United States v. Blaszczak
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:17-cr-00357
District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 2, 2019 at 12:59 AM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella +1 212 637 2477 +1 212 637 2443 brooke.cucinella@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ian Patrick McGinley +1 212 637 2257 patrick.mcginley@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Christopher Worrall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017 Jonathan Paul Bach +1 212 479 6470 +1 212 208 2634 jbach@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry H Berke +1 212 715 9100 bberke@kramerlevin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Fishbein +1 212 848 4410 +1 212 848 7179 sfishbein@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Klebanoff +1 212 848 7316 +1 646 848 7316 benjamin.klebanoff@shearman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Nathanson +1 212 848 8611 +1 646 848 8611 john.nathanson@shearman.com
No Logo Robert Olan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen Overy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca Rose Delfiner +1 212 756 1194 rebecca.delfiner@allenovery.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David C. Esseks +1 212 610 6399 david.esseks@allenovery.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tobias Jacob Fischer +1 212 756 1177 tobias.fischer@allenovery.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Eugene Edward Ingoglia +1 212 610 6300 +1 212 610 6399 eugene.ingoglia@allenovery.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017 Jonathan Paul Bach +1 212 479 6470 +1 212 208 2634 jbach@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry H Berke +1 212 715 9100 bberke@kramerlevin.com
No Logo Theodore Huber, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017, TERMINATED: 06/12/2017 Jonathan Paul Bach +1 212 479 6470 +1 212 208 2634 jbach@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Glen Garrett Mcgorty +1 212 895 4246 gmcgorty@crowell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry H Berke +1 212 715 9100 bberke@kramerlevin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dani R. James +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 djames@kramerlevin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nolan James Robinson +1 212 715 9356
No Logo David Blaszczak, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Paul Bach +1 212 479 6470 +1 212 208 2634 jbach@cooley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Sabrina P. Shroff +1 212 417 8713 +1 212 571 0392 sabrina_shroff@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/08/2017 Clay Hubbard Kaminsky +1 212 417 8749 +1 212 571 0392 Clay_Kaminsky@fd.org
TERMINATED: 06/08/2017 David E. Patton +1 212 417 8700 +1 212 571 0392 david_patton@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/08/2017 Barry H Berke +1 212 715 9100 bberke@kramerlevin.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (443) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by David Blaszczak. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Robert Olan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-53)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY by Robert Olan re: 380 Sentencing Submission,, filed by Robert Olan Supplemental Sentencing Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-53)(Esseks, David) Modified on 9/11/2018 (ka). (Entered: 09/11/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David Blaszczak. The 9/11/2018 letter application made by Sabrina Shroff, Esq. for defendant Blaszczak's bail to be modified in order to allow his travel to include the EDVA so that the defendant can drive to SDNY for sentencing on 9/13/2018. Memo endorsed as "Application granted subject to reasonable restrictions by Pretrial Services." (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel, Part I on 9/11/2018)(Mohan, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christopher Worrall re: 387 Sentencing Submission filed by USA /Defendant Christopher Worrall's Sentencing Reply Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Nathanson, John) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 389 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Forfeiture Order)(McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Christopher Worrall. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/6/2018) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Robert Olan. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          AMENDED LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Clay H. Kaminsky dated September 5, 2018 re: Travel Order . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Travel Order)(Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Clay H. Kaminsky dated September 5, 2018 re: Travel Order . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Travel Order)(Kaminsky, Clay) Modified on 9/5/2018 (ka). (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SENTENCING SUBMISSION by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG)(Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 08/28/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Robert Olan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit J, # 16 Exhibit K, # 17 Exhibit L, # 18 Exhibit M, # 19 Exhibit N, # 20 Exhibit O, # 21 Exhibit P, # 22 Exhibit Q, # 23 Exhibit R, # 24 Exhibit S, # 25 Exhibit T, # 26 Exhibit U, # 27 Exhibit V, # 28 Exhibit W, # 29 Exhibit X)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 6), # 7 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 7), # 8 Exhibit A - Letters (Part 8), # 9 Exhibit B - Chart)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SENTENCING SUBMISSION by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG)(Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Letters of Reference in Support of Sentencing Memorandum)(Nathanson, John) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/24/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/24/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated August 15, 2018 re: Request to Modify Bond . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall on re: 368 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton dated August 14, 2018 re: Adjournment of Sentencing . filed by David Blaszczak. Application denied. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 08/14/2018)(Mohan, Andrew) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton dated August 14, 2018 re: Adjournment of Sentencing . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Patton, David) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER as to Theodore Huber (2) granting 366 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated August 9, 2018 re: Travel. Application granted on consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla, Sitting in Part I, on 8/9/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated August 9, 2018 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER by USA as to Robert Olan addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated 8/3/18 re: Curcio Hearing Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 363 LETTER MOTION permission to travel as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/2/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John Nathanson dated August 1, 2018 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re: 343 MOTION for Acquittal / Renewed Motion for Acquittal. . (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Christopher Worrall as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: 343 MOTION for Acquittal / Renewed Motion for Acquittal. . (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 7/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to David Blaszczak re: 342 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial . . (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 07/27/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER as to Theodore Huber (2) granting 357 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated July 17, 2018 re: Travel. Application granted on consent. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain, Part I on 7/17/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated 7/17/18 re: Huber's and Olan's Post-Trial Motion Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US v. Middendorf)(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated July 17, 2018 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 343 MOTION for Acquittal / Renewed Motion for Acquittal., 251 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 18, 2018 re: Motion for Judgment of Acquittal pursuant to Rule 29(a) ., 342 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial .. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Robert Olan on re: 353 CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated June 26, 2018 re: Permission to Travel in July and August, 2018. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/28/2018)(ap) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 353 LETTER MOTION permission to travel as to Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/26/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated June 26, 2018 re: Permission to Travel in July and August, 2018. Document filed by Robert Olan. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 06/26/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 349 LETTER MOTION To travel as to Theodore Huber...ENDORSEMENT...Application granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/7/18) (jw) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by David Blaszczak re 342 MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial .. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Christopher Worrall re 343 MOTION for Acquittal / Renewed Motion for Acquittal.. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated June 6, 2018 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 346 LETTER MOTION as to Christopher Worrall (4). Application granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/29/2018) (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting 345 LETTER MOTION as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). SO ORDERED. The briefing schedule is modified as requested. The motions already have been filed. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/21/2018) (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated May 29, 2018 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton requesting an extension of time. Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Patton, David) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post Trial Briefs. Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Patton, David) Modified on 5/21/2018 (ka). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION for Acquittal / Renewed Motion for Acquittal. Document filed by Christopher Worrall as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION for Acquittal ., MOTION for New Trial . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT: as to Christopher Worrall (4) granting 290 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated May 16, 2018 re: Travel Request for funeral services. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/16/2018) (ap) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 5/3/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 5/3/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 5/2/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 5/2/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 5/1/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 5/1/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/30/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/30/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/27/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/27/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/26/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/26/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/25/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/25/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/24/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/24/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/23/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/23/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/19/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/19/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/18/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/18/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/17/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/17/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/16/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/16/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/13/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/13/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/12/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/12/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/11/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/11/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/10/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/10/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/9/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/9/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/6/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/6/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/5/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/5/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/4/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/4/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/3/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/3/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/2/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/2/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/26/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 3/26/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated May 16, 2018 re: Travel Request for funeral services . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 288 LETTER MOTION To request permission to travel with his family to Massachusetts on May 18, 2018 returning May 20, 2018 and to Pennsylvania on June 15, 2018 and returning June 17, 2018..ENDORSEMENT...Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/10/18) (jw) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated May 10, 2018 re: Request Permission to Travel . Document filed by Robert Olan. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 286 LETTER MOTION To travel to Orlando, Florida with his wife on May 8 and returning May 11 as to Christopher Worrall...ENDORSEMENT..Granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/7/18) (jw) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated May 7, 2018 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 05/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to David Blaszczak. ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service furnish David Blaszczak with funds to cover the cost of airfare between New York, New York and Charleston, South Carolina for the continuation of his trial on May 7, 2018, departing New York on Thursday, May 3rd after 5pm and returning to New York on Sunday May 6th by 11PM; and it is hereby further ORDERED that the aforesaid expenses shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/3/2018)(ap) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4) granting 283 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John Nathanson dated April 30, 2018 re: Request that Court Correct its April 29, 2018 Order. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Amended. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/1/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John Nathanson dated April 30, 2018 re: Request that Court Correct its April 29, 2018 Order . Document filed by Christopher Worrall as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nathanson, John) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION ON MOTION RELATING TO SUBMISSION OF INDICTMENT TO JURY (Corrected) as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: Turning to the defendants' final alternative request, the government has consented to the redaction of paragraphs 32b and 43. The Court has considered each additional proposed limited redaction carefully. So much of paragraph 15 as begins with the word "Furthermore" and the forfeiture allegation will be redacted. The Court's instructions with respect to the submission of the indictment, already given once, will be repeated and will be expanded to remind the jury to adhere to the limiting instructions given during the trial and in the Court's instructions given April 27, 2018. Thus, the motion is granted to the extent indicated above and denied in all other respects. The Clerk shall terminate DI 273. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/30/2018) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON MOTION RELATING TO GOVERNMENT REBUTTAL (Corrected) as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: In theses circumstances, neither the government's failure to lay out in its rebuttal the time line of what Worrall had argued were the relevant events nor even its failure to point specifically to the Stadler's "likely to be on the high end (10-12%)" comment-was government misconduct. Neither will deprive Worrall of a fair trial. And the proposed solutions to the alleged problem, in the Court's judgment, could prove worse than the disease by enlisting the Court, however subtly, as a sponsor of Worrall's argument. Application [DI 271] denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/30/2018) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 255 LETTER MOTION as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/30/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER terminating 268 LETTER MOTION as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/30/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 272 LETTER MOTION supplement jury charge as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/30/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 273 LETTER MOTION to preclude submission of indictment to jury as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/29/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 271 LETTER MOTION receive additional exhibit and issue further instructions as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/29/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Christopher Worrall re 271 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephen Fishbein dated April 27, 2018 re: Seek Relief with Respect to a Passage in the Government's Rebuttal Summation/Curative Jury Instruction .. (McGinley, Ian) Modified on 5/2/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated April 29, 2018 re: 272 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Esseks dated April 28, 2018 re: Jury Instructions ., 273 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 28, 2018 re: Providing Superseding Indictment to Jury .. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 04/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 28, 2018 re: Providing Superseding Indictment to Jury . Document filed by David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Esseks dated April 28, 2018 re: Jury Instructions . Document filed by Robert Olan as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephen Fishbein dated April 27, 2018 re: Seek Relief with Respect to a Passage in the Government's Rebuttal Summation/Curative Jury Instruction . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Michael S. Schachter dated 4/19/18 re: On behalf of James E. Flynn, I write in opposition to the Government's motion to compel (the "Motion") compliance with the Rule l7(c) subpoena as issued by the Government to Mr. Flynn on April 18, 2018 (the "Subpoena"). Mr. Flynn has responded to nearly every request of the Subpoena. He objects to only one request of the Subpoena, that which seeks records of his income beyond what has already been produced to the Government. Deerfield Management Company, L.P. ("Deerfield") produced Mr. Flynn's K-ls showing his income for the years 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013 and 2014. The Government's Subpoena issued today includes a request for records of Mr. Flynn's income from any source from 2007 through 2014. Mr. Flynn objects to this request. (jw) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Of Appearance as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Michael S. Schachter of Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP hereby appears as attorney of record for non-party, James E. Flynn, in the above captioned matter. (jw) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton regarding speaking objection. Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Patton, David) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 26, 2018 re: Docket Entry 264, Government Letter re Mr. Blaszczak's Counsel's Summation Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 26, 2018 re: Summations Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to David Blaszczak: ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service furnish David Blaszczak with funds to cover the cost of airfare between New York, New York and Charleston, South Carolina for the continuation of his trial on April 30, 2018, departing New York on Friday, April 27th after 2 pm and returning to New York on Sunday, April 28th by 9 pm; and it is hereby further ORDERED that the aforesaid expenses shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/25/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated 4/25/18 re: Blaszczak's Improper Arguments During Summation and Response to Dkt. 263 Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 25, 2018 re: Mistrial . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 23, 2018 re: Conscious Avoidance Instruction Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re: 259 Letter filed by USA re: Conscious Avoidance Instruction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) Modified on 4/23/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 22, 2018 re: Admission of DX 2686, 2687, 2785, and 2785-A . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2686, # 2 Exhibit 2687, # 3 Exhibit 2785, # 4 Exhibit 2785-A)(Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated 4/22/18 re: Conscious Avoidance Charge Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Esseks and Eugene Ingoglia dated April 22, 2018 re: on Behalf of Defendants Olan and Huber Objecting to Misjoinder of Counts Seventeen and Eighteen, and Requesting Limiting Instruction Regarding Testimony of Christopher Plaford . Document filed by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Limiting Instruction)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall.. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/22/2018)(Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated 4/21/18 re: Jury Charge -- Elements of Title 18 Securities Fraud Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Chow Jury Charge))(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephen Fishbein dated April 20, 2018 re: Providing Evidentiary Basis for Certain Exhibits Defendant Christopher Worrall intends to Offer in Evidence on Monday, April 23, 2018 . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to David Blaszczak. Upon the application of David Blaszczak, by his attorney, Sabrina Shroff, Esq., Federal Defenders of New York, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. ?? 4285, and upon a finding of indigence and in the interests of justice, it is hereby ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service furnish David Blaszczak with funds to cover the cost of airfare between New York, New York and Charleston, South Carolina for the continuation of his trial on April 23, 2018, departing New York on Thursday, April 19th after 5pm and returning to New York on Monday, April 23rd by 8AM; and it is hereby further ORDERED that the aforesaid expenses shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/19/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Quash ., LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Shroff, Sabrina) Modified on 4/19/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated 4/18/18 re: Motion to Compel James Flynn to Comply with Rule 17(c) Subpoena . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Flynn Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit B - Flynn R&O, # 3 Exhibit C - Fogel Subpoena, # 4 Exhibit D - Deerfield Subpoena)(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 17, 2018 re: Motion for Judgment of Acquittal pursuant to Rule 29(a). Document filed by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (Berke, Barry) Modified on 4/18/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER terminating 249 LETTER MOTION exclude GX 1070 as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/18/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 17, 2018 re: Exclusion of GX 1070 (ECF re-filing). Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 17, 2018 re: Christopher Plaford's Prior Inconsistent Statement . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Exclude GX 1070. Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) Modified on 4/18/2018 (ka). (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephen Fishbein dated April 17, 2018 re: government's use of purported summary charts, and introduction of select government exhibits /Joint Motion on Behalf of All Defendants. Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Klebanoff, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Theodore Huber addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 17, 2018 re: 244 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USAO-SDNY dated 4/16/18 re: Motion to Admit .. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USAO-SDNY dated 4/16/18 re: Motion to Admit . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 16, 2018 re: Production of Documents . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Benjamin Klebanoff dated 4/15/2018 re: Response to the Court's April 12, 2018 request for briefing to address issues arising from the potential need to Brutonize statements /Joint Motion on behalf of Christopher Worrall and David Blaszczak. Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Klebanoff, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to David Blaszczak (1): ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service furnish David Blaszczak with funds to cover the cost of airfare between New York, New York and Charleston, South Carolina for the continuation of his trial on April 16, 2018, departing New York on Friday, April 13th at 4pm and returning to New York on Monday April 16th by SAM; and it is hereby further ORDERED that the aforesaid expenses shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/13/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sabrina Shroff dated April 13, 2018 re: Request for Travel Order . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Theodore Huber. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 3/30/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Theodore Huber re: Conference held on 3/30/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton dated 04/11/2018 re: Instruction . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Patton, David) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 10, 2018 re: Proposed Limiting Instruction for Christopher Plaford Testimony . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER terminating 231 LETTER MOTION as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/10/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER terminating 230 LETTER MOTION 4/10/2018 as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/10/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER terminating 226 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/10/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. It is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 6002 and 6003, Marc Samuels give testimony and provide other information as to all matters about which he may be questioned in United States v. David Blaszczak, et al; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Sections 6002 and 6003, no testimony or other information compelled under this Order, or any information directly or indirectly derived from such testimony or other information, may be used against Marc Samuels in any criminal case, except a prosecution for perjury, giving a false statement, or otherwise failing to comply with this Order. This Order shall become effective only if, after the issuance of this Order, Marc Samuels refuses to testify or provide other information on the basis of his privilege against self incrimination. