Quentin Holt v. Bryan Stirling
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-6427

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 18, 2017 at 12:08 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Elizabeth Franklin-Best for Quentin J. Holt.[1000070704] [17-6427] (RE)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    INFORMAL OPENING BRIEF by Appellant Quentin J. Holt. [17-6427] (RE)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed [1000063779] deferring action on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (FRAP 24) filed by Appellant Quentin J. Holt [7] Copies to all parties.. [17-6427] (RE)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 04/17/2017 [17-6427] (RE)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          INFORMAL PRELIMINARY BRIEFING ORDER filed. Informal Opening Brief due 04/27/2017 [17-6427] (RE)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FEE NOTICE issued to Elizabeth Anne Franklin-Best for Quentin J. Holt - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 05/03/2017 Originating case number: 6:15-cv-04865-TMC. [17-6427] (RE)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Habeas corpus appeal docketed. Originating case number: 6:15-cv-04865-TMC. Date notice of appeal filed: 03/31/2017. Case manager: REdwards. Did district court rule on COA? Yes. [17-6427] (RE)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 3 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?