Jeremy Powell v. The Huntington National Bank
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-1118

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 4:06 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406464188 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
(ENTRY RESTRICTED) Joint FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/31/2017. [1000053713] [17-1118] Patricia Kipnis
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Bankers Association as Amicus Party, Consumer Bankers Association as Amicus Party, Financial Services Roundtable as Amicus Party, Ohio Bankers League as Amicus Party, West Virginia Bankers Association as Amicus Party in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/26/2017. [1000089741] [17-1118] Amanda Lawrence
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF by Appellee The Huntington National Bank in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/22/2017. [1000085885] [17-1118] Andrew Soukup
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER filed [1000060107] granting Motion to extend filing time [23], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 05/22/2017, updating/resuming reply brief deadlines Reply brief due 06/12/2017 Copies to all parties.. [17-1118] (RE)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION by Appellee The Huntington National Bank to extend filing time for response/reply brief until May 21, 2017 and June 12, 2017. Date and method of service: 04/11/2017 ecf. [1000060012] [17-1118] John Lynch
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Corrected FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Jeremy A. Powell and Tina Powell. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/04/2017. [1000055691] [17-1118] Patricia Kipnis
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Docket correction requested from Patricia Mulvoy Kipnis for Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell, Mr. Jonathan R. Marshall for Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell and Mr. Scott G. Stapleton for Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell. [17-1118] (RE)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                BRIEF by Appellants Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/31/2017. [1000053685] [17-1118] Patricia Kipnis
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER filed [1000038979] extending filing time for response brief until 5/1/17, updating briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 05/01/2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1118] (TW)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER filed [1000035432] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 3/31/17, updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/31/2017. Response brief due 04/21/2017. Copies to all parties. [17-1118] (TW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ORDER filed [1000030402] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/17/2017. Response due 04/17/2017 Copies to all parties. [17-1118] (RE)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Initial mediation conference scheduled. [17-1118] (MRB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Patricia M. Kipnis for Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell.[1000021648] [17-1118] Patricia Kipnis
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell. [17-1118] Jonathan Marshall
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000021640] [17-1118] Jonathan Marshall
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jonathan R. Marshall for Jeremy a. Powell and Tina Powell.[1000021636] [17-1118] Jonathan Marshall
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Megan E. Burns for The Huntington National Bank.[1000019509] [17-1118] Megan Burns
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John C. Lynch for The Huntington National Bank.[1000019502] [17-1118] John Lynch
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)).[1000019171] [17-1118] Andrew Soukup
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee The Huntington National Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000019170] [17-1118] Robert Long
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)).[1000019167] [17-1118] Robert Long
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Scott Stapleton and Carrie Fenwick. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/08/2017. Response Brief due 04/07/2017 [17-1118] (RE)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-32179. Mailed to: Scott Stapleton and Carrie Fenwick. [17-1118] (RE)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:13-cv-32179. Case manager: REdwards. [17-1118] (RE)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?