Richard Yeager v. Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 17-11351

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 5, 2018 at 1:37 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109470681 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Deana J. Yeager and Richard A. Yeager. Motion is Unopposed. [8088690-1] (ECF: Earl Underwood)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109466262 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Deana J. Yeager and Richard A. Yeager on 03/23/2017. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 04/10/2017 as to Appellant Richard A. Yeager. Awaiting Appellee's CIP due on or before 04/24/2017 as to Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 01109470681 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to voluntarily dismiss appeal filed by Deana J. Yeager and Richard A. Yeager. Motion is Unopposed. [8088690-1] (ECF: Earl Underwood)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109466262 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Deana J. Yeager and Richard A. Yeager on 03/23/2017. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 04/10/2017 as to Appellant Richard A. Yeager. Awaiting Appellee's CIP due on or before 04/24/2017 as to Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 3 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?