Henry Kislin v. Northland Group Inc
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 17-1908

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 26, 2018 at 1:45 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012623448 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Northland Group Inc, filed. (ARE)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012623533 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kirsten H. Smith on behalf of Appellee(s) Northland Group, LLC. (KHS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012621829 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aaron R. Easley on behalf of Appellee(s) Northland Group Inc.. (ARE)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012622418 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Northland Group Inc advising no action will be taken on the Entry of Appearance Forms by Kirsten H. Smith, Esquire and Bryan C. Shartle, Esquire, or the Corporate Disclosure Form.--[Edited 05/12/2017 by ARR] (ARR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012619568 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Henry Kislin, filed. (BJW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012619576 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Henry Kislin, received. (BJW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012619584 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Henry Kislin advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (BJW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012623533 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kirsten H. Smith on behalf of Appellee(s) Northland Group, LLC. (KHS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012623448 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Northland Group Inc, filed. (ARE)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012622418 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NONCOMPLIANCE Order sent to Appellee Northland Group Inc advising no action will be taken on the Entry of Appearance Forms by Kirsten H. Smith, Esquire and Bryan C. Shartle, Esquire, or the Corporate Disclosure Form.--[Edited 05/12/2017 by ARR] (ARR)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012621829 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Aaron R. Easley on behalf of Appellee(s) Northland Group Inc.. (ARE)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012619584 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Henry Kislin advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (BJW)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 003012619576 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Henry Kislin, received. (BJW)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012619568 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Henry Kislin, filed. (BJW)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 2 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?