MacLean v. Great Bowery, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-11074
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 5:53 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alex S MacLean, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew D. Epstein +1 617 482 4900 +6 179 426 5251 photolaw@aol.com
v.
Gap, Inc. Gap, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Great Bowery, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wednesday Agency Group Limited, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 4 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Gap, Inc., Great Bowery, Inc., Wednesday Agency Group Limited. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPORT on the filing/termination of copyright case . (Epstein, Andrew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/12/2017) (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 06/12/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6667952 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Alex S MacLean. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copyright registration information, # 2 Exhibit License Agreement, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Case Category Form)(Epstein, Andrew) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/12/2017) (Pacho, Arnold). (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/12/2017) (Pacho, Arnold). Modified on 6/12/2017 (Pacho, Arnold). (Entered: 06/12/2017)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 64 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?