Jeffrey Carney v. Unifund CCR, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 17-1120

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 2:46 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803150600 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE ISSUED. [4507242] [17-1120] (CMD) [Entered: 03/02/2017 06:53 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803150597 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT FILED - Granting [4507079-2] Stipulation Dismissal filed by Appellant Mr. Jeffrey A. Carney. The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [4507233] [17-1120] (CMD) [Entered: 03/02/2017 06:50 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803150290 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION for dismissal filed by Appellant Mr. Jeffrey A. Carney. w/service 03/01/2017 [4507079] [17-1120] (DBS) [Entered: 03/01/2017 03:10 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803131671 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CLERK ORDER:Granting [4497615-2] motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Mr. Patrick Daniel Newman. Mr. Patrick Daniel Newman for Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and Unifund CCR, LLC has been granted leave to withdraw from this case. [4497824] [17-1120] (CMD) [Entered: 02/03/2017 10:53 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803131198 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to withdraw as retained counsel, filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick Daniel Newman for Appellees Gurstel Chargo, P.A. and Unifund CCR, LLC w/service 02/02/2017. [4497615] [17-1120] (PDN) [Entered: 02/02/2017 04:07 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803119701 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Jeffrey A. Carney. No Transcript[4491906] [17-1120] (DBS) [Entered: 01/19/2017 05:38 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803119698 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Jeffrey A. Carney - w/service 01/19/2017. [4491905] [17-1120] (DBS) [Entered: 01/19/2017 05:37 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803119695 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Jeffrey A. Carney w/service 01/19/2017 [4491904] [17-1120] (DBS) [Entered: 01/19/2017 05:34 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803117739 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 02/27/2017. Appendix due 03/09/2017. BRIEF APPELLANT, Jeffrey A. Carney due 03/09/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4490931] [17-1120] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/18/2017 12:16 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803117735 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order of 12/6/2016, judgment of 12/7/2016 [4490929] [17-1120] (CYZ) [Entered: 01/18/2017 12:15 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?