eCash Technologies v. Mark Guagliardo, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-03292
District Judge Audrey B. Collins, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Audrey B. Collins
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 11:54 PM EDT (7.9 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Ecash Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@bryancave.com

Represented by Law Offices of Amitai Schwartz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Mija Sitkin +1 510 597 1775 +1 510 597 0957 lisa@schwartzlaw.com
No Logo Mark Guagliardo, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Hicks Gaumer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Hicks +1 213 612 0007 +1 213 612 0373 jhicks@hicksgaumer.com

Represented by McCloskey, Waring & Waisman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Lynn McCloskey +1 310 524 0402 +1 310 524 0404 hlmccloskey@mwwllp.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-100 inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Mark Guagliardo, Defendant

Represented by Hicks Gaumer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James B Hicks +1 213 612 0007 +1 213 612 0373 jhicks@hicksgaumer.com

Represented by McCloskey, Waring & Waisman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/27/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather Lynn McCloskey +1 310 524 0402 +1 310 524 0404 hlmccloskey@mwwllp.com
No Logo Ecash Technologies, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Rex Myers +1 415 268 2000 +1 415 268 1999 roger.myers@bryancave.com

Represented by Law Offices of Amitai Schwartz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Mija Sitkin +1 510 597 1775 +1 510 597 0957 lisa@schwartzlaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RECORD on appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals vols: 2 transcripts: 2 (pjap) (Entered: 09/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: Based on the foregoing, the crt ORDS that plf eCash Techonologies Inc be awarded attys' fees & costs in the sum of $8,394.62 & that dft Mark Guagliardo pay that sum to plf no more than 30 days from entry of this order by Judge Audrey B. Collins CR: N/P (bg) (Entered: 09/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: (In Chambers) The 9th Cir has referred this fully-briefed mot to this Crt for decision; the motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1] is taken under submission by Judge Audrey B. Collins CR: Not Present (rrey) (Entered: 09/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CC ORDER FROM USCA aplle eCash Technologies,Inc.,req to transfer consideration of its mot for atty's fees to the dist crt is GR. (00-57107,01-55325 & 01-56076) (ghap) Modified on 09/06/2002 (Entered: 09/06/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals affirming is hereby filed & spread upon the minutes of this U S District Court. Appeal No 00-56076 (bg) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals affirming is hereby filed & spread upon the minutes of this U S District Court. Appeal No 00-55325 (bg) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE from Circuit Court of Appeals affirming is hereby filed & spread upon the minutes of this U S District Court. Appeal 00-57107 (bg) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFIED COPY of Appellate Court Order: Appeal N 00-57107; 01-555325 & 01-56076 affirming the decision of the District Court [42-1] (bg) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S record on appeal transmitted to Circuit vols: 2 transcripts: 2 (01-56076) (dlu) (Entered: 11/09/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER FROM USCA crt of appeals records do not indicate that applnt has fld a civil appeals docketing stmt accordance with circuit rule 3-4. Within fourteen (14) days of the filing ogf this ord, applnt shall file a civil app docketing stmt, contact the clk & assist location of the docketing stmt if one is already fld, or dism the app voluntarily. (01-56076) (ghap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number appeal [76-1] 01-56076. (ghap) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Mark Guagliardo to 9th C/A from Dist. Court Stip & Ord fld 5/23/01 & ent 5/25/01 [74-2] (cc: James B. Hicks, Ervin, Cohen & Jessup LLP; Lisa Sitkin, Steinhart & Falconer LLP) Fee: Billed. (pjap) (Entered: 06/26/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order FROM USCA: Applnt's mot for stay of proc pending sttlmnt negotiations is gr. This app stay until 7/9/01. Within 7 days af exp of stay, applnt shall submit (1) the opening brief, or (2) a stat rpt & mot to appropriate relief. If applnt subm opening brief, ans brief shall be due 8/15/01, & optional reply brief due 14 days frm svc of ans brief. Notwithstanding the stay, applnt shall file civil apps docketing stmt within 7 days frm date of this ord. If applnt fails to cmply w/ this ord, app will be subject to dism under Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. #01-55325 (dlu) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER that plaintiff eCash Technology's complaint against defendant mark Guagliardo be and hereby is dismissed with prejudice by Judge Audrey B. Collins terminating case (MD JS-6) (ENT 5/25/01) (sent) (bp) (Entered: 05/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number appeal [61-1] 01-55325 (dlu) (Entered: 02/27/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER that an agent of Janney and Janney, who is at least 18 years of age, of suitable discretion and not a party to the within action, be authorized and appointed to serve wirts issued in the above case by Judge Audrey B. Collins (bp) (Entered: 02/21/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Lisa M. Sitkin and request for issuance of writ of execution: Judgment for $12,095.00 was entered on 1/3/01 on the docket of the above-entitled action in favor of eCash Technologies, Inc. as judgment creditor, and against Mark Guagliardo, dba Ecash.com, NetConcept Interactive, et al as judgment debtor. (bp) (Entered: 02/12/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: denying exparte motion for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1]. by Judge