Josefina Herrera v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 16-16891

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 6:25 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109446120 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera is GRANTED. [8064561-2] Appellants brief due on 04/27/2017. GBT
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109437199 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE to Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera in 16-16891 [8064561-2] filed by Attorney Alan Michael Pierce for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. (ECF: Alan Pierce)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109429960 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 04/27/2017 filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8064561-1]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109378348 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera is GRANTED. [8021707-2] Appellant's brief is due on 03/13/2017, with the appendix due no later than seven days from the filing of the brief. GBT
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109374942 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE to Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera in 16-16891 [8021707-2] filed by Attorney Alan Michael Pierce for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. (ECF: Alan Pierce)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109359042 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 03/13/2017 filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8021707-1]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109313749 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera.
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109306835 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER: Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera is GRANTED. [7981908-2] Appellant's brief is due on 01/27/2017, with the appendix due no later than seven days from the filing of the brief. GBT
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109298796 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE to Motion for extension to file appellant brief filed by Appellant Josefina Herrera in 16-16891 [7981908-2] filed by Attorney Alan Michael Pierce for Appellee Bank of America, N.A.. (ECF: Alan Pierce)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01109294504 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SECOND NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Josefina Herrera. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both.
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?