation to Extend Time within which Robert Jacobs may file his Response to Shopco's Cross-Claim on or before July 3, 1991. ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 7/3/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 7/2/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991, Terminated: 7/2/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Robert G. Jacobs, Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Extend Time within which Robert Jacobs may file his Response to Shopco's Cross-Claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 7/1/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Signet Bank/Maryland (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 7/1/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs to Dismiss the Cross-Claim of Shopco Reisterstown Associates (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 7/1/1991, Entered: 7/11/1991 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION with memorandum in support by Robert G. Jacobs to Dismiss (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 6/28/1991, Entered: 7/1/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSSCLAIM by Anita Jacobs against Shopco Reist/Assoc., Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc., Signet Bank-Maryland, Robert G. Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 6/28/1991, Entered: 7/1/1991 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by Anita Jacobs (Attorney Philip O. Foard) to amended complaint (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 6/25/1991, Entered: 6/28/1991, Terminated: 6/25/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER dated June 24, 1991 granting [59-1] motion for Frank E. Couper to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Frank Everett Couper for Robert G. Jacobs ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 6/25/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 6/24/1991, Entered: 6/28/1991, Terminated: 6/25/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs for Frank E. Couper to Withdraw as Attorney (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 6/13/1991, Entered: 6/18/1991, Terminated: 6/13/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [58-1] motion to Extend Time within which Defendant Robert G. Jacobs may file a response to the Amended Complaint, and reset Answer deadline to 6/30/91 for Robert G. Jacobs ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 6/13/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 6/13/1991, Entered: 6/18/1991, Terminated: 6/13/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION by Robert G. Jacobs to Extend Time within which Defendant Robert G. Jacobs may file a response to the Amended Complaint (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 6/7/1991, Entered: 6/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT ORDER dated June 6, 1991 "REVISING" Scheduling Order and resetting Scheduling Order Deadlines: that interrogatories and requests for production, if any are contemplated, shall be served on or before July 15, 1991; Discovery deadline on 11/1/91; a joint status report is due 11/1/91; Deadline for filing of all motions for summary judgment by 12/2/91; and "DIRECTING" that unless expressly modified herein, the Scheduling Order of November 1, 1990 as amended by Orders dated December 4, 1990 and March 11, 1991 shall remain in full force and effect ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 6/7/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 6/5/1991, Entered: 6/7/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER dated 6/5/91, denying [53-1] motion to Quash Subpoena denying [53-2] motion for a Protective Order as moot and Attachments 1 through 4 ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 6/6/91 cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 6/5/1991, Entered: 6/7/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dated 6/5/91, granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time within which Defendant may file its initial response for sixty days under Rule 6(b) of the F.R.C.P., reset Answer deadline to 7/15/91 for Anita Jacobs ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 6/5/91 cr) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 5/31/1991, Entered: 6/3/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Robert G. Jacobs by Warren K. Rich, Frank Everett Couper (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 5/29/1991, Entered: 5/30/1991, Terminated: 6/5/1991 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of Non-Party, Versar, Inc., to Quash Subpoena , and for a Protective Order and Attachments 1 through 4 (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 5/24/1991, Entered: 5/28/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to [48-1] cross claim (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 5/21/1991, Entered: 5/28/1991 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of attorney appearance for Anita Jacobs by George W. White Jr. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 5/21/1991, Entered: 5/24/1991, Terminated: 6/5/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter MOTION by Anita Jacobs to Extend Time within which Defendant may file its initial response for sixty days under Rule 6(b) of the F.R.C.P. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 5/7/1991, Entered: 5/14/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER ORDER dated 5/7/91, "DIRECTING" any other party to this proceeding advise the the Court promptly if there is any objection to an extension of time for Ms. Jacobs in the event that such a request is made by or on behalf of Ms. Jacobs. ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 5/6/1991, Entered: 5/14/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CROSSCLAIM by Signet Bank-Maryland against Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc., Shopco Reist/Assoc., Robert G. Jacobs, Anita Jacobs (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 5/6/1991, Entered: 5/14/1991 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by Signet Bank-Maryland (Attorney ) to amended complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 5/1/1991, Entered: 5/7/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CROSSCLAIM by Shopco Reist/Assoc. against Robert G. Jacobs, Anita Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 5/1/1991, Entered: 5/7/1991 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to amended complaint. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 4/29/1991, Entered: 5/1/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed by Private Process Service as to Anita Jacobs 4/24/91 Answer due on 5/14/91 for Anita Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 4/29/1991, Entered: 5/1/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed by Private Process Service as to Robert G. Jacobs 4/24/91 Answer due on 5/14/91 for Robert G. Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 4/25/1991, Entered: 5/1/1991, Terminated: 4/25/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER dated April 24, 1991 granting [43-1] Stipulation to Extend Time within which Shopco may file its Response to Motion of Third-Party Defendant Atlantic for Summary Judgment, and Response to Motion reset to 7/1/91 for [29-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Chief Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/25/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/25/1991, Entered: 5/1/1991, Terminated: 4/25/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION by Shopco Reist/Assoc., Atlantic Electronics to Extend Time within which Shopco may file its Response to Motion of Third-Party Defendant Atlantic for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/22/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS(ES) issued for Robert G. Jacobs, Anita Jacobs on Amended Complaint. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/22/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd , (Answer due 5/2/91 for Anita Jacobs, for Robert G. Jacobs, for Atlantic Electronics, for Shopco Reist/Assoc., for Signet Bank-Maryland, for Nat'l Circuits Inc., for Md. Circuit Board ) amending [1-1] complaint (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/19/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER dated April 18, 1991 granting [26-1] motion for Stephen B. Awalt to Withdraw as Attorney (Terminated attorney Stephen Burgess Awalt for Nat'l Circuits Inc. granting [23-1] motion for Stephen Burgess Awalt to Withdraw as Attorney and Exhibit A (Terminated attorney Stephen Burgess Awalt for Md. Circuit Board; and directing that Defendants Maryland Circuit Boards Corporation and National Circuits, Inc. are to show cause on or before thirty (30) days from the date of this Order why defaults should not be entered against them. ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/19/91 cmk) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/17/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSSCLAIM by Shopco Reist/Assoc. against Robert G. Jacobs, Anita Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/17/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dated April 15, 1991 granting [31-1] motion for Leave to File Cross-Claim Against Proposed Third-Party Defendants, Robert and Anita Jacobs; and directing that the Clerk accept for filing the Cross-Claim Against Proposed Third-Party Defendants, Robert and Anita Jacobs. ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/17/91 mjl) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 4/12/1991, Entered: 4/23/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [30-1] motion to add Defendants; directing that Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs be made party defendants to this action and that the caption of this action shall be amended accordingly; directing that Plaintiff serve and file an Amended Complaint within 10 days after entry of this Order; and directing that a copy of said Amended Complaint together with a copy of the issued Summons and a copy of this Order be served upon the said Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs within 20 days after entry of this Order. ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/12/91 cmk) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 4/2/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991, Terminated: 4/2/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [36-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which Shopco may file its response to Motion of Third-Party Defendant, Atlantic, for Summary Judgment, and Response to Motion reset to 4/26/91 for [29-1] motion for Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 4/4/91 cmk) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 4/2/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991, Terminated: 4/2/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION by Shopco Reist/Assoc., Atlantic Electronics to Extend Time within which Shopco may file its response to Motion of Third-Party Defendant, Atlantic, for Summary Judgment (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 3/26/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to response to [27-1] motion for Default Judgment. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 3/22/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from counsel for defendant Signet Bank/Maryland to Court dated March 20, 1991 "DIRECTING" that this defendant has no objection to the motion by plaintiff to add Robert G. Jacobs and Anita Jacobs as defendants in this case. (Received in Chambers 3/22/91) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 3/22/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. to [27-1] motion for Default Judgment. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 3/19/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN RESPONSE by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to [30-1] motion for Joinder and in support of [31-1] motion for Leave to File Cross-Claim and Exhibit 1. (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 3/19/1991, Entered: 4/5/1991, Terminated: 4/17/1991 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Leave to File Cross-Claim Against Proposed Third-Party Defendants, Robert and Anita Jacobs (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 3/15/1991, Entered: 3/15/1991, Terminated: 4/12/1991 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to add Defendant (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 3/14/1991, Entered: 3/15/1991, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION with memorandum in support by Atlantic Electronics for Summary Judgment , Request for Hearing, Affidavits of Clark Powers and Lawrence E. Davis & Exhibits A-C (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 3/12/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991, Terminated: 3/12/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER dated 3/11/91, granting [28-1] motion to Amend [17-1] Scheduling order, reset Discovery deadline to 8/1/91 ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. )(c/m 3/13/91 gb) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 3/12/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991, Terminated: 3/12/1991 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION of all parties to Amend [17-1] Scheduling order (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 