Audrey B. Collins CR: N/A (bp) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: The crt will consider any opposition to the ex parte filed 2/1/01 by Judge Audrey B. Collins CR: N/A (bp) (Entered: 02/06/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Objection to defendant's filing without leave of reply brief in support by plaintiff eCash Technologies of exparte application for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (bp) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Objection by plaintiff eCash Technologies to supplemental brief in support of exparte application for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (bp) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY brief by defendant Mark Guagliardo in support of exparte applicattion for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (bp) (Entered: 02/05/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Lisa M. Sitkin by plaintiff eCash Technologies in support of opposition to exparte applica tion for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (bp) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Andrew Haring by plaintiff eCash Technologies in support of exparte application for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (bp) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION by plaintiff eCash Technologies to exparte application for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (bp) (Entered: 02/02/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Supplemental brief by defendant Mark Guagliardo to exparte application for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal [58-1] (seal) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Mark Guagliardo to 9th C/A from Dist. Court ord fld 12/29/01, ent 1/3/01 [54-1] (cc: Heather L. McCloskey, Ervin, Cohen & Jessup LLP; Steinhart & Falconer LLP) Fee: Billed (wdc) (wdc) (Entered: 01/31/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROTECTIVE ORDER re: confidentiality by Discovery Robert N. Block. Each party producing iformation, including any document, thing, testimony or other data, in this litigation may segregate and label it as "CONFIDENTIAL" or "HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL" to the extent that the providing party believes the information falls within the scope of protection defined in paragraph 2 infra. Non-parties producing information in this litigation may designate such information under the provisions of this order and shall be entitled to all the protections afforded hereunder (see doc for details) (bp) (Entered: 01/31/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of HEATHER L. McCLOSKEY by defendant Mark Guagliardo re notice (jp) (Entered: 01/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EX PARTE APPLICATION filed by defendant Mark Guagliardo for stay enforcement of Order entered 1/3/01 pending appeal ; Lodged propsd ord & ntc of appeal (jp) (Entered: 01/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CERTIFICATE of Record Transmitted to USCA (00-57107) (cc: all parties) (pjap) (Entered: 01/25/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 10/30/00 (Re: [42-1]) CR: Mark Schweitzer (pjap) (pjap) (Entered: 01/18/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RECEIPT OF TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for the following date(s): 10/30/00 (Re: [42-1] ) CR: Mark Schweitzer (dlu) (Entered: 01/08/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting Plfs motion for to determine amt of attys' fees award. Plf Ecash Tech be awarded attys fees & costs in the sum of $12,095.00 & that dfts Mark Guagliardo, etal pay that sum to plf no more than 30 dys from entry of this ord [38-1] (ENT 1/3/01), SEND COPIES & NTC (pj) (Entered: 01/03/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CIVIL JY TRIAL ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collinsi (P Send) (pj) (Entered: 01/02/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: ; sched conference held ; final pretrial conference on 10:00 9/10/01 ; jury trial set on 9:00 9/25/01 5 dy est , ;discovery ddl set on 7/2/01 by Judge Audrey B. Collins CR: Mark Schweitzer (Send) (pj) (Entered: 12/29/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sur-Rply by defendant Mark Guagliardo re motion to determine amount of fees [38-1] (yc) (Entered: 12/21/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of Appellate Docket Number appeal [42-1] 00-57107 (ghap) (Entered: 12/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: by Judge Audrey B. Collins; vacating hearing re motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1]; Plf is hereby ORDERED to submit by nlt 12/22/00 a new proposed order that mor closely approximates that which was submitted to Judge Chesney and attached as exh 1 to plf's rply. (SEE MINS FOR FOR DOCUMENT)(P SEND) CR: Not Present (yc) (Entered: 12/15/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and ordering form for date: 10/30/00 CR: Mark Schweitzer (wdc) (wdc) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Lisa M. Sitkin by plaintiff eCash Technologies re motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of civil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1] (yc) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by plaintiff eCash Technologies, in suppt to motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of civil procedure memo of P/A [38-1] (yc) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
