Brickell v. Organogenesis, Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-10592
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 30, 2017 at 11:20 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Diane M. Brickell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David O. Scott +1 508 261 9777 +1 508 261 9776 dsesq@aol.com
v.
No Logo Organogenesis, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Prudential Insurance Company of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fitzhugh & Mariani LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/23/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward P. O'Leary +1 617 695 2330 +1 617 695 2335 eoleary@fitzhughlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey M. Coan +1 617 213 7000 gcoan@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carey L. Bertrand +1 617 422 5300 +1 617 423 6917 carey.bertrand@wilsonelser.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William T. Bogaert +1 617 422 5300
No Logo A. David Mazzone, ADR Provider
No Logo Walter J Skinner, Mediator
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1145
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Bertrand, Carey) (Entered: 04/30/2005)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 29, 2005 to Extend Pre-trial Deadlines 30 days by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Bertrand, Carey) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      CERTIFICATE OF CONSULTATION of The Prudential Insurance Company of America by Carey Louise Bertrand on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Bertrand, Carey) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider; counsel has chosen not to mediate this case. (Clarke, Barbara) (Entered: 06/30/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, Organogenesis, Inc. by Diane M. Brickell, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Initial disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(a) by Diane M. Brickell.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Document disclosure by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Coan, Geoffrey) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2004 (Patch, Christine). (Entered: 06/15/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Diane M. Brickell.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/25/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) and L.R. 16.1(D). submitted by Diane M. Brickell, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered SCHEDULING ORDER:Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2004. Plaintiff's expert designation deadline: 10/31/04. Defendant's expert designation deadline: 11/31/04. Expert discovery deadline: 2/28/05. Summary Judgment Motion due by 3/30/2005; opposition due by 4/15/05. Hearing on Summary Judgment or Pretrial Conference set for 5/5/2005 02:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Patti B. Saris. Case to be referred to Mediation program: Fall, 2004. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Judge Patti B. Saris : ORDER entered REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution for Mediation in the Fall of 2004.(Patch, Christine) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Geoffrey M. Coan, William T. Bogaert on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance Attorney Edward P. O'Leary terminated. (Patch, Christine) (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2004 at 3:15 PM in Courtroom 13 before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Alba, Robert) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Local Rule 7.3 Corporate Disclosure statement filed by Prudential Insurance (ms) (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Answer by Prudential Insurance to complaint , filed. (ms) (Entered: 05/15/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Complaint filed. Case assigned to Judge: Patti B. Saris. Receipt #: 46073 Amount:$ 150.00. Fee Status: pd (ms) (Entered: 04/02/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?