Jutla v. Fyre Media, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03541
District Judge Edgardo Ramos, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2018 at 11:17 PM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ritu Jutla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Native Design Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tina Wolfson +1 310 474 9111 +1 310 474 8585 twolfson@ahdootwolfson.com
v.
No Logo Billy McFarland, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Atkins, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332ds
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion To Substitute Attorney
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Substitute Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jeffrey Atkins, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland. (jvs) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Fyre Media, Inc.; Billy McFarland; Jeffrey Atkins, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Ritu Jutla. (Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Atkins, p/k/a Ja Rule, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13653836)Document filed by Ritu Jutla.(Wolfson, Tina) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 48 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?