Paul Hill v. Accounts Receivable Services
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, Case No. 16-4356

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2017 at 12:42 AM DT (3.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 00803274234 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
28(j) citation filed by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill w/service 08/08/2017 - FOR CAL [4565862] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 08/08/2017 09:05 AM]
    LREF
    Blank 00803265286 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    28(j) citation filed by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill w/service 07/27/2017 - FOR CAL [4562121] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 07/27/2017 04:03 PM]
      LREF
      Blank 00803146054 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF FILED - APPELLEE BRIEF filed by Accounts Receivable Services, LLC, w/service 02/23/2017 , Length: 7,204 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Accounts Receivable Services, LLC due 02/28/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Reply brief of Paul Hill due on 03/09/2017. [4504874] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 02/23/2017 04:22 PM]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803145208 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPELLEE brief of Accounts Receivable Services, LLC submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4504487] [16-4356] (JLK) [Entered: 02/23/2017 10:46 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803134219 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CORRECTED certificate of service for Paper Brief, Doc No. [4498696-2], filed by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill [4499042] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 02/07/2017 03:16 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803128770 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CLERK ORDER: Granting [4493950-2] motion to seal filed by Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert. The Court is hereby sealing the following: Volume II of Joint Appendix [4496435] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 02/01/2017 08:45 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803126797 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Paul Hill correcting [4493950-2] motion filed by Attorney. [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 01/30/2017 12:47 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803123943 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to seal Volume II of joint appendix, filed by Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Paul Hill w/service 01/23/2017. [4493950] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 01/25/2017 02:32 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 00803122974 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Paul Hill. w/service 01/23/2017 , Length: 8,646 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Paul Hill due 01/30/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs . Brief of Appellee Accounts Receivable Services, LLC due on 02/23/2017 [4493463] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 01/24/2017 04:07 PM]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803122966 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ADDENDUM of APPELLANT FILED by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill , w/service 01/23/2017 [4493461] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 01/24/2017 04:05 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803121888 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Addendum of APPELLANT submitted for review by Mr. Paul Hill [4492966] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 01/23/2017 07:27 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803121885 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPELLANT brief of Mr. Paul Hill submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. [4492965] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 01/23/2017 07:26 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803091409 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill - w/service 12/09/2016. [4478082] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 12/09/2016 12:03 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803091406 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Certificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill. No Transcript [4478081] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 12/09/2016 12:02 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803091399 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              APPEARANCE filed by Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Paul Hill w/service 12/09/2016 [4478079] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 12/09/2016 12:00 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803086395 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 01/11/2017. Appendix due 01/23/2017. BRIEF APPELLANT, Paul Hill due 01/23/2017 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. Appellant reply brief is due 14 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the appellee brief. [4475480] [16-4356] (JMM) [Entered: 12/02/2016 03:52 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803086391 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, order filed 10/31/16, judgment filed 11/01/16 and docket entries. [4475478] [16-4356] (JMM) [Entered: 12/02/2016 03:51 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803086388 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Civil case docketed. [4475477] [16-4356] (JMM) [Entered: 12/02/2016 03:47 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803164892 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      LETTER from Appellee Accounts Receivable Services, LLC regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 03/21/2017 [4514594] [16-4356] (MAK) [Entered: 03/21/2017 03:14 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803163173 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        LETTER from Appellant Mr. Paul Hill regarding availability for oral argument. w/service 03/20/2017 [4513705] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 03/20/2017 09:27 AM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803159973 Filed: 3/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          CORRECTED certificate of service for brief Reply brief, Doc No. [4510143-2], filed by Appellant Mr. Paul Hill [4512090] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 03/14/2017 04:42 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 00803156171 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            BRIEF FILED - APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF filed by Mr. Paul Hill. w/service 03/08/2017 , Length: 6,499 words 10 COPIES OF PAPER BRIEFS FROM Paul Hill due 03/13/2017 WITH certificate of service for paper briefs [4510143] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 03/08/2017 04:03 PM]
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803156004 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              REPLY brief of Mr. Paul Hill submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4510063] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 03/08/2017 03:00 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803155831 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Brief deficiency notice sent to counsel, Attorney Mr. Darren Brayer Schwiebert for Appellant Mr. Paul Hill. [4509973] [16-4356] (MER) [Entered: 03/08/2017 01:28 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00803155071 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  REPLY brief of Mr. Paul Hill submitted for review. The time for filing the subsequent brief (if any) does not begin to run until the brief has been approved and filed. To open/view this brief, you must first login to CM/ECF and then open the document link in your Notice of Docket Activity. [4509572] [16-4356] (DBS) [Entered: 03/07/2017 08:04 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?