Olson v. Monsanto Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-01333
Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 27, 2017 at 12:03 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Owen Olson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Owen Ford +1 303 704 6655 daoford@gmail.com
v.
Monsanto Company Monsanto Company, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
No Summons Issued. Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sphil, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (sphil, ) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT Olson against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5546387)Attorney David Owen Ford added to party Owen Olson(pty:pla), filed by Owen Olson.(Ford, David) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 58 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?