Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00426
District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 10, 2017 at 11:44 PM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FREDERICK H. BANKS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDERICK H. BANKS
v.
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Respondent
Officially listed as "Central Intelligence Agency"
No Logo John Doe, Respondent
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Respondent
Officially listed as "Mike Pompeo"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Frederick H. Banks (klau, ) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER that this petition be and is DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of jurisdiction. This Court expressly declines to grant a certificate of appealability ---- (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 5/3/17. Copy mailed: yes(klau, ) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick H. Banks. (acha, ) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5., not paid)., filed by Frederick H. Banks. (Attachments: # 1 Prisoner Data Report, # 2 Envelope)(acha, ) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 19 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?