Rockledge Associates, LLC v. Transamerica Life Insurance Co
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-1278

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 2:51 AM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4230 - Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Docket correction requested from William M. Bosch and Robert A. DeRise for Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1278, 17-1297 Re: [15] Brief. Corrected brief due 04/24/2017. [17-1278, 17-1297] (ALC)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1278, Appellee Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1297. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/18/2017. [1000063293] [17-1278, 17-1297] William Bosch
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF by Appellant Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1278, Appellee Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1297 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/18/2017. [1000063276] [17-1278, 17-1297] William Bosch
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [17-1278, 17-1297] (MRB)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert A. DeRise for Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1278, 17-1297.[1000044613] [17-1278, 17-1297] Robert DeRise
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Transamerica Life Insurance Company in 17-1278, Appellant Transamerica Life Insurance Company in 17-1297. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000044552] [17-1278, 17-1297] Rebecca Davis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Rebecca A. Davis for Transamerica Life Insurance Company in 17-1278, 17-1297.[1000044549] [17-1278, 17-1297] Rebecca Davis
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Cheryl Leanne Prybylski for Transamerica Life Insurance Company in 17-1278, 17-1297.[1000044546] [17-1278, 17-1297] Cheryl Prybylski
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Rockledge Associates, LLC. [17-1278] William Bosch
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1278, Appellee Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1297. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000044479] [17-1278, 17-1297] William Bosch
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by William M. Bosch for Rockledge Associates, LLC in 17-1278, 17-1297.[1000044478] [17-1278, 17-1297] William Bosch
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        BRIEFING ORDER filed. Name of Cross-Appeal Appellant for briefing purposes: Rockledge Associates, LLC. Mailed to: Rebecca Davis and Rebecca Woods. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/17/2017. Opening/Response Brief Due: 05/17/2017. Response/Reply Brief Due 06/16/2017. [17-1278, 17-1297] (ALC)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ORDER filed [1000038197] consolidating case 17-1297 with 17-1278. Cross-appeal appellant: Rockledge Associates, LLC. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Rebecca Davis and Rebecca Woods. [17-1278, 17-1297] (ALC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER filed [1000038165] rescinding briefing schedule. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: attorneys Rebecca Davis and Rebecca Woods. [17-1278] (ALC)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: attorneys Rebecca Davis and Rebecca Woods. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/12/2017. Response Brief due 05/12/2017. [17-1278] (ALC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case. Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-00710-PWG. Mailed to: attorneys Rebecca Davis and Rebecca Woods. [17-1278] (ALC)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-00710-PWG. Case manager: ACarlheim. [17-1278] (ALC)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?