William B. Cowen v. Jacmar Foodservice Distribution
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03929

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 6:50 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William B. Cowen, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Cahn +1 213 894 7859 +1 213 894 2778 stephanie.cahn@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Lopez +1 619 821 3329 +1 213 894 2778 bryan.lopez@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Neal Mackay +1 619 557 6239 +1 619 557 6358 Robert.Mackay@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William M Pate, Jr. +1 213 894 5229 +1 213 894 2778 william.pate@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil A Warheit +1 213 894 5229 +1 213 894 2778 neil.warheit@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Jacmar Foodservice Distribution, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert K. Carrol +1 415 757 5500 +1 415 757 5501 robert.carrol@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lynn R. Fiorentino +1 415 757 5503 +1 415 757 5501 lynn.fiorentino@arentfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul Robert Lynd +1 415 757 7968 +1 415 757 5501 Paul.Lynd@arentfox.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: 6/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 5/25/2017, Petitioner William B. Cowen, Regional Director for Region 21 of the National Labor Relations Board ("NLRB") for and on behalf of the NLRB, filed a Petition for a temporary injunction 1 . The parties fully briefed the matter before Respondent Jacmar Foodservice Distribution entered into an NLRB informal settlement agreement that resolved the unfair labor practice allegations on which the Petition is based, which rendered the Petition moot. On 6/12/2017, the parties filed a Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Case 18 . In light of the foregoing, the Petition is DENIED as moot, the 6/23/2017 hearing is VACATED, and the action is DISMISSED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 18 served on June 21, 2017. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Joint Stipulation filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen.(MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
        REPLY In Support of Petition for Temporary Injunction filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(MacKay, Robert)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM in Opposition to 1 Petition for Temporary Injunction filed by Respondent Jacmar Foodservice Distribution. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Evidence, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Petition for Preliminary Injunction)(Fiorentino, Lynn)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Respondent Jacmar Foodservice Distribution, (Attorney Lynn R Fiorentino added to party Jacmar Foodservice Distribution(pty:res))(Fiorentino, Lynn) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only 13 served on May 26, 2017. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (clee)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen, re Notice (Other) 11 served on May 26, 2017. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE Petitioner's Notice to the Court Re: Court-directed ADR Program filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form 6, Notice (Other) 9, Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form 7 served on May 25, 2017. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Motion Re: Petition for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          NOTICE OF HEARING on PETITION for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 is set for hearing. Petition set for hearing on 6/23/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen, re Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, 2, Notice (Other) 3, Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 served on May 25, 2017. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. (MacKay, Robert)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE Notice of Pendency of other Actions or Proceedings according to Local Rule 83-1.4 filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. (MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                      MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act Re: Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 (MacKay, Robert)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        PETITION for Temporary Injunction under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner William B. Cowen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 13-15) (Attorney Robert N MacKay added to party William B. Cowen(pty:pet))(MacKay, Robert) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?