Sandra S. Forquer v. Samuel I. White, P.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2458

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 3:04 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 16-2458 opn.u.sub. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-03795-ELH. Entered on Docket Date: 04/03/2017. [1000054383] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. Mailed to: Sandra S. Forquer 452 East Broadway Street Bel Air, MD 21014. [16-2458] (ABW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    UNPUBLISHED PER CURIAM OPINION filed. Motion disposition in opinion--granting Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24) [5] Originating case number: 1:16-cv-03795-ELH Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [1000054357]. Mailed to: Sandra S. Forquer 452 East Broadway Street Bel Air, MD 21014. [16-2458] (ABW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Appellant Sandra S. Forquer. [16-2458] (ABW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER filed [1000008186] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24) filed by Appellant Sandra S. Forquer [5] Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Sandra S. Forquer 452 East Broadway Street Bel Air, MD 21014. [16-2458] (ABW)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Sandra S. Forquer 452 East Broadway Street Bel Air, MD 21014. Informal Opening Brief due 01/23/2017 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief filed. [16-2458] (ABW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FEE NOTICE issued to Sandra S. Forquer - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 01/30/2017 Originating case number: 1:16-cv-03795-ELH. Mailed to: Sandra S. Forquer 452 East Broadway Street Bel Air, MD 21014. [16-2458] (ABW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:16-cv-03795-ELH. Case manager: AshleyWebb. [16-2458] (ABW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?