IN RE: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC Wage and Hour Employment Practices Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. 2:11-cv-3121
District Judge William J. Martini, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2017 at 11:18 PM EDT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff(s), Plaintiff
No Logo Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Abrams +1 212 545 4602 +1 212 545 4653 abrams@whafh.com
Space Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
Space Michael Milton Liskow +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 liskow@whafh.com
Space Jeffrey G. Smith +1 212 545 4740 +1 212 545 4653 smith@whafh.com
v.
No Logo Liaison Counsel for Defendant(s), Defendant
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
***THIS MDL IS CLOSED. (JN) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (FINAL JUDGEMENT) Signed by U.S. District Judge William J. Martini in the D. New Jersey and filed in district court on 2/28/17. (dld) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (OPINION)Signed by U.S. District Judge William J. Martini in the D. New Jersey and filed in district court on 2/28/17. (dld) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF TRANSFEREE COURT -- (COUNSEL ASSIGNMENT(S)) Assigning Jeffrey G Smith for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel; Robert Abrams for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel; Michael Liskow for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel; Matthew Moylan Guiney for Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Signed by U.S. District Judge Madeline C. Arleo and filed in the transferee court on 12/16/2011. (dn) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FINALIZED (CTO-1) - 1 action(s) re: pldg. ( 31 in MDL No. 2280, 1 in PAE/2:12-cv-05892) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 2/8/2013. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, PAE/2:12-cv-05892 (TB) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-1) re: pldg. ( 31 in MDL No. 2280, 1 in PAE/2:12-cv-05892) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 2/7/2013. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/31/2013. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, PAE/2:12-cv-05892 (TB) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-1) - 1 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 1/31/2013. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, PAE/2:12-cv-05892 (TB) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Lynne Hermle, counsel for: Defendant Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC -- Pennsylvania Eastern District Court (2:12-cv-05892) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint E.D. Pa., Case No. 12-cv-05892) (Hermle, Lynne) Modified on 1/30/2013 (TB). ADDED PARTY TYPE AND REMOVED DUPLICATE COURT. (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. 28 Filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Filed in error. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Hermle, Lynne) Modified on 1/30/2013 (TB). ADDED PARTY TYPE. (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF POTENTIAL TAG-ALONG -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Lynne Hermle, counsel for: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC -- ) (Attachments: # 1 Schedule of Actions, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Complaint CAN 2:12-5892) (Hermle, Lynne) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      TRANSFER ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Transferring 4 action(s) to Judge William J. Martini in the D. New Jersey.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 10/12/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (TL) Modified on 10/12/2011 (TLL). (DELETED DUPLICATE JUDGE FROM DOCKET ENTRY) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        CONSENT ORDER re: pldg(s). 1 Consenting to transfer of litigation to Judge William J Martini in the New Jersey District Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge, USDC Garrett E Brown, Jr on 10/07/2011. (TL) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in CT/3:11-cv-01052, 19 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by David Andrew Slossberg on behalf of Plaintiff Howard Rosenblatt Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052 (Slossberg, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ( 23 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Hermle, Lynne) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (10 in CT/3:11-cv-01052, 19 in MDL No. 2280, 9 in NJ/2:11-cv-03121, 12 in NYE/1:11-cv-02845, 10 in NYE/2:11-cv-02072, 11 in RI/1:11-cv-00250) Filed by Lynne C Hermle on behalf of Defendant Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Hermle, Lynne) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 19 in MDL No. 2280, 12 in NYE/1:11-cv-02845) Filed by Jon A Tostrud on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Otten (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, NYE/1:11-cv-02845 (Tostrud, Jon) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 19 in MDL No. 2280, 11 in RI/1:11-cv-00250) Filed by Andrew H Berg on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Vanasse Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Berg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ( 19 in MDL No. 2280, 10 in NYE/2:11-cv-02072) Filed by Jeffrey G Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Jimmy Kuhn Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, NYE/2:11-cv-02072 (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for Tuesday, 9/27/2011 in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.Signed by Judge John G. Heyburn II, Chairman, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 8/16/2011. (Attachments: # 1 MDL No. 2280 Notice of Presentation or Waiver form, # 2 Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (RH) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (7 in CT/3:11-cv-01052, 16 in MDL No. 2280, 6 in NJ/2:11-cv-03121, 9 in NYE/1:11-cv-02845, 7 in NYE/2:11-cv-02072, 8 in RI/1:11-cv-00250), ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Plaintiffs Howard Rosenblatt, Gregg Vanasse, NICK PONTILENA, Jimmy Kuhn (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Betsy C. Manifold in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer and Consolidation of Pending Actions to the Eastern District of New York, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings, # 2 Plaintiffs' Request for Judicial Notice in Further Support of Motion for Transfer and Consolidation, # 3 Proof of Service Declaration of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Manifold, Betsy) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (7 in CT/3:11-cv-01052, 16 in MDL No. 2280, 6 in NJ/2:11-cv-03121, 9 in NYE/1:11-cv-02845, 7 in NYE/2:11-cv-02072, 8 in RI/1:11-cv-00250) Filed by Defendants Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, MORGAN STANLEY SMITH BARNEY LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Hermle, Lynne) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) ) Filed by Defendant Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC - (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mitchell Adler, # 2 Affidavit of Trish Higgins, # 3 Exhibit Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice and Exhibits A through R) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Hermle, Lynne) Modified on 7/28/2011 (TB). CORRECTION: DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES. (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Stephen P DeNittis on behalf of Plaintiff NICK PONTILENA Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (DeNittis, Stephen) Modified on 7/19/2011 (TB). CORRECTION: ADDED PARTY TYPE. (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 8 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Jon Anders Tostrud on behalf of Plaintiff Denise Otten Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, NYE/1:11-cv-02845 (Tostrud, Jon) Modified on 7/18/2011 (Littleton, Tarrell). (PARTY TYPE ADDED) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. ( 8 in MDL No. 2280, 3 in NYE/1:11-cv-02845) Filed by Plaintiff Denise Otten FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Filed in error. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, NYE/1:11-cv-02845 (Tostrud, Jon) Modified on 7/22/2011 (TB). CORRECTION: ADDED CORRECT LINK TO DOCUMENT. (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) -- Identifying Non-Party/Financial Interest Morgan Stanley, Non-Party/Financial Interest Morgan Stanley Smith Barney Holdings LLC, Non-Party/Financial Interest Citigroup Inc. for Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Hermle, Lynne) Modified on 7/15/2011 (TLL). (DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Lynne C Hermle on behalf of Defendant Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A to Notice of Apearance (JPML Form 18)) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Hermle, Lynne) Modified on 7/15/2011 (TLL). (PARTY TYPE ADDED) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF MAJOR DEFICIENCY -- (re: pldg. ( 8 in MDL No. 2280) ) The referenced pleading has been found DEFICIENT. The filing attorney has until 7/18/2011 to correct the item(s) contained within the accompanying notice. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 7/15/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, NYE/1:11-cv-02845 (TLL) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Denise Otten (Tostrud, Jon) Modified on 7/15/2011 (TLL). (NO PARENT CORP ADDED) (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            (PLEADING WITHDRAWN & REFILED - See pleading 14) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Jon Anders Tostrud on behalf of Denise Otten (Tostrud, Jon) Modified on 7/18/2011 (Littleton, Tarrell). (Entered: 07/14/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Gregg Vanasse. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Berg, Andrew) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Andrew H Berg on behalf of Plaintiff Gregg Vanasse Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (Berg, Andrew) Modified on 7/12/2011 (Littleton, Tarrell). (PARTY TYPE ADDED) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by David Andrew Slossberg on behalf of Howard Rosenblatt Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052 (Slossberg, David) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 1 in MDL No. 2280) Filed by Jeffrey G Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Jimmy Kuhn Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, NYE/2:11-cv-02072 (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/6/2011 (DP)(PARTY TYPE CORRECTED). (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 2280) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 7/14/2011. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 7/14/2011. Responses due on or before 7/21/2011. Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi on 6/30/2011. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2280, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (dn) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        MDL Number 2280 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( 1 in Pending No. 88) Associated Cases: Pending No. 88, CT/3:11-cv-01052, NJ/2:11-cv-03121, NYE/1:11-cv-02845, NYE/2:11-cv-02072, RI/1:11-cv-00250 (dn) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 5 Action(s) -- from Connecticut District Court (3:11-cv-01052), New Jersey District Court (2:11-cv-03121), New York Eastern District Court (2:11-02072, 1:11-02845), Rhode Island District Court (1:11-cv-00250) - Suggested Transferee Court: E.D. New York - Filed by: Plaintiff Jimmy Kuhns (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Transfer and Consolidation of Pending Actions to the Eastern District of New York, Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407, for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings, # 2 Schedule of Actions, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Exhibit 1-2 (Complaint and Docket - NYE 2:11-2072), # 5 Exhibit 3-4 (Complaint and Docket - NYE 1:11-2845), # 6 Exhibit 5-6 (Complaint and Docket - NJ 2:11-3121), # 7 Exhibit 7-8 (Complaint and Docket - CT 3:11-1052), # 8 Exhibit 9-10 (Complaint and Docket - RI 1:11-0250))(Manifold, Betsy) (CASES ADDED TO DOCKET ENTRY) Modified on 6/30/2011 (dn). (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?