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/10/18)(jw) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton dated 04/10/2018 re: Witness Order . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Patton, David) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton dated 4/9/2018 re: 228 Letter,, 226 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 7, 2018 re: DXs 5585 and 5586 ., 227 Response to Motion, 229 Reply to Response to Motion, re: Admission of Evidence . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Patton, David) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Theodore Huber addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 4/8/2018 re 226 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 7, 2018 re: DXs 5585 and 5586 .. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Robert Olan addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Esseks dated April 8, 2018 re: Alerting the Court to Issue Regarding Exhibits Used in Cross (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DX-1489, # 2 Exhibit DX-2588, # 3 Exhibit DX-2595, # 4 Exhibit DX-2599, # 5 Exhibit DX-1574, # 6 Exhibit DX-1403, # 7 Exhibit DX-1524, # 8 Exhibit DX-1526, # 9 Exhibit DX-1452, # 10 Exhibit DX-1422, # 11 Exhibit DX-1740, # 12 Exhibit DX-2594, # 13 Exhibit DX-2598, # 14 Exhibit DX-1436, # 15 Exhibit DX-1448)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USAO - SDNY dated 4/8/2018 re: 226 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 7, 2018 re: DXs 5585 and 5586 .. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 04/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 7, 2018 re: DXs 5585 and 5586 . Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 225 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER terminating 210 LETTER MOTION as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/5/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 216 LETTER MOTION exclude GX 3000 as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/5/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 219 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/5/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot 218 LETTER MOTION limiting instruction as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/5/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 217 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/5/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 4/4/18 re: Request to Instruct Mr. Fogel not to Discuss Testimony with Counsel. . Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 4/4/18 re: Proposed Limiting Instruction re RUC . Document filed by David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Esseks and Barry Burke dated April 3, 2018 re: Joining in the Application to Exclude GX 3000 . Document filed by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Highlighted GX 3000)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Federal Defenders dated April 3, 2018 re: Exclusion of GX 3000 . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 202 Motion in Limine as to Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3). Defendants Olan and Huber (the "Deerfield Defendants") move in limine to preclude evidence that they sought or received information unrelated to CMS. The motion addresses in general tenns evidence relating to information sought or received from four private organizations. The only specific piece of evidence it identifies, however, is GX 711, an email to defendant Huber reporting that David Blaszczak "has a guy" who will be in "a closed-door meeting" of the AMA RUC, a body that is part of or related to the American Medical Association and that is said to have been asked by CMS to advise it with respective to possible cuts in payments for radiation oncology services. As this is the only exhibit specifically identified by the motion, the Court confines its analysis to it.The government argues that defendants' efforts to seek this information is direct evidence of the alleged conspiracy to obtain material non-public information from CMS and to trade on that information. In the alternative, it contends that it is admissible under Rule 404(b) to prove knowledge, modus operandi, and lack of mistake. The government's contention that the email is direct evidence of the charged conspiracy rests on the assertion that "in providing the defendants non-public information from AMA, Blaszczak was also providing the defendants with a glimpse into CMS' s thinking on radiation oncology cuts and a timetable for these cuts." Gov't Mem. [DI 209] But that argument is unpersuasive. As an initial matter, the Indictment does not allege, and government concedes that it does not contend, thatBlaszczak illegally obtained information from AMA-RUC or the other nonCMS sources identified in defendants motion. Thus, it is far from self evident that obtaining nonpublic information from AMA-RUC was part of the charged conspiracy. Moreover, proof that Blaszczak "ha[d] a guy" in the AMA RUC meeting at most is evidence tending to establish that he would or was expected to have non-public AMA information concerning what AMA RUC was likely to recommend to CMS - in other words, information about one of perhaps many inputs to CMS that might or might ultimately be incorporated into "CMS' s thinking," which is rather a different thing. The government is on stronger ground under Rule 404(b ), which provides that "[]evidence of a crime, wrong, or other act" is admissible, subject to Rule 403, for non-propensity purposes "such as proving motive, opportunity, intent, preparation, plan, knowledge, identity, absence of mistake, or lack of accident." It contends that GX 711 is relevant to "defendants' awareness of Blaszczak's techniques in obtaining edge from inside sources and on the relevance of these private organizations to the CMS decision process." Evidence is relevant if"it has any tendency to make a fact more or less probable than it would be without the evidence; and... the fact is of consequence in determining the action." Fed. R Evid. 401. The essence of the government's argument therefore must boil down to this. At least defendant Huber, who received the email, knew from GX 711 that the fact that the AMC-RUC meeting was to be held behind "closed doors" suggests that Blaszczak and other members of the public were not permitted by AMC-RUC to know the substance of the meeting. The email informed him also that Blaszczak nonetheless had "a guy there," which implies that Blaszczak had someone who was expected to disclose the substance of the meeting to him and that he in tum would pass that information on to the Deerfield defendants. GX 711 therefore suggests that at least defendant Huber knew that Blaszczak was planning to obtain and pass on AMC-RUC information that, as far as AMC-RUC was concerned, neither Blaszczak nor Deerfield was supposed to have. This, the argument goes, tends to prove defendant Huber's knowledge that Blaszczak's methods included getting information from sources that intended to keep the information private and to Huber's willingness to receive and desire for such information. The Deerfield defendants rejoin that "[t]he govermnent should not be able to argue to the jury that because Blaszczak had access to someone who knew what happened at a 'closed door' meeting with the AMA, he must have had similar (allegedly illegal) interactions with respect to CMS." DI 211, at 2. But the government's 404(b) argument would not permit such use. Rather,the evidence, to the extent it is offered under Rule 404(b ), is offered only for the more limited purposes outlined in the preceding paragraph. The Court concludes that this evidence is relevant for the limited purpose stated and comes within Rule 404(b). The question remains whether it should be excluded under Rule 403 on the grounds that it could be misconstrued by the jury, would require the defendants to offer additional proof to explain the email. The Court is not persuaded. This trial takes place against the backdrop that some investors avidly seek information that will give them an "edge" - facts or insights about an issuer of publicly traded securities that are not generally known to the investing public and that will give those who have them an informational advantage in trading those securities. Some of the means by which some investors acquire an "edge" are perfectly lawful. Some are not. At least some of the defendants' opening statements thus far indicate that they will contend that their actions all fall into the lawful category, which includes hard work, proper research, and careful analysis of information in the public domain. The government contends that the picture defendants seek to draw is inaccurate in that Blaszczak crossed the line and the Deerfield defendants knew it. Two conclusions flow from this. First, the jury, applying this Court's instructions, will have to classify the defendants' actions, as the jury finds them to be, as (1) lawful research or (2) unlawfully obtaining and trading on material inside information. They will have to do that over what is expected to be a great deal of evidence. They will have to do it regardless of whether GX 711 comes into evidence. GX 711 will not make that task more difficult or cause any additional confusion, if any there be in the first place. In any case, any such risk can be dealt with adequately by a limiting instruction. Second, the evidence, as the Court views it, has material probative value. While the govermnent does not contend that GX 711 is evidence of charged conduct or any criminal activity, it does suggest a willingness on the part ofBlaszczak to gain access to non-public information that he was not supposed to have and on the part of Huber to use that information. Of course, it will be up to the jury to decide upon its ultimate significance. Accordingly, the probative value of GX 711 is not substantially outweighed by any unfair prejudice, risk of confusion, or other factor warranting its exclusion. Defendants' motion [DI 202] is denied as to GX 711 and denied without prejudice to the other evidence described only generally in their memorandum. The Court will consider other exhibits and evidence when they are specifically identified to it, as the question of admissibility may be resolved differently depending upon the substance of the particular exhibits or testimony offered. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/3/2018) (ft) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot 204 Motion to Compel as to Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3). Denied as moot in light of proceedings in court today. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/2/2018) (ft) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Robert Olan. Defendant was originally anested under criminal case number 17-cr-308. Under that docket number, defendant's bail was set at $10 million, secured by the forfeit of $2 million in cash or property. No. 17-cr-308 DI 53. On June 8, 2017, the Assignment Committee directed the Clerk of the Court to file the Indictment as a new criminal action with a new docket number. No. 17-cr-308 DI 42. The Indictment was consequently filed under this docket number, No. 17-cr-357. On June 8, 2017, before the Indictment was filed under this docket number, defendant forfeited $1,118,300 towards his bail. The Clerk is directed to transfer that forfeited amount from criminal case number 17-cr-308 to this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/2/2018)(ft) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER terminating 210 LETTER MOTION as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/3/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Robert Olan addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated April 3, 2018 re: Clarifying Several Points Regarding Olan and Huber's April 1, 2018 Motion in limine to Exclude Non-CMS Evidence (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated April 2, 2018 re: 207 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 2, 2018 re: Government Exhibits . re: Government's Response to Defendant Huber's Motion to Preclude . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Robert Olan re 202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence relating to Non-CMS Information.. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Theodore Huber. CJA attorney Glen McGorty was appointed to consult with defendant Theodore Huber (2) in regards to the Curcio hearing held on March 30, 2018. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/30/18)(jbo) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated April 2, 2018 re: Government Exhibits . Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 04/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Eugene Ingoglia in Support as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re: 204 MOTION to Compel Production of All Brady and Giglio Material Relating to (1) Communications Between FBI Agent Callahan and Jordal Fogel; and (2) Communications Between The United States Attorneys Office and Mr. Fogel or his Counsel.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re 204 MOTION to Compel Production of All Brady and Giglio Material Relating to (1) Communications Between FBI Agent Callahan and Jordal Fogel; and (2) Communications Between The United States Attorneys Office and Mr. Fogel or his Counsel.. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Production of All Brady and Giglio Material Relating to (1) Communications Between FBI Agent Callahan and Jordal Fogel; and (2) Communications Between The United States Attorneys Office and Mr. Fogel or his Counsel. Document filed by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re 202 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence relating to Non-CMS Information.. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence relating to Non-CMS Information. Document filed by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 04/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated March 30, 2018 re: Government's Response and Objections to Defendants' Request to Charge Document filed by USA. