Golb v. Attorney General of the State
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 16-647

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 5:27 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant New York State Attorney General in 16-452, 16-647, FILED. Service date 04/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2008190] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 04/10/2017 03:20 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Vincent W. Rivellese, Esq. for Appellee-Cross-Appellant New York State Attorney General in 16-452, 16-647, FILED. Service date 04/10/2017 by CM/ECF. [2007833] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 04/10/2017 11:44 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Ronald Lawrence Kuby, Esq. for Appellant-Cross-Appellee Raphael Golb in 16-452, 16-647, FILED. Service date 04/07/2017 by CM/ECF. [2006838] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 04/07/2017 12:48 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Raphael Golb in 16-452, 16-647, FILED. Service date 03/27/2017 by CM/ECF. [1998273] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 03/27/2017 03:12 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NEW CASE MANAGER, Frank Perez, ASSIGNED.[1974546] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 02/23/2017 09:04 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant-Cross-Appellee Raphael Golb in 16-452, 16-647 Appellant-Cross-Appellee brief due date as 03/27/2017; FILED.[1957361] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 01/30/2017 10:49 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee Raphael Golb in 16-452, 16-647, informing Court of proposed due date 03/27/2017, RECEIVED. Service date 01/27/2017 by CM/ECF.[1956836] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 01/27/2017 03:48 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant New York State Attorney General in 16-452, 16-647, FILED. Service date 01/26/2017 by CM/ECF. [1956073] [16-452, 16-647] [Entered: 01/26/2017 06:34 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 1 time.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?