Cohen v. Ditech Financial LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 17-950

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 21, 2018 at 12:07 AM DT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
OPPOSITION TO ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, [107], on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 08/14/2018 by CM/ECF. [2367856] [17-950] [Entered: 08/14/2018 04:26 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    JUDGMENT MANDATE, ISSUED.[2365763] [17-950] [Entered: 08/13/2018 09:56 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      OPPOSITION TO ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, [103], on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 08/06/2018 by CM/ECF. [2360337] [17-950] [Entered: 08/06/2018 03:37 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CURED DEFECTIVE Itemized Bill of Costs [105], [107], on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED.[2359944] [17-950] [Entered: 08/06/2018 12:32 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 08/06/2018 by CM/ECF.[2359923] [17-950] [Entered: 08/06/2018 12:25 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Itemized Bill of Costs, [105], on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED.[2359885] [17-950]--[Edited 08/06/2018 by YL] [Entered: 08/06/2018 12:11 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 08/06/2018 by CM/ECF.[2359849] [17-950] [Entered: 08/06/2018 11:56 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ITEMIZED BILL OF COSTS, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 07/31/2018 by CM/ECF.[2355980] [17-950] [Entered: 07/31/2018 11:07 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  JUDGMENT, FILED.[2350412] [17-950] [Entered: 07/23/2018 11:38 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NEW CASE MANAGER, Yenni Liu, ASSIGNED.[2350129] [17-950] [Entered: 07/23/2018 09:26 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2330201] [17-950] [Entered: 06/21/2018 03:38 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NEW CASE MANAGER, Troy White, ASSIGNED.[2260462] [17-950] [Entered: 03/20/2018 09:28 AM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CASE, before RDS, RR, SLC, C.JJ., HEARD.[2137550] [17-950] [Entered: 10/02/2017 11:39 AM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 09/25/2017 by CM/ECF. [2132976] [17-950] [Entered: 09/25/2017 05:14 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER, dated 09/21/2017, GRANTING permission to bring electronics into the courtroom, FILED.[2130324] [17-950] [Entered: 09/21/2017 11:01 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 09/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2129812] [17-950] [Entered: 09/20/2017 04:13 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 09/20/2017 by CM/ECF. [2129726] [17-950] [Entered: 09/20/2017 03:36 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, FILED. Service date 09/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2127335] [17-950] [Entered: 09/18/2017 04:42 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      *REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2126913] [17-950] [Entered: 09/18/2017 01:52 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION ORDER, granting motion for oral argument [77] filed by Amicus Curiae Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, FILED. [2126109][81] [17-950] [Entered: 09/15/2017 04:12 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          LETTER, dated 09/15/2017 on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, requesting to bring personal electronics to courtroom, RECEIVED. Service date 09/15/2017 by CM/ECF.[2125531] [17-950]--[Edited 09/15/2017 by BM] [Entered: 09/15/2017 11:29 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 08/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102758] [17-950] [Entered: 08/17/2017 09:32 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102583] [17-950] [Entered: 08/16/2017 06:03 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 08/16/2017 by CM/ECF. [2102571] [17-950] [Entered: 08/16/2017 05:45 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2102330] [17-950] [Entered: 08/16/2017 02:46 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, RECEIVED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF.[2078428] [17-950] [Entered: 07/13/2017 03:41 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Martin Christopher Bryce, Jr., Esq. for Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2078033] [17-950] [Entered: 07/13/2017 11:56 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Daniel A. Edelman, Esq. for Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF. [2077805] [17-950] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:48 AM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 7/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 07/13/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2077796] [17-950] [Entered: 07/13/2017 10:46 AM]
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 07/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071891] [17-950] [Entered: 07/06/2017 11:27 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Henry Michael Mascia, Esq. for Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 07/06/2017 by CM/ECF. [2071794] [17-950] [Entered: 07/06/2017 10:51 AM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2069517] [17-950] [Entered: 06/29/2017 04:43 PM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 06/29/2017 by CM/ECF. [2069359] [17-950] [Entered: 06/29/2017 03:40 PM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 06/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2068394] [17-950] [Entered: 06/28/2017 04:06 PM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 06/28/2017 by CM/ECF. [2068147] [17-950] [Entered: 06/28/2017 02:12 PM]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Scheduling Notification, [43], on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED.[2052887] [17-950] [Entered: 06/07/2017 12:52 PM]
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, FILED. Service date 06/01/2017 by CM/ECF. [2048646] [17-950] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:28 PM]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, FILED. Service date 06/01/2017 by CM/ECF. [2048621] [17-950] [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:18 PM]
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-226), on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 05/25/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2043895] [17-950] [Entered: 05/25/2017 05:21 PM]
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 05/25/2017 by CM/ECF, US mail.[2043891] [17-950] [Entered: 05/25/2017 05:18 PM]
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 04/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2017705] [17-950] [Entered: 04/24/2017 11:30 AM]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief due date as 05/25/2017, appellee's brief due date as 06/29/2017,TRANSMITTED.[2015419] [17-950] [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:41 AM]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE, to Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C. , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2015415] [17-950] [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:37 AM]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2015407] [17-950] [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:33 AM]
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CAPTION, to correct Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, PC to Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., AMENDED.[2014202] [17-950] [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:43 AM]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014004] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:03 PM]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014000] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:02 PM]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013833] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:47 PM]
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF. [2013718] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:57 PM]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013088] [17-950] [Entered: 04/17/2017 05:22 PM]
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/17/2017 by CM/ECF. [2012430] [17-950] [Entered: 04/17/2017 11:41 AM]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/05/2017 by CM/ECF. [2005250] [17-950] [Entered: 04/05/2017 05:39 PM]
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2004815] [17-950] [Entered: 04/05/2017 01:18 PM]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/27/2017, RECEIVED.[2004814] [17-950] [Entered: 04/05/2017 01:18 PM]
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/24/2017, RECEIVED.[2004810] [17-950] [Entered: 04/05/2017 01:14 PM]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. [2004808] [17-950] [Entered: 04/05/2017 01:11 PM]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?