United States v. Winner
Federal Court Proceeding Georgia Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-mj-00024
Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 3:19 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"
No Logo Reality Leigh Winner, Defendant (1)
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First MOTION for Release of Brady Materials by Titus Thomas Nichols as to Reality Leigh Winner. Responses due by 6/21/2017. (Nichols, Titus) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    First MOTION for Jencks Material IN ADVANCE OF TRIAL by Titus Thomas Nichols as to Reality Leigh Winner. Responses due by 6/21/2017. (Nichols, Titus) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      First MOTION for Disclosure OF GRAND JURY TRANSCRIPTS AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES by Titus Thomas Nichols as to Reality Leigh Winner. Responses due by 6/21/2017. (Nichols, Titus) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        First MOTION for Disclosure of all 404(b) evidence by Titus Thomas Nichols as to Reality Leigh Winner. Responses due by 6/21/2017. (Nichols, Titus) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Titus Thomas Nichols appearing for Reality Leigh Winner (Nichols, Titus) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Search Warrant Returned Executed in case as to Reality Leigh Winner. (rc) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER terminating appointment of CJA counsel Titus Thomas Nichols and instructing Mr. Nichols to file his CJA voucher on or before June 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/6/2017. (rc) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF HEARING as to Reality Leigh Winner. Detention Hearing set for 6/8/2017 04:00 PM in Augusta - 1st Floor before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps. (rc) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps: Initial Appearance as to Reality Leigh Winner held on 6/5/2017. Defendant waives preliminary hearing. Detention hearing scheduled for Thursday, June 8, 2017, ta 4:00 PM. (Court Reporter FTR.) (rc) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Reality Leigh Winner. (cmr) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps in case as to Reality Leigh Winner. (rc) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        COMPLAINT as to Reality Leigh Winner. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit) (rc) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 3 Motion to Unseal as to Reality Leigh Winner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 6/5/2017. (rc) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MOTION to Unseal by Patricia Green Rhodes as to Reality Leigh Winner. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(rc) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Search Warrant Issued in case as to Reality Leigh Winner. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Affidavit)(rc) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Application for Search Warrant as to Reality Leigh Winner. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Affidavit).(rc) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?