Patricia Smith v. Hillary Clinton
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 17-5133

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 14, 2019 at 2:17 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2320 - Assault Libel and Slander
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207970205 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S ORDER [1700799] filed granting appellee's unopposed motion to extend time [1700438-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 11/17/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/01/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/08/2017. Final Briefs due 12/22/2017. [17-5133]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207970205 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CLERK'S ORDER [1700799] filed granting appellee's unopposed motion to extend time [1700438-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLEE Brief due on 11/17/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/01/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/08/2017. Final Briefs due 12/22/2017. [17-5133]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 01207969690 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      UNOPPOSED MOTION [1700438] to extend time to file brief to 11/17/2017 filed by USA Length Certification: 353 Words. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207969690 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        UNOPPOSED MOTION [1700438] to extend time to file brief to 11/17/2017 filed by USA Length Certification: 353 Words. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 01207963918 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AMENDED APPELLANT BRIEF [1695374] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/28/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6518 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207963918 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AMENDED APPELLANT BRIEF [1695374] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/28/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6518 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207963570 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPELLANT BRIEF [1695097] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/27/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6518 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207963570 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPELLANT BRIEF [1695097] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/27/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6518 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207958594 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CLERK'S ORDER [1691959] filed granting appellants' consent motion to extend time [1691539-2], Th following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 09/27/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/27/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/13/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/20/2017. Final Briefs due 12/04/2017. [17-5133]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207958594 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CLERK'S ORDER [1691959] filed granting appellants' consent motion to extend time [1691539-2], Th following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 09/27/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/27/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/13/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 11/20/2017. Final Briefs due 12/04/2017. [17-5133]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207958401 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1691851] for motion to extend time [1691539-2] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207958401 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH TYPE-VOLUME LIMITS [1691851] for motion to extend time [1691539-2] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207957910 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1691539] to extend time to file brief to 09/27/2017 filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/05/2017 ] Length Certification: 80 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207957910 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CONSENT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1691539] to extend time to file brief to 09/27/2017 filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 09/05/2017 ] Length Certification: 80 Words. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207948642 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CLERK'S ORDER [1686401] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/06/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/06/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/20/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 10/27/2017. Final Briefs due 11/13/2017. [17-5133]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207948642 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CLERK'S ORDER [1686401] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/06/2017. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/06/2017. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 10/20/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 10/27/2017. Final Briefs due 11/13/2017. [17-5133]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207942123 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AMENDED DOCKETING STATEMENT [1682795] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/06/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207942123 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AMENDED DOCKETING STATEMENT [1682795] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/06/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941893 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1682677] submitted by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941893 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1682677] submitted by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941890 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1682676] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941890 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1682676] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 01207941887 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1682675] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941887 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1682675] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941884 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1682674] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941884 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1682674] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941878 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682672] filed by Larry Klayman, Esq. on behalf of Appellants Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941878 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682672] filed by Larry Klayman, Esq. on behalf of Appellants Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941875 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT [1682671] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941875 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            DOCKETING STATEMENT [1682671] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941872 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682670] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941872 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682670] filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods [Service Date: 07/05/2017 ] [17-5133] (Klayman, Larry)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941577 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682503] filed by USA [Service Date: 07/03/2017 ] [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941577 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682503] filed by USA [Service Date: 07/03/2017 ] [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941574 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682502] filed by Weili J. Shaw and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellee USA. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941574 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682502] filed by Weili J. Shaw and co-counsel Mark B. Stern on behalf of Appellee USA. [17-5133] (Shaw, Weili)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941282 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682332] filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton [Service Date: 06/30/2017 ] [17-5133] (Kendall, David)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941282 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1682332] filed by Hillary Rodham Clinton [Service Date: 06/30/2017 ] [17-5133] (Kendall, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207941279 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682331] filed by David E. Kendall and co-counsel Katherine M. Turner, Amy Mason Saharia on behalf of Appellee Hillary Rodham Clinton. [17-5133] (Kendall, David)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207941279 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1682331] filed by David E. Kendall and co-counsel Katherine M. Turner, Amy Mason Saharia on behalf of Appellee Hillary Rodham Clinton. [17-5133] (Kendall, David)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207933836 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL [1678240] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01606-ABJ filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 17-5133. [17-5133]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207933830 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CLERK'S ORDER [1678237] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/20/2017; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/20/2017 [17-5133]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207933836 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL [1678240] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01606-ABJ filed by Patricia Smith and Charles Woods. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 17-5133. [17-5133]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207933830 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        CLERK'S ORDER [1678237] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT statement of issues due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT underlying decision due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT transcript status report due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT procedural motions due 07/05/2017. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/20/2017; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE procedural motions due 07/05/2017. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/20/2017 [17-5133]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 15 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?