Guzy v. Guzy
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00228
District Judge Robert Pitman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 31, 2017 at 11:18 PM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mary Ann Guzy, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew G. Spaniol +1 214 721 8052 +1 214 220 6752 andrew.spaniol@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Mark Guzy, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Savrick Schumann Johnson McGarr Kaminski & Shirley, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary N. Schumann +1 512 347 1604 +1 512 347 1676 gary@ssjmlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C. Wilson Shirley, III +1 512 347 1604 +1 512 347 1676 wilson@ssjmlaw.com
Citation Section 09 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 896 - Other Statutes: Arbitration
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Dismiss by Mark Guzy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order)(Schumann, Gary) (Entered: 05/15/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Guzy as to Mark Guzy. Waiver sent on 3/23/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Spaniol, Andrew) Modified on 3/30/2017 to correct dates (td). (Entered: 03/29/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Mark Guzy. (afd) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mary Ann Guzy. (Spaniol, Andrew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/13/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 03/13/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT APPLICATION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9385243), filed by Mary Ann Guzy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spaniol, Andrew) (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/13/2017 to flatten image) (afd). (Entered: 03/13/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 32 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?