MONTGOMERY et al v. COMEY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01074

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 10, 2019 at 11:29 AM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dennis Montgomery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
Space LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
No Logo Larry Klayman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
Space LARRY E. KLAYMAN +1 310 595 0800 +1 310 275 3276 leklayman@gmail.com
v.
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY"
No Logo DAN COATS, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
No Logo Comey, James B., Defendant
Officially listed as "JAMES B. COMEY"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Director, Federal Bureau of Investigation, September 4, 2013 - May 9, 2017
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
No Logo JAMES R. CLAPPER, Defendant
No Logo John Brennan, Defendant
No Logo Michael S. Rogers, Defendant
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "MIKE POMPEO"
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Hearing
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Hearing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      RESPONSE re 41 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: 11/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JOHN BRENNAN, JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Whitman, James)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN BRENNAN, JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS. (Whitman, James)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of motion to dismiss by JOHN BRENNAN, JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, James)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE re 36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION to Dismiss by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN BRENNAN, JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Whitman, James) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                              LREF
                              Blank 35 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count Six of Plaintiffs' Complaint, 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS. (Johnson, Timothy) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                LREF
                                Blank 34 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Third Supplement filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 33 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE re 28 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Memorandum in opposition to re 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count Six of Plaintiffs' Complaint, 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 27 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count Six of Plaintiffs' Complaint, 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE re 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint by JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, James) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count Six of Plaintiffs' Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Patton, Rodney)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        SECOND SUPPLEMENT re 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Second Supplement filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry) Modified event title on 8/2/2017 (znmw).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          SUPPLEMENT re 23 REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery Supplement filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry) Modified event title on 8/1/2017 (znmw).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by JOHN BRENNAN, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitman, James)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of MIKE POMPEO (Whitman, James)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilligan, James)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Whitman on behalf of JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Whitman, James)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney Patton on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Patton, Rodney)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: 7/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION Shorten Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery re 15 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY (Klayman, Larry)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: 7/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION to Expedite Discovery by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY (Klayman, Larry)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Andrew Johnson on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Johnson, Timothy)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline J. Anderson on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Anderson, Caroline)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: 6/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on June 23, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance: June 27, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased f rom the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/25/2017.(wz)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: 6/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Gilligan on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DAN COATS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS (Gilligan, James)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2017, Entered: 6/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY. Case related to Case No. 13-00851, 13-00881, 14-00092. (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT re 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended by DENNIS MONTGOMERY. (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: 6/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT re 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended by LARRY KLAYMAN. (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by LARRY KLAYMAN, DENNIS MONTGOMERY (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to JOHN BRENNAN, JAMES R. CLAPPER, DAN COATS, JAMES B. COMEY, MIKE POMPEO, MICHAEL S. ROGERS. (sb)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE for Defendants Comey, Brennan, Rogers, Pompeo, Clapper, and Coats filed by DENNIS MONTGOMERY, LARRY KLAYMAN. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Klayman, Larry)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(sb)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: 6/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ERRATA by Larry Klayman, Dennis Montgomery 1 Complaint, filed by Larry Klayman, Dennis Montgomery. (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 13-cv-851. (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4977937) filed by Dennis Montgomery, Larry Klayman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons)(Klayman, Larry)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?