suppl decl by plaintiff eCash Technologies to motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of cvil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1] (yc) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JOINT REPORT OF EARLY MEETING OF COUNSEL filed. Estimated length of trial 5-8 days (yc) (Entered: 12/13/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION by defendant Mark Guagliardo, to determine amnt of attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1] (yc) (Entered: 12/06/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by defendant Mark Guagliardo to 9th C/A from Dist. Court Ord fld 10/30/00 & ent 10/30/00 [35-1] (cc: Heather L. McCloskey, Ervin, Cohen & Jessup LLP; Roger R. Myers, Steinhart & Falconer LLP) Fee: Paid. (pjap) (Entered: 11/30/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Preliminary response by defendant Mark Guagliardo to plf's motion to determine attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1] and obj to order dated 10/30/00; exhibit. (yc) (Entered: 11/28/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins resetting hearing on motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure and memo of P/A [38-1] 10:00 12/18/00 ; mandatory status conference set on 10:00 12/18/00 (SEND) (yc) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Roger R. Myers by plaintiff/ counter-defendant eCash Technologies in suppt of motion for attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure memo of P/A [38-1] (yc) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff/ counter-defendant eCash Technologies for attorney fees award under CA Code of vicil procedure and memo of P/A ; motion hearing set for 10:00 12/11/00 Lodged prop order (yc) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ; mandatory status conference set on 10:00 12/11/00 send (yc) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: Hrg hld; ORD plf mot to dism 1st amd cntclm & strk amd state law clms granted; plf is prevailing pty & ent to costs; defts req to fiel 2nd amd cntclm denied by Judge Audrey B. Collins CR: Mark Schweizter (send) (lc) (Entered: 11/03/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins granting motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], granting motion to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2] granting motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3]; Dft state law cnterclms premised on the 5/31/00 letter are DISMISSED. w/out prej. The crt GRANTS plf's mot to dism the state law cnterclms as to all state law cntclms premised on facts other than the 5/31/00 letter w/prej. Finally the crt declares plf to be a prevailing pty. thereby entitled to fees and costs incurred in striking the non meritorious counterclms. (ENTER 10/30/00) NO JS-6 (yc) (Entered: 11/02/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: terminating attorney Heather L McCloskey for Mark Guagliardo by defendant Mark Guagliardo and substituting attorney James B. Hicks by Judge Audrey B. Collins (yc) (Entered: 11/01/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF STATE LAW COUNTERCLAIMS by defendant/ counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo,That counerclaimsnt Guagliardo hereby voluntarily dism w/out prej his state law counterclms. This dism shll have no impact on any other clms of causes of actn alleged in the 1st A/Counterclm. (ENTER 10/10/00) (yc) (Entered: 10/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Request for by defendant/ counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo to motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], motion to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2], motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] (yc) (Entered: 10/06/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Objection to filing of amended by plaintiff eCash Technologies to motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], motion to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2], motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] (yc) (Entered: 09/29/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: by Judge Audrey B. Collins The crt hereby ORDERS that plf eCash may file a suppl rply on or bef 10/6/00, addressisng only dft's voluntary dism of the state law counterclms w/out prej. Further in that dfts's sur-rply was not sanctioned by this crt, the Crt w/not consider the arguments raised by dft w/regard to the continuing viability of its federal clsm for cancellation of plf's registered trademark. the crt w/proceed only on the mot, oppo and rply. CR: Not Present(PRIORITY SND) (yc) (Entered: 09/26/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/19/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: by Judge Audrey B. Collins; resetting hearing on motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1] 10:00 10/30/00, resetting hearing on motion to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2] 10:00 10/30/00, resettng hearing on motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] 10:00 10/30/00 CR: Not Present (PRIORITY SEND) (yc) (Entered: 09/22/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Amended oppo by defendant/ counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo to motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], motion to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2], motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] (yc) (Entered: 09/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION of Counsel for defendant/ counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo by attorney James B Hicks (yc) (Entered: 08/22/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by plaintiff eCash Technologies, memo of P/A in suppt of motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1] (yc) (Entered: 08/22/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTES: by Judge Audrey B. Collins; resetting hearing on motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1] 10:00 10/2/00, resetting hearing on to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2] 10:00 10/2/00, resetting hearing on motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] 10:00 10/2/00; The deadline for the parties LR 6 early meeing of cnsl shall be cont until 10/9/00 or one wk after the crt issues its ruling on eCash's mots whichever occcurs later. CR: Not Present (PRIORITY SEND) (yc) (Entered: 08/18/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION by defendant/ counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo to motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], motion to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2], motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] (yc) (Entered: 08/08/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of hrg on mots to dism 1st amd cntclm and str amd st law cntclms 8/21/00 10:00 by plaintiff eCash Technologies (lc) (Entered: 08/02/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff eCash Technologies on 7/25/00 of Ntc of hrg on mot & mot to dism 1st amd cntclm; Memo of P/A's in suppt, etc. (jp) (Entered: 07/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF P/A IN SUPPORT by plaintiff, counter defendant eCash Technologies of motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2], & for attorney fees & costs [19-3] (mch) (Entered: 07/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST by plaintiff, counter-defendant eCash Technologies for judicial notice in suppt of motion to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm [19-1], to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms [19-2], & for motion for attorney fees & costs [19-3] (mch) (Entered: 07/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff, counter-defendant eCash Technologies to dismiss dfts 1st Amd Cntclm , and to strike dfts Amd state law cntclms , and for attorney fees & costs ; motion hearing set for 10:00 8/21/00; Lodged Prop Ord (mch) (Entered: 07/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/13/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ; extending the deadline for the early meeting of cnsl until 8/14/00 and mandatory status conference set on 10:00 8/28/00 (yc) (Entered: 07/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION by defendant, counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo to motion for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon which relief can be granted [10-1], for an ord striking the dft's st law cnt-clms [10-2], for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs to Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 [10-3]; Exh (ks) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OBJECTION by defendant/ counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo to motion for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon which relief can be granted [10-1], for an ord striking the dft's st law cnt-clms [10-2], for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs to Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 [10-3] (ks) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTES: by Audrey B Collins; The crt hereby DENIES motion for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon which relief can be granted [10-1] moot, finding the motion for an ord striking the dft's st law cnt-clms [10-2] moot., finding the motion for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 [10-3] moot. the 7/17/00 hrging date is VACATED. CR: Not Present (PRIORITY SEND) (yc) (Entered: 07/07/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/3/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
First AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM [7-1] by counter-claimant Mark Guagliardo ; summons not issued (twdb) (Entered: 07/06/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Drew Hyatt by plaintiff eCash Technologies, counter-defendant eCash Technologies in suppt of motion for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon which relief can be granted [10-1], motion for an ord striking dft's st law cnt-clms [10-2], motion for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs to Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 [10-3] (yl) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST by plaintiff eCash Technologies, counter-defendant eCash Technologies for judicial notice in suppt of motion for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon relief can be granted [10-1], re motion for an ord striking the dft's st law cnt-clms [10-2], re motion for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs to Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 [10-3] (yl) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF P/A 's IN SUPPORT by plaintiff eCash Technologies, counter-defendant eCash Technologies of motion for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon relief can be granted [10-1], motion for an ord striking dft's st law cnt-clms [10-2], motion for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs to Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 [10-3] (yl) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/22/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by plaintiff eCash Technologies, counter-defendant eCash Technologies for an ord to dismiss dft's cnt-clms for failure to st a clm upon which relief can be granted , for an ord striking the dft's st law cnt-clms on the grounds that these clms arose from moving dft's acts in furtherance of their right of free speech on a public issue , for an ord awarding attorney fees & costs purs to Code of Civil procedure Sect. 425 ; motion hearing set for 9:30 7/17/00; Lodged Ord (yl) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins, the parties have agreed to hold one early meeting in which they will address all clms and counterclms and make all required initial disclosure by 6/30/00 and to thereafter file their jnt rpt by 7/14/00.(SEND DOC) (yc) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Audrey B. Collins ; mandatory status conference set on 10:00 7/24/00 (yc) (Entered: 06/05/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COUNTERCLAIM by defendant Mark Guagliardo against plaintiff eCash Technologiescntdft Does 1-100 ; summons not issued (lc) (Entered: 06/01/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED ANSWER [4-1] by defendant Mark Guagliardo to complt; jury demand (lc) (Entered: 06/01/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Mark Guagliardo (pj) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER filed by defendant Mark Guagliardo in his own capacity also incorrectly sued as dba Ecash.com, NetConcept Interactive, NetConcept & NetConcept Inc to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (pj) (Entered: 05/10/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements filed (twdb) (Entered: 04/20/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by plaintiff eCash Technologies (pc) (Entered: 03/31/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) Issued referred to Discovery Robert N. Block; Jury Demand (pc) (Entered: 03/31/2000)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 3 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?