Hess v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:17-cv-03344

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 18, 2019 at 11:53 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/05/2017 Colin Christopher Sampson +1 415 436 7020 +1 415 436 7009 colin.sampson@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cynthia Lewis Stier +1 415 436 7017 +1 415 436 6748 cynthia.stier@usdoj.gov
No Logo Karl Hess, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Galek Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Jay Galek +1 415 745 3035 jason@galek-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/15/2018, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 45 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request To Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims With Prejudice And To Dismiss United States Counterclaim Without Prejudice And [proposed] Order filed by United States of America, Karl Hess. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/14/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2018) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: 3/13/2018 Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Plaintiffs Claims With Prejudice And To Dismiss United States Counterclaim Without Prejudice And [proposed] Order filed by United States of America and Karl Hess. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 3/13/2018) Modified on 3/14/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Request To Extend Date For United States To File Reply To Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment And [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America, Karl Hess. Replies 34 due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 3/8/18. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: 3/7/2018 Unknown Document Type
            Stipulated Request To Extend Date For United States To File Reply To Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment And [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America and Karl Hess. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 3/7/2018) Modified on 3/8/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              AMENDED Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 3/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case did not settle. Plaintiff shall notify Magistrate Judge Laporte and defense counsel of whether he agrees to the proposal by 3/12/2018 via email sent to edlcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Parties shall file a stipulation to commensurate extension of reply brief on summary judgment motion, with the understanding that the Court will likely postpone the hearing date to allow the usual interval between completion of briefing and the hearing.FTR Time: Not RecordedPlaintiff Attorney: Jason GalekDefendant Attorney: Cynthia Stier (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 3/7/2018 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case did not settle. Plaintiff shall notify Magistrate Judge Laporte and defense counsel of whether he agrees to the proposal by 3/12/2018 via email sent to edlcrd@cand.uscourts.gov. Parties to file a stipulation for a one week extension of the deadline to submit the reply to the summary judgment motion. And the parties shall file the aforementioned stipulation with the understanding that the Court will likely postpone the summary judgment motion hearing date to allow the usual interval between completion of the briefing and the hearing.FTR Time: Not Recorded Plaintiff Attorney: Jason Galek Defendant Attorney: Cynthia Stier (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/7/2018) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Declaration of Karl Hess in Support of 38 Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKarl Hess. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Declaration of Jason Galekl in Support of 38 Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKarl Hess. (Related document(s) 38 ) (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Brief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Brief re 37 Opposition/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byKarl Hess. (Related document(s) 37 ) (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byKarl Hess. (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 3/6/2018) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing - Notice is hereby given that the Motion for Summary Judgment 34 has been noticed for a hearing date that is not a proper hearing date. As such, the hearing date has been reset for April 5, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
                                    Memorandum In Support Of United States' 34 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Responses due by 3/6/2018. Replies due by 3/13/2018. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 2/20/2018) Modified on 2/21/2018 (sis, COURT STAFF).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by United States of America. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Responses due by 3/6/2018. Replies due by 3/13/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1-A10, # 3 Exhibit A11-A21)(Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR BENCH TRIAL. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/22/2017. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Initial
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2017. Case Management Statement due by 4/10/2018. Dispositive Motion to be heard by 12/6/2018. Bench Trial set for 2/25/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/17/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Bench Trial set for 2/26/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Bench Trial set for 2/27/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. FTR Time: 2:07-2:15. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2017) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: A Settlement Conference is set for 3/7/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                Joint CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America and Karl Hess. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 11/13/2017) Modified on 11/13/2017 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Case Management Conference statement due 11/14/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/27/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Judge Jeffrey S. White no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/26/17. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Randomly Assigned Magistrate Judge For All Purposes. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/17. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        JOINT CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America., Karl Hess. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/25/2017) Modified on 10/26/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/13/2017. Close of Expert Discovery due by 7/16/2018. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/25/2018. Opening Reports due by 5/15/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 5/28/2018. Jury Selection set for 1/23/2019 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 1/28/2019 08:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Judge Jeffrey S. White.Total Time in Court: 14 minutes. Court Reporter: Sarah Goekler. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/13/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            Revised Joint Case Management Statement and [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America, Karl Hess. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 10/11/2017) Modified on 10/12/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Tamara Lange on October 5, 2017. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 10/05/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING COMPLIANT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/5/17. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5:00 PM 10/11/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, October 5, 2017, at 2:30 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017) (Entered: 09/22/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 9/21/2017) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 9/21/2017) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ADR Clerk's Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order (ewh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [Proposed] Order filed by United States of America, Karl Hess. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/14/2017) Modified on 9/14/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karl Hess re 13 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byKarl Hess. (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 9/8/2017) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Substitution Of Counsel And Request For Notice by Cynthia Lewis Stier. (Stier, Cynthia) (Filed on 9/5/2017) Modified on 9/6/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/22/17. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/21/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2017) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Karl Hess byUnited States of America. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 8/18/2017) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 8/18/2017) (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Karl Hess re 2 Civil Cover Sheet, 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 1 Complaint, 6 Summons Issued as to USA (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: 6/21/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Karl Hess.. (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Proposed Summons. (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 6/15/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2017 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2017. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2017) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Civil Cover Sheet by Karl Hess . (Galek, Jason) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT for Refund of Employment Tax against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11458909.). Filed byKarl Hess. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Galek, Jason) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Electronic filing error. No further action is necessary. In the future all documents referenced in a filing must bee attached to that main filing as attachments not separate events. Re: 38 Brief filed by Karl Hess, 39 Declaration in Support filed by Karl Hess, 40 Declaration in Support filed by Karl Hess, 37 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Karl Hess (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] The correct event is Civil Events Motions and Related Filings Other Supporting Documents Memorandum in Support. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 35 MOTION re 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum In Support Of United States' Motion For Summary Judgment filed by United States of America (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?