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 30, 2018 re: Defendants Supplemental Letter Addressing Government Requests 12 and 14 (ECF No. 151) Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 30, 2018 re: Defendants Letter Objecting to the Governments Requests to Charge (ECF No. 151) Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 30, 2018 re: The Court's Proposed Preliminary Instructions (ECF No. 187) Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated March 30, 2018 re: The Court's Proposed Preliminary Instructions Document filed by USA. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Christopher Worrall. The Court recently issued an order on defendant Wonall' s motion in limine with respect to the procedure to be employed in the event the government should contend that some position taken by Worrall's has opened the door and thus permitted the government to offer proof that Worrall made a statement or statements in a proffer session with the government that were inconsistent with the position taken at trial. [DI 184] That ruling has prompted an exchange of letters. The exchange reveals agreement on some points and disagreement on another. The Court then, if it determines that the question whether Worrall actually made the proffer statement(s) upon which a "door opening" ruling was based is a preliminary question governed by Rule 104(a), may rule on that question and, on the basis of its view of the evidence, strike the testimony. On the other hand, if the Court is persuaded by a preponderance of the evidence that the proffer statement(s) in fact were made, the interesting issue whether the admissibility of the proffer statement(s) upon which the "door opening" ruling was based is governed by Rule 104(a), 104(b) or some other standard will be academic and the motion will be denied. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/30/18)(jw) (Entered: 03/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Theodore Huber addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USAO-SDNY dated 3/29/2018 re: Potential Curcio Issue Document filed by USA. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated March 29, 2018 re: 192 Letter, re: Government's Supplemental Response to Defendant Worrall's Motion in Limine to Enforce His Proffer Agreement . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING 134 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). Defendant Theodore Huber's motion to preclude the government from offering evidence of alleged unlawful trading or other disclosures beyond those set forth in the government's February 8 and 26 disclosures [DI 134] is denied, except to the extent, if any, otherwise indicated on the record on March 9, 2018. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/29/18) (jbo) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated March 29, 2018 re: Response to Court's March 26, 2018 Order Denying Without Prejudice Defendant Christopher Worrall's Motion in Limine to Enforce his Proffer Agreement (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 77 Motion to Dismiss as to Theodore Huber (2). So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/29/18) (jbo) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM & OPINION as to Robert Olan re: 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts filed by Robert Olan. For the reasons stated above, defendant's motion for an order directing the United States Attorney's Office to review certain material in possession of the Securities and Exchange Commission for Brady material (DI 78] is denied in all respects. Nothing in this ruling, however, forecloses defendants from seeking to serve a subpoena on the SEC for the materials he seeks, although the Court of course expresses no view with respect to any objections that the Commission or other parties to this case might raise should he seek to do so. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/29/18)(jw) (Entered: 03/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 186 LETTER MOTION modification of bail conditions on consent as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/28/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Andrew Mohan from Nolan J, Robinson dated 3/22/2018 re: We also request that the Court pe1mil us to use Courtroom Connect and activate the data ports in Courtroom 26A. Please let me know if you have any questions. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/28/2018)(ft) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to David Blaszczak. The Court is considering including the attached as part of its preliminary instructions to the jury. Any objections shall be filed no later than March 30 at 5 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/28/18)(jw) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Clay H. Kaminsky dated March 28, 2018 re: Bail Modification . Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER terminating 165 Motion in Limine as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4); terminating 167 Motion to Quash as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4); terminating 147 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3); terminating 171 Motion in Limine as to Christopher Worrall (4). The following motions were decided from the bench today as set forth in the record of those proceedings: DI 147, DI 165,DI 167 and DI 171. The Clerk shall terminate the motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/26/2018) (ft) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying without prejudice 157 Motion in Limine as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Theodore Huber re 167 MOTION to Quash Rule 17 Subpoena.. /Memorandum Of Law In Opposition to the Government's Motion To Quash Defendant Theodore Huber's Subpoena (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER terminating 163 Motion to Sever Defendant as to Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 03/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion in Limine as to Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 03/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 168 Motion in Limine as to Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 03/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 3/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 171 JOINT MOTION in Limine /Notice of Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Under Federal Rule of Evidence 402 and to Strike Paragraph 25(b) of the Indictment., 168 JOINT MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Document Marked GX 909.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 03/25/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Barry H. Berke in Opposition by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re: 165 MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re 165 MOTION in Limine .. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 3/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 163 Motion to Sever Defendant as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/24/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 03/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: 163 MOTION to Sever Defendant David Blaszczak. . (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Klebanoff appearing for Christopher Worrall. Appearance Type: Retained. (Klebanoff, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Stephen Fishbein in Support by David Blaszczak, Christopher Worrall as to Christopher Worrall re: 171 JOINT MOTION in Limine /Notice of Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Under Federal Rule of Evidence 402 and to Strike Paragraph 25(b) of the Indictment.. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by David Blaszczak, Christopher Worrall as to Christopher Worrall re 171 JOINT MOTION in Limine /Notice of Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Under Federal Rule of Evidence 402 and to Strike Paragraph 25(b) of the Indictment.. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION in Limine /Notice of Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Under Federal Rule of Evidence 402 and to Strike Paragraph 25(b) of the Indictment. Document filed by David Blaszczak, Christopher Worrall as to Christopher Worrall. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Barry H. Berke in Support by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re: 168 JOINT MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Document Marked GX 909.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan re 168 JOINT MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Document Marked GX 909.. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Document Marked GX 909. Document filed by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Rule 17 Subpoena. Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 163 MOTION to Sever Defendant David Blaszczak., 159 MOTION in Limine to Bar the Government's Misstatement of the Law that the Stock Market Should be a "Level Playing Field"., 157 MOTION in Limine to Enforce Proffer Agreement.. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (March 1, 2018 Blaszczak Expert Notice), # 2 Exhibit B (March 1, 2018 Huber-Olan Expert Notice), # 3 Exhibit C (March 7, 2018 Gov't Letter), # 4 Exhibit D (March 13, 2018 Huber-Olan Letter))(Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 163 MOTION to Sever Defendant David Blaszczak.. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Sever Defendant David Blaszczak. Document filed by David Blaszczak as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Red lined comparison of the (S1) superseding indictment versus the original indictment provided to the Court by counsel to Theodore Huber.(Mohan, Andrew) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Robert Olan re 159 MOTION in Limine to Bar the Government's Misstatement of the Law that the Stock Market Should be a "Level Playing Field".. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of David C. Esseks in Support as to Robert Olan re: 159 MOTION in Limine to Bar the Government's Misstatement of the Law that the Stock Market Should be a "Level Playing Field".. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A--Transcript, US v. Stewart, # 2 Exhibit B--Transcript, US v. Walters)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Bar the Government's Misstatement of the Law that the Stock Market Should be a "Level Playing Field". Document filed by Robert Olan. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Christopher Worrall re 157 MOTION in Limine to Enforce Proffer Agreement.. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Enforce Proffer Agreement. Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM AND ORDER as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4): the application for additional peremptory challenges [DI 149] is denied. In the absence of agreement among the defendants, the defendants' exercise of each peremptory challenge shall be unanimous. E.g., United States v. Lopez, 649 F.3d 1222, 1243-44 (11th Cir. 2011) (following United States v. Aloi, 511F.2d585. 598 (2d Cir. 1975)); United States v. McClendon, 782 F.2d 785, 788 (9th Cir.1986); United States v. Hooper, 575 F.2d 496, 498 (5th Cir.1978); United States v. Williams, 463 F.2d 393, 395 (10th Cir.1972). Any such agreement shall be set forth in a stipulation executed by all defendants and filed before the commencement of voir dire. Defendants' application may be renewed after all challenges for cause have been ruled upon. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/19/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 3/9/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak re: Arraignment held on 3/9/18 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to (17-Cr-357-01) David Blaszczak. Upon the application of David Blaszczak, by his attorney, Sabrina Shroff, Esq., Federal Defenders of New York, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. ?? 4285, and upon a finding of indigence and in the interests of justice, it is hereby ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service furnish David Blaszczak with funds to cover the cost of airfare between Charleston, South Carolina and New York, New York for his upcoming Court appearance on Monday, March 26, 2018, arriving in New York on Monday, March 26th no later than 8AM and returning to Charleston the following day, March 27th ORDERED that the aforesaid expenses shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service. ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate DI 144. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/17/2018)(bw) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from AUSAs Ian McGinley, Joshua A. Naftalis, Brooke E. Cucinella dated March 13, 2018 re: In advance of today's 3:00 p.m. teleconference, the Government writes regarding the trial date in this matter. The Government's preference continues to be beginning trial as soon as practicable. Accordingly, given the options that the Court has now presented, the Government is prepared to try the case before Your Honor beginning on April 2, 2018 (with jury selection the prior week), or to try the case before a different District Court Judge beginning in late April/early May 2018. (bw) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request To Charge by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Stephen Fishbein dated March 16, 2018 re: in support of the defendants joint request for four additional peremptory challenges for the defense . Document filed by Christopher Worrall as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Dani R. James dated March 16, 2018 . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan. (James, Dani) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request To Charge by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sabrina Shroff, Esq. dated March 16, 2018 re: Request that the Court endorse the enclosed Order . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall on "Defendant Robert Olan's Pretrial Motions To Dismiss, For Production Of Brady Materials, For A Bill Of Particulars, And To Sever Certain Counts". Defendant Robert Olan, by his undersigned attorneys, hereby moves this Court for Orders: 1. Dismissing Count Three of the indictment pursuant to Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure; 2. Requiring the government to review information in the possession of the U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission in order to comply with its disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83, 83 S. Ct. 1194 (1963) and its progeny; 3. Directing the government to file a bill of particulars pursuant to Rule 7(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent not previously ruled upon, motion denied. The Court may write with respect to paragraph 2. