Sharon Rodrigues v. Unifund CCR, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 16-3307

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 5:20 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012641572 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT, Affirmed. Costs taxed against Appellant. (DW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012641555 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    NOT PRECEDENTIAL PER CURIAM OPINION Coram: RESTREPO, SCIRICA and FISHER, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 6. PS2-149. In defending her claims in state court, Rodrigues necessarily challenged the actions of the defendants in collecting the debt and procuring judgment as well as the validity of the debt. As a result, the District Court properly concluded that defendants were entitled to summary judgment on all claims, and we will affirm the judgment of the District Court (DW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012640136 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      SUBMITTED (Pro Se - 3rd Cir. LAR 34.1 (a)) on Thursday, June 01, 2017. Panel: RESTREPO, SCIRICA, FISHER, Circuit Judges. (PM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012627025 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CALENDARED for Thursday, 06/01/2017. (PM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012606170 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC PRO SE REPLY BRIEF with Addendum attached on behalf of Appellant Sharon R. Rodrigues, filed. Certificate of Service dated 04/26/2017 by ECF. (SRR)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012599750 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER (Clerk) granting Motion for extension of time filed by Appellant Sharon R. Rodrigues., filed. (SH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012595946 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: MOTION filed by Appellant Sharon R. Rodrigues for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief until/for 7 days. Certificate of Service dated 04/18/2017. Service made by ECF. (SRR)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012578657 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER (Clerk) Motion by Appellant for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Appellant may file a Reply Brief within 21 days of the date of this order. No further extensions shall be granted. (SH)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012575896 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: Motion filed by Appellant Sharon R. Rodrigues for Extension of Time to file Reply Brief to Appellees Opposition to Appeal until/for 21 days. Certificate of Service dated 03/27/2017. Service made by ECF. (SRR)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 11 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?