Brianna Johnson v. Admiral Investments, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 17-1298

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2018 at 10:55 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803182129 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE filed by Bernard John Barrett, Jr. for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) CFPB w/service 04/11/2017 [4523194] [17-1298] (BJB) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:54 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803181446 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    APPEARANCE filed by Mark J. Karon for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) Mr. Mark J Karon w/service 04/11/2017 [4522889] [17-1298] (MJK) [Entered: 04/11/2017 12:24 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803180435 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Mark J Karon w/service 04/10/2017, Length: 9 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Mark J Karon due 04/17/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4522372] [17-1298] (SRD) [Entered: 04/10/2017 03:34 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803180355 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by CFPB w/service 04/10/2017, Length: 6424 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Consumer Financial Protection Bureau due 04/17/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4522334] [17-1298] (SRD) [Entered: 04/10/2017 03:00 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803180215 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Ms. Brianna Johnson correcting [4520612-2] brief filed by Appellant. [4522276] [17-1298] (DBS) [Entered: 04/10/2017 02:23 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803179140 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AMICUS brief of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4521747] [17-1298] (NMJ) [Entered: 04/07/2017 04:42 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803177633 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AMICUS brief of Mark J. Karon, University Student Legal Service submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4520961] [17-1298] (MJK) [Entered: 04/06/2017 11:50 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803182129 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE filed by Bernard John Barrett, Jr. for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) CFPB w/service 04/11/2017 [4523194] [17-1298] (BJB) [Entered: 04/11/2017 04:54 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803181446 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPEARANCE filed by Mark J. Karon for Amicus on Behalf of Appellant(s) Mr. Mark J Karon w/service 04/11/2017 [4522889] [17-1298] (MJK) [Entered: 04/11/2017 12:24 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803180435 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by Mr. Mark J Karon w/service 04/10/2017 , Length: 9 pages 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Mark J Karon due 04/17/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4522372] [17-1298] (SRD) [Entered: 04/10/2017 03:34 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803180355 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      BRIEF FILED - AMICUS BRIEF filed by CFPB w/service 04/10/2017 , Length: 6424 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Consumer Financial Protection Bureau due 04/17/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4522334] [17-1298] (SRD) [Entered: 04/10/2017 03:00 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803180215 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Ms. Brianna Johnson correcting [4520612-2] brief filed by Appellant. [4522276] [17-1298] (DBS) [Entered: 04/10/2017 02:23 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803179140 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMICUS brief of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4521747] [17-1298] (NMJ) [Entered: 04/07/2017 04:42 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803177633 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AMICUS brief of Mark J. Karon, University Student Legal Service submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4520961] [17-1298] (MJK) [Entered: 04/06/2017 11:50 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 3 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?