Continental Casualty Company v. Amerisure Insurance Company
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-1149

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 11:09 PM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF by Appellee Continental Casualty Company in 17-1149, Appellant Continental Casualty Company in 17-1208 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING/RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/26/2017. [1000069751] [17-1149, 17-1208] Karen Ventrell
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Amerisure Insurance Company in 17-1149. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/28/2017. [1000050130] [17-1149, 17-1208] Adam White
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF by Appellant Amerisure Insurance Company in 17-1149 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2017. [1000050121] [17-1149, 17-1208] Adam White
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [17-1149, 17-1208] (LP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Amerisure Insurance Company.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/27/2017. Opening/Response Brief Due: 04/26/2017. Response/Reply Brief Due 05/26/2017. [17-1149, 17-1208] (MR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER filed [1000024249] consolidating secondary case 17-1208 with lead case 17-1149(L). Cross-appeal appellant: Amerisure Insurance Company.. Copies to all parties.. [17-1149, 17-1208] (MR)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER filed [1000024248] rescinding briefing schedule Copies to all parties.. [17-1149] (MR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Continental Casualty Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000023825] [17-1149] Karen Ventrell
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Karen Ventrell for Continental Casualty Company.[1000023824] [17-1149] Karen Ventrell
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David G. Redding for Continental Casualty Company.[1000023799] [17-1149] Joseph Pellington
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ty K. McTier for Continental Casualty Company.[1000023797] [17-1149] Joseph Pellington
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Amerisure Insurance Company. [17-1149] Adam White
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Amerisure Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000023624] [17-1149] Adam White
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Richard L. Pinto for Amerisure Insurance Company.[1000023616] [17-1149] Adam White
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adam L. White for Amerisure Insurance Company.[1000023613] [17-1149] Adam White
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: attorney Marjorie C. Redding. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/14/2017. Response Brief due 04/13/2017 [17-1149] (MR)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-00529-GCM. Mailed to: attorney Marjorie C. Redding. [17-1149] (MR)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 3:14-cv-00529-GCM. Case manager: MRadday. [17-1149] (MR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?