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/13/2018)(bw) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OPINION as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: defendant's motions for discovery or dismissal of the indictment [DI 73] and for a hearing [DI 118] are denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/12/2018) (See MEMORANDUM OPINION as set forth) (lnl) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by David Blaszczak addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sabrina Shroff dated March 12, 2018 re: Court sitting on Fridays (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 8, 2018 re 134 JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 2, 2018 re: supersiding indictment .. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rebecca Rose Delfiner appearing for Robert Olan. Appearance Type: Retained. (Delfiner, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSPORTATION ORDER as to David Blaszczak: ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service furnish David Blaszczak with funds to cover the cost of airfare between Charleston, South Carolina and New York, New York for his upcoming Court appearance on Friday, March 9, 2018, arriving in New York on Friday, March 9th and returning to Charleston on the same day; and it is hereby further ORDERED that the aforesaid expenses shall be paid by the United States Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/6/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to David Blaszczak (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-8s, 9s, 10s, 11s, 12s, 13s, 14s, 15s, 16s, 17s, 18s, Theodore Huber (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-8s, 9s, 10s, Robert Olan (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-8s, 9s, 10s, Christopher Worrall (4) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s-8s, 9s, 10s, 11s, 12s, 13s, 14s, 15s, 16s. (jm) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David E. Patton dated March 6, 2018 re: superseding indictment . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated March 5, 2018 re: 134 JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 2, 2018 re: supersiding indictment .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated March 2, 2018 re: supersiding indictment . Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: 1. In order to give appropriate attention to the formulation of the jury charge in this case, the parties shall serve and file requests to charge on or before March 16, 2018 and responses and objections to their adversary's or adversaries' requests to charge on or before March 30, 2018. Chambers shall be provided with electronic files of all requests to charge in WordPerfect format. 2. The requests to charge contemplated by this order are only substantive charges on the law; there is no need to file requests with respect to such matters as evaluation of evidence, conduct of deliberations, and similar matters that are common or substantially so to most criminal cases. 3. Defendants shall make joint filings except to the extent there are substantive differences among them. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/1/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 131 CONSENT LETTER MOTION filed by Robert Olan (3), addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Attorney Eugene Ingoglia dated February 7, 2018 re: Request to Travel to Colorado. We write on behalf of Robert Olan to respectfully request permission to travel with his family to Colorado February 10, 2018 returning February 16, 2018. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on Consent. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/7/2018) (bw) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated February 7, 2018 re: Request to Travel to Colorado . Document filed by Robert Olan. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 02/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to David Blaszczak re: 103 MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury testimony . . (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 02/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Theodore Huber (2) granting 127 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 01/31/2018 re: Travel. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 2/1/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Robert Olan re 120 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated January 24, 2018 re: 114 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 108 Order,,, re: to Direct the USAO to Review Certain SEC Files for Brady Material .. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 01/31/2018 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: The government promptly shall produce to chambers a copy of the grand jury minutes, which the government was ordered to produce to defendant during the proceedings before the Court on December 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/29/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 117 MOTION for Hearing .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Christopher Worrall (4) granting 119 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated January 24, 2018 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall's Request of Modification of Bail Conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/29/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David Blaszczak on 121 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated January 26, 2018 re: Permission to File a Reply to Defendant Olan's January 24 Submission (On Consent). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/29/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 121 LETTER MOTION Leave for US to file memo as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/26/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USA dated January 26, 2018 re: Permission to File a Reply to Defendant Olan's January 24 Submission (On Consent) . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated January 24, 2018 re: 114 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 108 Order,,, re: to Direct the USAO to Review Certain SEC Files for Brady Material . Document filed by Robert Olan. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated January 24, 2018 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall's Request of Modification of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by David Blaszczak re 117 MOTION for Hearing .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice to renewal by formal motion 115 LETTER MOTION hearing as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 1/23/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Patton dated January 22, 2018 . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Joshua A. Naftalis in Opposition by USA as to Robert Olan re: 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts.. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Ian MGinley, Joshua A. Naftalis, Brooke E. Cucinella; dated 1/12/2018, re: The Government writes to request that time for the Government to to file this affidavit be extended by two days (until January 17, 2018), and that Olan's time to respond also be extended by two days (until January 24, 2018). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest, Part I on 1/16/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/20/17 conference corrected has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 12/20/17 conference corrected before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/1/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/11/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/20/17 CONFERENCE CORRECTED CONFERENCE has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 12/20/17 CONFERENCE CORRECTED CONFERENCE before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Defendant Robert Olan moves (1) to dismiss Count 3, (2) for an order requiring the government to review information in the possession of the SEC to comply with its Brady obligations, (3) for a bill of particulars, and ( 4) to sever Counts 17 and 18 from the balance of the case. Insofar as the motion [DI 78] seeks dismissal of Count 3 and to sever Counts 17 and 18, it is denied. Insofar as it seeks a bill of particulars, the motion is disposed of as set forth on the record in open court on December 20, 2017. Insofar as it seeks an order requiring the government to review information in the possession of the SEC, the motion remains under consideration. A written memorandum or opinion may follow with respect to points (1), (2) and (4). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Defendant David Blaszczak moves ( 1) for discovery and other relief to address alleged violations of grand jury secrecy, (2) to dismiss Counts 17 and 18 or, in the alternative, for a bill of particulars and sever those counts pursuant to Rule 8(b), and (3) to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment. Insofar as the motion [DI 73] seeks dismissal of Counts 17 and 18 and to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment, it is denied. Insofar as it seeks a bill of particulars, the motion is disposed of as set forth on the record in open court on December 20, 2017. Insofar as it seeks discovery and other relief with respect to alleged violations of grand jury secrecy, the motion remains under consideration. A written memorandum or opinion may follow with respect to points (1) and (2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. The motion of defendant Christopher Worrall for a bill of particulars [DI 74] is denied for the reasons indicated in open Court December 20, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Defendant David Blaszczak moves (1) for discovery and other relief to addressalleged violations of grand jury secrecy, (2) to dismiss Counts 17 and 18 or, in the alternative, for a bill of particulars and sever those counts pursuant to Rule 8(b), and (3) to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment. Insofar as the motion [DI 73] seeks dismissal of Counts 17 and 18 and to strike paragraph 39 of the indictment, it is denied. Insofar as it seeks a bill of particulars, the motion is disposed of as set forth on the record in open court on December 20, 2017. Insofar as it seeks discovery and other relief with respect to alleged violations of grand jury secrecy, the motion remains under consideration. A written memorandum or opinion may follow with respect to points (1) and (2). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017)(ft) Modified on 12/22/2017 (ft). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 103 Motion for Disclosure as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/22/2017) (ft) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury testimony . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (McGinley, Ian) Modified on 1/2/2018 (ka). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT PURS TO JUDGE KAPLANS CHAMBERS- LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sabrina P. Shroff, Esq. dated December 15, 2017 re: Request that the Court endorse Order . Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shroff, Sabrina) Modified on 12/19/2017 (ka). (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 100 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). On consent of the Government, application granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 12/8/2017) (ft) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated December 7, 2017 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Theodore Huber re: 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment. /Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Defendant Theodore Huber's Pretrial Motion to Dismiss the Indictment. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Eugene Ingoglia in Support as to Robert Olan re: 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Robert Olan re: 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts. . (Esseks, David) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to David Blaszczak re: 73 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery to Address Grand Jury Leaks, for Bill of Particulars and Severance, to Strike Surplusage, and Other Relief. . (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Christopher Worrall re: 74 MOTION for Bill of Particulars . . (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 12/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re 73 MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery to Address Grand Jury Leaks, for Bill of Particulars and Severance, to Strike Surplusage, and Other Relief., 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts., 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment., 74 MOTION for Bill of Particulars .. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to David Blaszczak on 91 LETTER by David Blaszczak addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sabrina Shroff, Assistant Federal Defender dated November 16, 2017, re: Request to travel. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered on Consent. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/17/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Christopher Worrall (4) granting 90 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated November 16, 2017 re: Travel Request. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/17/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by David Blaszczak addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Sabrina Shroff, Assistant Federal Defender dated November 16, 2017 (Shroff, Sabrina) Modified on 11/17/2017 (ka). (Entered: 11/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated November 16, 2017 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Theodore Huber (1) granting 88 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 11/13/17 re: Travel Request. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/15/2017) (lnl) Modified on 11/17/2017 (Mohan, Andrew). (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 11/13/17 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Robert Olan. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/10/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Robert Olan re: Conference held on 10/10/17 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Christopher Worrall (4)granting 84 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated November 6, 2017 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall's Request of Modification of Bail Conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/8/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated November 6, 2017 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall's Request of Modification of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 11/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Brooke Elizabeth Cucinella appearing for USA. (Cucinella, Brooke) (Entered: 10/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Theodore Huber re 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment.. /Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Theodore Huber's Pretrail Motion to Dismiss the Indictment (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Dani R. James in Support as to Theodore Huber re: 77 MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Indictment, # 2 Exhibit B- Letter from Marilyn Tavenner to Senator Charles E. Grassley, dated January 11, 2012, # 3 Exhibit C- Transcript of a January 29, 2015 conference in United States v. Conradt, # 4 Exhibit D- Transcript of a June 21, 2012 conference in United States v. Whitman, # 5 Exhibit E- Order in United States v. Cunniffe (Stewart), # 6 Exhibit F- Nolle Prosequi in United States v. Conradt, # 7 Exhibit G-Memorandum, dated September 7, 2010)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Robert Olan re 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts.. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of David Esseks in Support as to Robert Olan re: 78 MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Esseks, David) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss and for Production of Brady Materials, for a Bill of Particulars, and to Sever Certain Counts. Document filed by Robert Olan. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment. Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Stephen Fishbein in Support as to Christopher Worrall re: 74 MOTION for Bill of Particulars .. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Christopher Worrall re 74 MOTION for Bill of Particulars .. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Bill of Particulars . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss and for Discovery to Address Grand Jury Leaks, for Bill of Particulars and Severance, to Strike Surplusage, and Other Relief. Document filed by David Blaszczak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Patton, David) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 70 LETTER MOTION permission to travel and modification of bail condition as to Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/27/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Clay Hubbard Kaminsky appearing for David Blaszczak. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Kaminsky, Clay) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from David Esseks dated October 27, 2017 re: Request for Permission to Travel, and for a Modification of Conditions of Release . Document filed by Robert Olan. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 68 LETTER MOTION as to Christopher Worrall (4). ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/19/2017) (ft) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated October 12, 2017 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Travel . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) Modified on 10/12/2017 (ka). (Entered: 10/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 65 LETTER MOTION Travel permission as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/15/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated September 15, 2017 re: Travel Request . Document filed by Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from USAO-SDNY dated 08/11/2017 re: Request for Curcio Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Robert Olan. (McGinley, Ian) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 62 LETTER MOTION as to Theodore Huber (2). ENDORSEMENT: Application granted on consent. (Signed by Part I Judge Denise L. Cote on 8/4/2017) (ft) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated August 2, 2017 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 60 LETTER MOTION as to Robert Olan (3). ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/28/2017) (ft) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated July 25, 2017 re: Request for Modifications of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Robert Olan as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/12/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Conference held on 6/12/17 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 56 LETTER MOTION extension of time as to David Blaszczak (1), Theodore Huber (2), Robert Olan (3), Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 7/10/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from AUSAs Joshua A. Naftalis, Damian Williams, & Ian McGinley dated 7/7/17 re: Extension of Time to Produce Visium-related Discovery . Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Visium-related Discovery. Document filed by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Naftalis, Joshua) Modified on 7/10/2017 (ka). (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. On the motion of the United States of America, by Joon H. Kim, Acting United States Attorney, through his counsel, Damian Williams, Ian McGinley and Joshua A. Naftalis, Assistant United States Attorneys ("the Government"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d), on consent of the defendant David Blaszczak, through his counsel, Sabrina P. Shroff, Esq. and David E. Patton, Esq., the defendant Theodore Huber, through his counsel, Barry Berke, Esq. and Dani R. James, Esq., the defendant Robert Olan, through his counsel, David C. Esseks, Esq. and Eugene E. Ingoglia, Esq., and the defendant Christopher Worrall, through his counsel, Stephen R. Fishbein, Esq. and John A. Nathanson, Esq., (the "defendants"), and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. With the exception of otherwise publicly available documents and information, all materials, including documents and the information contained therein, electronic data, and other audio or visual materials that are provided by the Government to the defendants in this action pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Title 18, United States Code, Section 3500; Brady v. Maryland; or United States v. Giglio, are considered "Confidential Information." 2.Confidential Information disclosed to the defendants or to their counsel in this case during the course of proceedings in this action: a.Shall be used by the defendants and their counsel only for purposes of defending this criminal action, except that the defendants may use Confidential Information in S.E.C. v. Blaszczak et al., provided that such use is consistent with the provisions of this Order as set forth below;...[See this Protective Order]... 7.The provisions of this Order shall not be construed as preventing the disclosure of any information in any motion, hearing or trial held in this action or to any district or magistrate judge of this Court for purposes of this action. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/27/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 51 LETTER MOTION filed by Theodore Huber (2), addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Attorney Barry H. Berke dated 6/23/17 re: Travel. We write on behalf of Theodore Huber to respectfully request that Mr. Huber be permitted to travel with his family to East Dennis, Massachusetts from June 30, 2017 to July 8, 2017, and to Manchester, Vermont from July 13, 2017 to July 16, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/27/2017) (bw) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 23, 2017 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Barry H. Berke dated 6/23/17 re: Travel . Document filed by Theodore Huber. (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 48 LETTER MOTION travel as to Christopher Worrall (4). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/21/2-17) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 47 LETTER MOTION travel as to Robert Olan (3). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/21/2017) (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from John A. Nathanson dated June 20, 2017 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall's Request of Modification of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Christopher Worrall as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Eugene Ingoglia dated June 20, 2017 re: Request to Travel to Massachusetts . Document filed by Robert Olan. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Christopher Worrall. It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's release conditions include drug testing and mental health evaluation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/19/2017)(ft) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David E. Patton appearing for David Blaszczak. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Patton, David) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. The Assignment Committee, having considered the submissions of the parties and pursuant to the authority delegated to it under Local Rule 2 for the Division of Business Among Judges, unanimously concludes that the Indictment docketed as (S-1) 17 CR 0308 does not supersede the information styled United States v. Jordan Fogel, 17-CR-308. THEREFORE, the Clerk of the Court is directed to file the Indictment as a new criminal action with a new docket number and randomly assign the case in accordance with Local Rule 6(b). SO ORDERED. (By Judge Colleen McMahon, Judge William H. Pauley, Judge Vincent L. Briccetti, Judge Valerie Caproni on 6/8/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Barry H. Berke and David Esseks dated June 5, 2017 re: Responding to the Government's Letter dated June 2, 2017 (Berke, Barry) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Exclusion of Time Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Superseding Indictment Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Jonathan Bach dated 5/30/2017 re: on behalf of The New York Council of Defense Lawyers as amicus curiae to address issues concerning matters of judicial assignments which requires Judicial Review . Document filed by Jordan Fogel, David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (Bach, Jonathan) Modified on 9/25/2017 (ft). (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Theodore Huber, Robert Olan addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Barry H. Berke and David Esseks dated May 30, 2017 re: Requesting case be placed in the wheel for random reassignment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Transcript)(Berke, Barry) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by David Blaszczak. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein) Attorney Sabrina Shroff (jw) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address as to Robert Olan. New Address: Allen & Overy LLP, 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10020, (212) 610-6300. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Stephen Fishbein dated June 7, 2017 re: Defendant Christopher Worrall joining in the letter motion made by Defendants Theodore Huber and Robert Olan and subsequently joined by Defendant David Blaszczak regarding case assignment (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John A. Nathanson appearing for Christopher Worrall. Appearance Type: Retained. (Nathanson, John) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephen Robert Fishbein appearing for Christopher Worrall. Appearance Type: Retained. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by David Blaszczak addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Sabrina P. Shroff, Assistant Federal Defender dated June 5, 2017 (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise Cote from AUSA Damian Williams dated 05/25/2017 re: request for exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act. ENDORSEMENT: The Court finds that in the interests of justice to exclude time to 5/31/17 to allow the Government to pursue discovery and to allow defendants to travel to this district. These interests are in the interests of justice and outweigh the interests of the defendants and public in a speedy trial. (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest for Judge Denise Cote on 5/25/2017)(hm). (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nolan James Robinson appearing for Theodore Huber. Appearance Type: Retained. (Robinson, Nolan) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to David Blaszczak, Christopher Worrall addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from AUSAs Joshua A. Naftalis, Damian Williams, and Ian McGinley dated 5/25/17 re: Exclusion of Time Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sabrina P. Shroff appearing for David Blaszczak. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Shroff, Sabrina) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to (17-Cr-308-05) Christopher Worrall in amount of $500,000. $500,000 secured by PRB; Co-signed by 3 financially responsible co-signers - 1 week; Travel documents surrendered; Travel restricted to Maryland, SDNY & EDNY; No contact with witness, co-defendants, potential witness without counsel being present; Must work; Must notify current employer of Indictment; Participate in drug treatment and mental health program as directed by PTS; Refrain from illegal drug use and firearm possession; PTS supervision. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 5/31/2017 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry on "District Judge Bail Disposition Sheet" for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Bond Hearing as to (17-Cr-308-5) Christopher Worrall held on 5/31/2017. AUSA A. Damian Williams. Defense Counsel Xavier Donaldson. PSA Officer Lisa Chan. BAIL DISPOSITION: $500,000.00 secured by PRB cosigned by 3 financially responsible cosignors -1 week; Travel documents surrendered; Travel restricted to Maryland & SDNY & EDNY; No contact with victims, co-defendants, potential witness without counsel being present; Must work; Must notify current employer of indictment; Participate in drug treatment and mental health program as directly by Pretrial Services; Refrain from illegal drug use and firearm possession; PTS supervision. