United States v. Ho Yuan Chen
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:17-cv-00996

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 21, 2018 at 11:45 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ho Yuan Chen, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE United States of America's Notice Regarding its Request to Amend the Complaint filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge David O. Carter: granting 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct. After consideration of the Government's motion to amend and for good cause shown, the Court grants leave to the United States of America, Plaintiff, to file an amended complaint. The Government shall promptly file its amended pleading, a copy of which is attached to its motion, as a separate document. Defendant shall file its response within 14 days of the date of this order. (dv)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion to Amend Complaint Under FRCP 15(a)(2) filed by Defendant Ho Yuan Chen. (Holderness, Howard) (Entered: 11/03/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) filed by Plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of the United States of America's Motion to Amend its Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2), # 2 Proposed Order) (Pribe, Andrew)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge David O. Carter. Discovery cut-off 4/1/2019. Motions deadline set for 5/13/2019 at 8:30 a.m. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/17/2019 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. Bench Trial set for 6/25/2019 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dro) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge David O. Carter. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge John D. Early for Settlement Conference. (dro) (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 09/11/2017 8:30 a.m. has been CANCELLED. Scheduling Order to be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dro) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 days, filed by Plaintiff United States of America.. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Howard Holderness counsel for Defendant Ho Yuan Chen. Adding Howard Holderness as counsel of record for Ho Yuan Chen for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Ho Yuan Chen. (Attorney Howard Holderness added to party Ho Yuan Chen(pty:dft))(Holderness, Howard) (Entered: 08/16/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dro)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        [DEFENDANT HO YUAN CHEN'S CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES OR ENTITIES] CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ho Yuan Chen, identifying HO YUAN CHEN. (Ferreira, Graciela) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 7 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 [DEFENDANT HO YUAN CHEN'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO REDUCE FBAR PENALTY TO JUDGMENT] filed by Defendant Ho Yuan Chen.(Attorney Graciela Michelle Ferreira added to party Ho Yuan Chen(pty:dft))(Ferreira, Graciela) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER.
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Ho Yuan Chen. (car) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (car) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attorney Andrew Pribe added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Pribe, Andrew) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?