District Appellate Supreme
Federal
California Northern District Court Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
  1. Case No. 17-1904
    Filed 4/13/2017
  2. Case No. 17-2130
    Filed 6/6/2017
  3. Case No. 17-2235
    Filed 6/27/2017
  4. Case No. 17-2253
    Filed 6/30/2017
United States Supreme Court

Waymo LLC v. Uber Technologies, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit, Case No. 17-1904

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 29, 2017 at 11:30 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Otto Trucking Llc, Defendant
No Logo Ottomotto LLC, Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc. Uber Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Levandowski, Anthony, Intervenor - Appellant
Officially listed as "Anthony Levandowski"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramsey & Ehrlich LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ismail Jomo Ramsey +1 510 548 3600 +1 510 548 3601 izzy@ramsey-ehrlich.com
Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Plaintiff - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Andrew Perlson +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 davidperlson@quinnemanuel.com
Space Charles Kramer Verhoeven +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 charlesverhoeven@quinnemanuel.com
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Case Type Mandamus (Civil)
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
Lower Court Case https://ecf.cand.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/iquery.pl?caseNumber=3:17-cv-00939-WHA
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130986434 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 04/25/2017 by email. [427021]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Transcript Purchase Order Form for the Appellant Anthony Levandowski indicating that a transcript is already on file. Service: 04/25/2017 by email. [427021]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130986409 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed. The petition for writ of mandamus is denied. The motion for stay [2] is moot. The court's April 13, 2017 order is vacated. The temporary stay of the district court's order is lifted. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/25/2017 by clerk. [427009]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER filed. The petition for writ of mandamus is denied. The motion for stay [2] is moot. The court's April 13, 2017 order is vacated. The temporary stay of the district court's order is lifted. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/25/2017 by clerk. [427009]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130980904 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          REPLY of Appellant Anthony Levandowski to response filed by Appellee in 17-1904 , Doc. No [4]. Service: 04/14/2017 by email. [424399]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY of Appellant Anthony Levandowski to response filed by Appellee in 17-1904 , Doc. No [4]. Service: 04/14/2017 by email. [424399]
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Official caption revised to reflect corrected party designations. The official caption is reflected on the electronic docket under the listing of the parties and counsel. Service as of this date by Clerk of Court. [424072]
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER filed. Mr. Levandowski's request for a temporary stay is granted to the extent that parts two and three of the district court's order are temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the papers submitted. Any reply to Waymo's opposition [4] is due no later than April 14, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/13/2017 by clerk. [423855] Vacated pursuant to the court's order. See Doc No. [9].
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130979747 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER filed. Mr. Levandowski's request for a temporary stay is granted to the extent that parts two and three of the district court's order are temporarily stayed pending this court's consideration of the papers submitted. Any reply to Waymo's opposition [4] is due no later than April 14, 2017. (Per Curiam). Service: 04/13/2017 by clerk. [423855] Vacated pursuant to the court's order. See Doc No. [9].
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Certified list from the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service: 04/13/2017 by clerk. [423833]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130979697 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Certified list from the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Service: 04/13/2017 by clerk. [423833]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [2] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-1904. Service: 04/13/2017 by email. [423748]
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130979506 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE of Appellee Waymo LLC to the motion for emergency stay pending appeal [2] filed by Appellant Anthony Levandowski in 17-1904. Service: 04/13/2017 by email. [423748]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 04/13/2017 by email. [423739]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130979485 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Entry of appearance for David A. Perlson as of counsel for Appellee Waymo LLC. Service: 04/13/2017 by email. [423739]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 04/12/2017 by email. [423725]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130979452 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION of Appellant Anthony Levandowski for an emergency stay pending appeal under Rule 8 [Consent: opposed]. Service: 04/12/2017 by email. [423725]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Appeal docketed. [423710] Entry of Appearance due 04/27/2017. Certificate of Interest due 04/27/2017. Docketing Statement due 04/27/2017. Appellant's brief due 06/12/2017.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0130979421 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Appeal docketed. [423710]
                                      Entry of Appearance due 04/27/2017. Certificate of Interest due 04/27/2017. Docketing Statement due 04/27/2017. Appellant's brief due 06/12/2017.
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?