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/31/2017) (bw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry on "District Judge Bail Disposition Sheet" for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Bond Hearing as to (17-Cr-308-2) David Blaszczak held on 5/31/2017. AUSA A. Damian Williams. Defense Counsel Sabrina Schroff. PSA Officer Lisa Chan. BAIL DISPOSITION: $500,000.00 secured by PRB co-signed by 3 financially responsible co-signors -1 week; Travel documents surrendered; Travel restricted to South Carolina & New York; Participate in mental health treatment program; No contact with co-defendants, victims, or potential witness unless in presence of counsel; No firearm; No unlawful possession of drugs; Drug testing at discretion of Pretrial Services; No abuse of alcohol; PTS supervision. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/31/2017) (bw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dani R. James appearing for Theodore Huber. Appearance Type: Retained. (James, Dani) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Initial Appearance as to Theodore Huber held on 5/24/2017. Defendant Theodore Huber present with Attorney Barry Burke, AUSA Joshua Naftalis present for the Government. Agreed conditions of release: $10M PRB; 2FRP; Secured by $2M cash/property: either; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DCT; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision; Regular; Def. to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by 6-7-17. Conference before D.J. on 5-31-17 11am. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7) until 5-31-17. (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Christopher Worrall from the United States District Court - District of Maryland. (jm) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis: Initial Appearance as to Robert Olan held on 5/24/2017. Defendant Robert Olan present with Attorney Eugene Ingoslia, AUSA Joshua Naftalis present for the Government. Agreed conditions of release: $10M PRB; 2FRP; Secured by $2M cash/property: either; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/DNJ; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision; Regular; Def. to be released on own signature; remaining conditions to be met by 6-7-17. Conference before D.J. on 5-31-17 11am. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7) until 5-31-17. (Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote.) (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Barry H Berke appearing for Theodore Huber. (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eugene Edward Ingoglia appearing for Robert Olan. (ft) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tobias Jacob Fischer appearing for Robert Olan. Appearance Type: Retained. (Fischer, Tobias) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eugene Edward Ingoglia appearing for Robert Olan. Appearance Type: Retained. (Ingoglia, Eugene) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David C. Esseks appearing for Robert Olan. Appearance Type: Retained. (Esseks, David) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            S(1) INDICTMENT FILED as to David Blaszczak (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16, 17, 18, Theodore Huber (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, Robert Olan (4) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, Christopher Worrall (5) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4-8, 9, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 15, 16. (Attachments: # 1 indi part 2, # 2 indi part3) (jm)(Filed under seal on 5/23/17) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2017: # 1 indictment, # 2 indictment, # 3 indictment, # 4 indictment) (jm). (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Robert Olan: Notice to Attorney Esseks, David to RE-FILE Document 392 Reply. Use the event type Sentencing Submission found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Kaminsky, Clay as to David Blaszczak: to E-MAIL Dcument Document No. 382 Transportation Order. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Curcio Hearing as to Robert Olan held on 9/5/2018. Defendant Robert Olan present with attorneys Eugene E. Ingoglia, David C. Esseks, and Rachel N. Agress present. AUSA Joshau A. Naftalis present. Defendant sworn and allocuted regarding the issues raised in DI 365. Defendant chose to keep Ms. Rachel N. Agress as counsel. Defendant remained released on bail. (Court Reporter Alena Lynch) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to David Blaszczak: Notice to Attorney Patton, David to RE-FILE Document 344 FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post Trial Briefs. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to David Blaszczak, Christopher Worrall: Brief due by 6/8/2018. Replies due by 7/27/2018. Responses due by 7/13/2018. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 303. "TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall re: Trial held on 4/9/18 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan." The document was incorrectly filed in this case. [*** NOTE: This document was originally docketed on 5/16/2018 by (McGuirk, Kelly). Court Reporters Office/SDNY requested the deletion of this docket entry on 5/16/2018. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 304. "NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 4/9/18 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter." The document was incorrectly filed in this case. [*** NOTE: This document was originally docketed on 5/16/2018 by (McGuirk, Kelly). Court Reporters Office/SDNY requested the deletion of this docket entry on 5/16/2018. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 5/3/2018. Jury trial continued. Jury deliberations continued and concluded. Regarding defendant Blaszczak (01) the defendant was found Guilty of counts (S1)1, (S1)2, (S1) 3, (S1)9, (S1)10, (S1)13, (S1)15, (S1)16, and (S1)18. Defendant Blaszczak (01) was found Not Guilty as to Counts (S1)4, (S1)5, (S1)6, (S1)7, (S1)8, (S1)11, (S1)12, (S1)14, and (S1)17. Regarding defendant Huber(02) the defendant was found Guilty of counts (S1)1, (S1)2, (S1)3, (S1)9, and (S1)10. Regarding defendant Huber (02) the defendant was found Not Guilty of Counts (S1)4, (S1)5, (S1)6, (S1)7, and (S1)8. Regarding defendant Olan (03) the defendant was found Guilty of Counts (S1)1, (S1)2, (S1)3, (S1)9, (S1)10. Regarding defendant Olan (03) the defendant was found Not Guilty of Counts (S1)4, (S1)5, (S1)6, (S1)7, and (S1)8. Regarding defendant Worral (04) the defendant was found Guilty of Counts (S1)3, and (S1)9. Regarding defendant Worral (04) the defendant was found Not Guilty of Counts (S1)1, (S1)2, (S1)4, (S1)5, (S1)6, (S1)7, (S1)8, (S1)10, (S1)11, (S1)12, (S1)13, (S1)14, (S1)15, and (S1)16. Notices of post-trial defense motions are due by 5/17/2018. Briefs on behalf of the defendants are due 5/31/2018. Government motion opposition due 6/30/2018. Defendants' reply brief due July 14, 2018. Sentencing as to all four defendants is scheduled for 9/13/2018 at 9:30am. All four defendants remained released on bail. PSIs were ordered. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JURY VERDICT as to David Blaszczak (1) Guilty on Count 1s,2s,3s,9s,10s,13s,15s,16s,18s; David Blaszczak (1) Not Guilty on Count 4s-8s,11s,12s,14s,17s. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JURY VERDICT as to Theodore Huber (2) Guilty on Count 1s,2s,3s,9s,10s; Theodore Huber (2) Not Guilty on Count 4s-8s. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JURY VERDICT as to Robert Olan (3) Guilty on Count 1s,2s,3s,9s,10s; Robert Olan (3) Not Guilty on Count 4s-8s. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JURY VERDICT as to Christopher Worrall (4) Guilty on Count 3s,9s; Christopher Worrall (4) Not Guilty on Count 1s,2s,4s-8s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Notices of Post-trial motions by Defendants due by 5/17/2018. Brief (by Defendants) due by 5/31/2018; Responses (by Government) to Brief due by 6/30/2018; Reply (by Defendants) to Response to Brief due by 7/14/2018. Sentencing set for 9/13/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (By Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/3/2018) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Christopher Worrall: Notice to Attorney McGinley, Ian to RE-FILE Document 275 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 5/2/2018. Jury deliberations continued.(Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 5/1/2018. Jury deliberations continued. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/30/2018. Deliberations begun. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/27/2018. Jury charged and deliberations scheduled to begin on 4/30/18 at 9:00am. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker and Rose Prater)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/27/2018. Jury charged and deliberations scheduled to begin on 4/30/18 at 9:00am. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker and Rose Prater) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/26/2018. Defendant Huber's (02) closing arguments begun and concluded. Defendant Olan's (03) closing argument begun and concluded. Government's rebuttal closing argument begun and concluded. Jury charge scheduled to begin at 9:00am on 4/27/2018. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker and Rose Prater)(Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/25/2018. Defendant Worralls (04) closing continued and concluded. Defendant Blasczcaks (01) closing began and concluded. Trial to be continued on 4/26/2018.(Court Reporter Andrew Walker and Rose Prater)(Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/24/2018. Jury trial continued. Government's closing arguments heard. Defendant Worrall's (04) closing arguments begun and adjourned until 4/25/18. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Theodore Huber: Notice to Attorney Berke, Barry to RE-FILE Document 261 Response. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/23/2018. Jury trial continued. Juror 7 was excused and Alternate juror number 2 became juror number 7. Trial continued. All defendants rested. Government rebuttal case began and ended. Jury excused until 4/24/18 at 2:00pm. Counsel notified that the draft jury charge would be available from chambers at 8:00am on 4/24/18 and the charge conference would begin at 9:30am on 4/24/18. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Sabrina P. Shroff as to David Blaszczak: to E-MAIL Document, Document No. 253 Transportation Order. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/19/2018. Jury trial continued. Alternate juror number 5 excused. Trial adjourned until 4/23/18. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to David Blaszczak: Notice to Attorney Clay Hubbard Kaminsky to RE-FILE Document 247 MOTION to Exclude GX 1070. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/18/2018. Government rested. All four defendants moved for judgment of acquittal as a matter of law and the Court reserved. Defense case begun. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/17/2018. Jury trial continued. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/16/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan :Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/13/2018. Jury trial continued. Trial adjourned until Monday, 4/16/2018. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/12/2018. Jury trial continued. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/11/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/10/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/9/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/6/2018. Jury trial continued. Trial adjourned to 4/9/2018. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/5/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/4/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/3/2018. Jury trial continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 4/2/2018. Jury voir dire continued and completed, jury trial begun before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) present with attorneys David Patton and Sabrina Shroff. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke, Dani R. James, and Nolan J. Robinson. Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorney David C. Esseks, Rebecca Delfiner and Eugene E. Ingoglia. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein and John A. Nathanson. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella, Ian Patrick McGinley, Joshua A. A. Naftalis present. Court reporters Andrew Walker and Rose Prater present. A Jury of 12 and 6 alternates was selected and sworn. Juror Number 12 was excused and Alternate Juror No. 1 became Juror Number 12. Opening arguments for the Government, defendant Blasczcak, defendant Fishbein, and defendant Huber were heard. Defendant Olan's opening expected to be given on 4/3/2018. Trial adjourned until 4/3/2018 at 9:00am. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Curcio Hearing as to Theodore Huber held on 3/30/2018. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorney Barry H. Berke. CJA duty attorney Glen McGorty present. AUSA Brooke E. Cucinella present. Court reporter Tom Murray present. Defendant Huber (2) sworn, allocuted re issues raised in DI# 195 and consulted with CJA attorney Glen McGorty. Defendant Huber waived any potential conflict with his counsel at Kramer Levin. Defendant Huber remains released on bail. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 117 Motion for Hearing as to David Blaszczak (1). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/25/2018) (Kaplan, Lewis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Voir Dire held on 3/26/2018 as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall.n (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Selection as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 3/26/2018. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Jury Trial as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 3/26/2018. Jury voir dire begun and continued before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) present with attorneys David Patton and Sabrina Shroff. