COTAPAXI CUSTOM DESIGN AND MANUFACTURING, LLC v. CHASE BANK USA, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-04292

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 28, 2019 at 1:03 AM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None ///Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 4/4/18. (gh, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/26/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 11/21/17. (gh, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition of Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Removal
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?