Cohen v. Ditech Financial LLC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 17-950

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 14, 2017 at 11:20 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., FILED. Service date 04/24/2017 by CM/ECF. [2017705] [17-950] [Entered: 04/24/2017 11:30 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant' brief due date as 05/25/2017, appellee's brief due date as 06/29/2017,TRANSMITTED.[2015419] [17-950] [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:41 AM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE, to Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C. , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2015415] [17-950] [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:37 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NEW CASE MANAGER, Brenda Mojica, ASSIGNED.[2015407] [17-950] [Entered: 04/20/2017 10:33 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          CAPTION, to correct Appellee Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, PC to Rosicki, Rosicki & Associates, P.C., AMENDED.[2014202] [17-950] [Entered: 04/19/2017 09:43 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014004] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:03 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Aaron Cohen, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2014000] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 05:02 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Ditech Financial LLC, FILED. Service date 04/18/2017 by CM/ECF.[2013833] [17-950] [Entered: 04/18/2017 03:47 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?