David Daugherty v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-2243

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 30, 2017 at 12:24 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406369816 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/24/2017. [1000009782] [16-2243] Jason Manning
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee David M. Daugherty. Counsel arguing: Rachel S. Bloomekatz [1000072859] [16-2243] Rachel Bloomekatz
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Rachel S. Bloomekatz for David M. Daugherty.[1000072852] [16-2243] Rachel Bloomekatz
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION by Appellee David M. Daugherty to extend filing time for response brief until 04/17/2017 and to continue/reschedule oral argument (Local Rule 34(c)) Date and method of service: 03/08/2017 ecf. [1000038634] [1000038634] [16-2243].] Deepak Gupta
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Deepak Gupta for David M. Daugherty.[1000038628] [16-2243] Deepak Gupta
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 05/11/2017. Registration Time: 7:45 - 8:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 8:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [16-2243] (JLC)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORDER filed [1000026981] granting Motion to extend filing time [42], updating briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 03/16/2017. Copies to all parties. [16-2243] (TW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION by Appellee David M. Daugherty to extend filing time for response brief. Date and method of service: 02/20/2017 ecf. [1000026401] [16-2243] Jed Nolan
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE RE: CONFLICT WITH PROPOSED ARGUMENT DATES by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Argument Session: May 9-11, 2017 Days you are available: May 11, 2017 [16-2243] John Lynch
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 5/9/17 - 5/11/17 argument session. Additional copies due: 02/15/2017. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 02/20/2017. [16-2243] (JLC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Corrected FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX (volume 2 and 3) and full paper appendix by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Appellee David M. Daugherty. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 02/07/2017. [1000018866] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Corrected FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Appellee David M. Daugherty. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/27/2017. [1000011773] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Docket correction requested from Mr. Jason E. Manning for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.... [16-2243] (RE)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Corrected FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX Volume No. V (5) and full paper appendix by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Appellee David M. Daugherty. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 01/25/2017. Corrected to add the volume no. that was refiled.--[Edited 01/25/2017 by RE] [1000010478] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Docket correction requested from Mr. Jason E. Manning for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [16-2243] (RE)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER filed [1000010038] sealing. Joint Appendix Volume 9. Copies to all parties.. [16-2243] (RE)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: apx vol. 9. [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    BRIEF by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 01/24/2017. [1000009777] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COURT ORDER filed [1000009353] granting Motion to expedite decision [21]; granting Motion for stay pending appeal [21], granting Motion for stay pending appeal [17] Copies to all parties.. [16-2243] (RE)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER filed [1000004452] granting Motion to extend filing time [22], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/24/2017. Response brief due 02/23/2017 Copies to all parties.. [16-2243] (RE)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 01/17/2017 ecf. [1000004262] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to expedite decision, for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 01/05/2017 ecf. [999998982] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              REPLY by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to Response [19], Motion for stay pending appeal [17].. [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RESPONSE/ANSWER by David M. Daugherty to notice requesting response [18], Motion for stay pending appeal [17]. [16-2243] Jed Nolan
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE ISSUED to Jed Robert Nolan for David M. Daugherty and Mr. Ralph C. Young, Esq. for David M. Daugherty requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [17]Response due: 12/20/2016.[999985448]. [16-2243] (RE)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC for stay pending appeal. Date of action to be stayed, if applicable:12/12/16.. Date and method of service: 12/12/2016 ecf. [999985393] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORDER filed [999980956] granting Motion to extend filing time [15], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 01/17/2017. Response brief due 02/16/2017 Copies to all parties. [16-2243] (RE)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until January 26, 2017 [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-2243] (LP)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 12/27/2016. Response Brief due 01/26/2017 [16-2243] (RE)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Mary A. Schweinhagen. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: May 23, 2016 verdict and closing. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Ocwen Loan Servicing.. Originating case number: 5:14-cv-24506. [16-2243] (RE)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed for Lisa Stewart Cook. Identify by proceeding and date all transcript ordered from this court reporter: May 16-20, 2016 Trial. Names of all parties ordering transcript from this reporter: Ocwen Loan Servicing.. Originating case number: 5:14-cv-24506. [16-2243] (RE)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999966754] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      BRIEF by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/12/2017. [1000061015] [16-2243] Megan Burns
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Megan E. Burns for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.[999966750] [16-2243] Megan Burns
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER filed [1000053829] granting Motion to extend filing time [54], updating/resuming reply brief deadlines Reply brief due 04/12/2017 Copies to all parties.. [16-2243] (RHS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John C. Lynch for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.[999966748] [16-2243] John Lynch
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC to extend filing time for reply brief. Date and method of service: 03/31/2017 ecf. [1000053709] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jason E. Manning for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.[999966745] [16-2243] Jason Manning
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  BRIEF by Appellee David M. Daugherty in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/27/2017. [1000049093] [16-2243] Jed Nolan
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee David M. Daugherty. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999966584] [16-2243] Jed Nolan
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      COURT ORDER filed [1000043485] granting Motion to expedite consideration of motion [50]; granting Motion to extend filing time [47] Copies to all parties.; denying Motion to continue/reschedule oral argument (Local Rule 34(c)) [47], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 03/24/2017. Copies to all parties. [16-2243] (TW)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jed R. Nolan for David M. Daugherty.[999966577] [16-2243] Jed Nolan
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION by Appellee David M. Daugherty for expedited consideration of motion for extension of time to file response brief. Date and method of service: 03/13/2017 ecf. [1000041467] [16-2243] Deepak Gupta
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ralph C. Young for David M. Daugherty.[999966566] [16-2243] Ralph Young
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee David M. Daugherty. [1000040244] [16-2243] Jed Nolan
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:14-cv-24506. Mailed to: Christopher Frost, Jonathan Kenney. [16-2243] (RE)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Counsel arguing: John C. Lynch Opening argument time: 15 minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: Jason E. Manning [1000040132] [16-2243] John Lynch
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:14-cv-24506. Case manager: REdwards. [16-2243] (RE)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?