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke, Dani R. James, and Nolan J. Robinson. Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorney David C. Esseks, Rebecca Delfiner and Eugene E. Ingoglia. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein and John A. Nathanson. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella, Ian Patrick McGinley, Joshua A. A. Naftalis present. Court reporters Andrew Walker and Rose Prater present. A panel of 57 qualified jurors was selected and the voir dire was continued to 4/2/2018 at 9:00am in courtroom 26A. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Telephone Conference as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan held on 3/13/2018. 3:00pm Pretrial telephonic conference held before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) did not participate but attorney David Patton participated and attorneys Clay Kaminsky, and Sabrina Shroff on the phone line. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) did not participate but attorneys Barry H. Berke participated and attorney Dani R. James was on the phone line. Defendant Robert Olan (03) did not participate but attorney David C. Esseks participated and attorneys Tobias J. Fischer, Eugene Edward Ingoglia, and Rebecca Delfiner were on the phone line. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) did not participate but attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein participated. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella, Joshua A. Naftalis, and Ian Patrick McGinley participated. Court reporter Michael McDaniel present. Jury selection scheduled to take place on 3/26/2018 at 9:00am. The trial date was moved up to 4/2/2018 at 2:30pm. (Jury Selection set for 3/26/2018 at 09:00AM, Jury Trial set for 4/2/2018 at 02:30 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Telephone Conference as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan held on 3/13/2018. 3:00pm Pretrial telephonic conference held before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) did not participate but attorney David Patton participated and attorneys Clay Kaminsky, and Sabrina Shroff on the phone line. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) did not participate but attorneys Barry H. Berke participated and attorney Dani R. James was on the phone line. Defendant Robert Olan (03) did not participate but attorney David C. Esseks participated and attorneys Tobias J. Fischer, Eugene Edward Ingoglia, and Rebecca Delfiner were on the phone line. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) did not participate but attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein participated. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella, Joshua A. Naftalis, and Ian Patrick McGinley participated. Court reporter Michael McDaniel present. Jury selection scheduled to take place on 3/26/2018 at 9:00am. The trial date was moved up to 4/2/2018 at 9:00 AM. (Jury Selection set for 3/26/2018 at 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 4/2/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (jbo) Modified on 3/19/2018 (Mohan, Andrew). Modified on 3/19/2018 (Mohan, Andrew).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Telephone Conference as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan held on 3/13/2018. 10:00am Pretrial telephonic conference held before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) did not participate but attorney David Patton participated and attorneys Clay Kaminsky, and Sabrina Shroff on the phone line. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) did not participate but attorneys Barry H. Berke participated and attorney Dani R. James was on the phone line. Defendant Robert Olan (03) did not participate but attorney David C. Esseks participated and attorneys Tobias J. Fischer, Eugene Edward Ingoglia, and Rebecca Delfiner were on the phone line. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) did not participate but attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein participated. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella, Joshua A. Naftalis, and Ian Patrick McGinley participated. Court reporter Michael McDaniel present. Trial date discussed. Another phone conference was scheduled for 3:00 PM on 3/13/2018. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Pretrial telephonic Conference as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 3/12/2018. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) did not participate but attorney David Patton participated and attorneys Clay Kaminsky, Danielle Thorne, and Sabrina Shroffon the phone line.Defendant Theodore Huber (02) did not participate but attorneys Barry H. Berkeparticipated and attorney Dani R. James was on the phone line. Defendant Robert Olan (03) did not participate but attorney David C. Esseks participated and attorneys Tobias J. Fischer, and Eugene Edward Ingoglia were on the phone line. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) did not participate but attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein participated. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella and Ian Patrick McGinley participated. Court reporter Kristen Carannante present. Trial date discussed. The Court asked counsel to inform the Court as to their preferences as to the potential options mentioned during the phone conference. The Bail for all four defendants remained unchanged. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Arraignment as to David Blaszczak (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s,17s,18s and Theodore Huber (2) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Robert Olan (3) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Christopher Worrall (4) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16sDavid Blaszczak (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s,17s,18s and Theodore Huber (2) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Robert Olan (3) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Christopher Worrall (4) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s held on 3/9/2018., Plea entered by David Blaszczak (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s,17s,18s and Theodore Huber (2) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Robert Olan (3) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Christopher Worrall (4) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16sDavid Blaszczak (1) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s,17s,18s and Theodore Huber (2) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Robert Olan (3) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s and Christopher Worrall (4) Count 1s,2s,3s,4s-8s,9s,10s,11s,12s,13s,14s,15s,16s Not Guilty. Pretrial Conference held before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) present with attorneys David Patton, Clay Kaminsky, and Sabrina Shroff.Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke and Dani R. James. Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys David C. Esseks, Tobias J. Fischer, and Eugene Edward Ingoglia. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorney Stephen Robert Fishbein. AUSAs Brooke E. Cucinella, Ian Patrick McGinley and Joshua Arditi Naftalis. A. Damian Williams present. All four defendants arraigned on the S1 indictment and entered pleas of not guilty. Court reporter present. All four defendants remained released on bail (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Status Conference as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 12/20/2017. Motion argument before District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan held. Defendant David Blaszczak (01) present with attorney David Patton. Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke, Dani R. James and Nolan James Robinson. Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys David C. Esseks, Tobias J. Fischer, and Eugene Edward Ingoglia. Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorneys Stephen Robert Fishbein and John A. Nathanson. AUSA A. Damian Williams present. Court reporter Steve Greenblum present. Argument on pending motions held. Decision Reserved. All defendants remained released on bail. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Sabrina P. Shroff as to David Blaszczak: Judge Kaplan prefers that letters come to his chambers by hard-copy and that counsel follow the ECF rules for the SDNY and submit proposed orders as PDFs attached an email sent to Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. 102 Letter. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Curcio Hearing as to Robert Olan held on 10/18/2017. Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys Eugene E. Ingoglia and Tobias J. Fischer. AUSA Brooke Cucinella present. Court reporter Eve Giniger present. Curcio hearing begun on October 10, 2017 concluded. Defendant chooses to keep attorney Tobias J. Fischer. Defendant Olan remained released on bail. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Christopher Worrall: Notice to Attorney John A. Nathanson to RE-FILE Document 67 MOTION to Travel .. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Curcio Hearing as to Robert Olan held on 10/10/2017 ( Curcio Hearing set for 10/18/2017 at 03:30 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys Eugene E. Ingoglia and Tobias J. Fischer. AUSA Brooke Cucinella present. Court reporter Tom Murray present. Curcio hearing begun and conclusion to be held on Wednesday, 10/18/17 at 3:30pm. Defendant Olan remained released on bail (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASHIERS OFFICE REGISTRY DEPOSIT as to Robert Olan dated 7/28/17, from Judge Denise L. Cote for Judge Kaplan, received $881,700.00 from ROBERT OLAN Receipt Number 17465400532 on 08/11/2017. (jom)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall: Notice to Attorney Joshua Arditi Naftalis to RE-FILE Document 55 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Visium-related Discovery. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan:Pretrial Conference as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall held on 6/12/2017, as to Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall( Motions due by 10/27/2017., Replies due by 12/6/2017., Government Responses due by 11/17/2017, Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan., Oral Argument set for 12/20/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan., Status Conference set for 12/20/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) Defendant David Blaszczak (01) not present but attorney Sabrina P. Shroffpresent.Defendant Theodore Huber (02) present with attorneys Barry H. Berke and NolanJames Robinson.Defendant Robert Olan (03) present with attorneys David C. Esseks and EugeneEdward Ingoglia.Defendant Christopher Worrall (04) present with attorneys Stephen RobertFishbein and John A. Nathanson.AUSA A. Damian Williams present. Court reporter Andrew Walker present.The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate attorney Jonathan Paul Bach ascounsel to all four defendants in this case. Discovery regarding Deerfield shall be made by 6/23/17 and discovery regardingVisium shall be made by 7/7/17. Defendants motions due by 10/27/17;Government opposition due by 11/17/17; defendants reply brief due by 12/6/17;oral argument or a status conference to be held on 12/20/17 at 2:00pm. Trial isexpected to last 2-3 weeks. Trial scheduled to begin 4/9/18 at 9:30am. Time from today through 4/9/18 is excluded from speedy trial calculations in the interests of justice. All defendants remained released on bail (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. Attorney Jonathan Paul Bach terminated. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall ASSIGNED to Judge Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Designated ECF as to David Blaszczak, Theodore Huber, Robert Olan, Christopher Worrall. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Appearance as to David Blaszczak (2) held on 5/31/2017. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Initial Appearance as to Christopher Worrall (5) held on 5/31/2017. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote: Plea entered by David Blaszczak (2) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18 and Theodore Huber (3) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Robert Olan (4) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Christopher Worrall (5) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16 Not Guilty. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denise L. Cote:Arraignment as to David Blaszczak (2) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16,17,18 and Theodore Huber (3) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Robert Olan (4) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10 and Christopher Worrall (5) Count 1,2,3,4-8,9,10,11,12,13,14,15,16 held on 5/31/2017. Defendant David Blaszczak present with counsel Sabrina Schroff, Esq. (Federal Defenders). Defendant Theodore Huber present with counsels Barry Berke, Esq. and Dani James, Esq. (Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP). Defendant Robert Olan present with counsels David C. Esseks, Esq., Tobias Jacob Fischer, Esq., and Eugene Edward Ingoglia, Esq. (Allen & Overy, LLP). Defendant Christopher Worrall present with counsel Xavier Donaldson, Esq. AUSAs A. Damian Williams, Ian Patrick McGinley, and Joshua Naftalis present. Pretrial Services Lisa Chan present. Court Reporter Vincent Bologna present. The Court temporarily assigns Ms. Schroff and Mr. Patton as counsel for Mr. Blaszczak. The Court alsotemporarily assigns Mr. Donaldson as counsel for Mr. Worrall. The Court request a letter from counsel for Blaszczak and Worrall. All defendants plea not guilty. Govt to submit by this Friday at noon, their response to Mr. Berke letter. Bail set for Mr. Blaszczak and Mr. Worrall. In the interest of justice, time is excluded from today to 6/14/17 pursuant to 18 USC 3161(h)(1)(a). (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Robert Olan: Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Theodore Huber: Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denise L. Cote. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest of Christopher Worrall in the United States District Court - District of Maryland. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 273 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?