3/7/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991, Terminated: 11/4/1993 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Default Judgment against Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 3/6/1991, Entered: 3/13/1991, Terminated: 4/19/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Md. Circuit Board for Stephen B. Awalt to Withdraw as Attorney & Exhibits A & B (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 2/14/1991, Entered: 2/21/1991 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ( signed by Clerk) "ENTERING" Default against Cross-Defendants, MARYLAND CIRCUIT BOARDS CORPORATION and NATIONAL CIRCUITS, INC., for Want of Answer or Other Defense. (c/m 2/14/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/8/1991, Entered: 2/21/1991 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST by Shopco Reist/Assoc. for Entry of Default as to Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc., and Affidavit (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/28/1991, Entered: 2/8/1991 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. for Stephen Burgess Awalt to Withdraw as Attorney and Exhibit A (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/1991, Entered: 1/30/1991, Terminated: 1/22/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER dated January 18, 1991 granting [22-1] joint motion to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may file its responses to Shopco's Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories, and set Response to Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories deadline to 3/4/91 ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (c/m 1/23/91 cr) (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/1991, Entered: 1/30/1991, Terminated: 1/22/1991 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd, Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Extend Time within which Plaintiff may file its responses to Shopco's Request for Production of Documents and Interrogatories (cmh, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/9/1991, Entered: 1/23/1991 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd to [9-1] counter claim of Shopco (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/10/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of withdrawal of appearance of Bolumenthal, Wayson, Downs & Offut and substituting Swidler & Berling as counsel for Oper/Eng. Pension Fd (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991, Terminated: 12/4/1990 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Blumental, Wayson, Downs & Off to Withdraw as Attorney and "Entering" the firm of Swidler & Berlin for plaintiff (Terminated ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/4/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991, Terminated: 12/4/1990 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Oper/Eng. Pension Fd for Blumental, Wayson, Downs & Off to Withdraw as Attorney (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/4/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION & ORDER "Amending" Scheduling Order ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 11/1/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 10/31/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Answer to Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by Atlantic Electronics to [11-1] third-party complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 10/25/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Atlantic Electronics 10/11/90 Answer due on 10/31/90 for Atlantic Electronics (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/9/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Signet Bank-Maryland to [10-1] cross claim (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 10/3/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Nat'l Circuits Inc., Md. Circuit Board (Attorney Stephen Burgess Awalt), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/28/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS(ES) issued for Atlantic Electronics (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/25/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Shopco Reist/Assoc. against Atlantic Electronics (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 9/17/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Crossclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSSCLAIM by Shopco Reist/Assoc. against Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc., Signet Bank-Maryland (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 9/17/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COUNTERCLAIM by Shopco Reist/Assoc. against Oper/Eng. Pension Fd (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Shopco Reist/Assoc. (Attorney Lawrence S. Greenwald, Joy Y. Hatchette), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 8/29/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc. 8/24/90 Answer due on 9/13/90 for Md. Circuit Board, for Nat'l Circuits Inc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/21/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Signet Bank-Maryland (Attorney William F. Ryan Jr., Carol A. Zuckerman, Leslie E. Goldsborough III), (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/17/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991, Terminated: 8/17/1990 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint, reset Answer deadline to 9/17/90 for Shopco Reist/Assoc. ( signed by Judge Walter E. Black Jr. ) (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/17/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991, Terminated: 8/17/1990 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Shopco Reist/Assoc. to Extend Time to respond to complaint (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/7/1990, Entered: 1/23/1991 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Signet Bank-Maryland, Shopco Reist/Assoc. 8/2/90 Answer due on 8/22/90 for Shopco Reist/Assoc., for Signet Bank-Maryland (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/1990, Entered: 1/18/1991 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Local Rule 103.3 Statement of Defendant Shopco Reisterstown Associates Partnership (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/30/1990, Entered: 1/18/1991 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for Md. Circuit Board, Nat'l Circuits Inc., Signet Bank-Maryland, Shopco Reist/Assoc. (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/24/1990, Entered: 1/18/1991 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT and Exhibits A thru M filed; FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 75082 (mdd, Deputy Clerk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?