Lauri Gordon v. Bank of America NA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 17-2028

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 13, 2017 at 12:52 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012698626 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Connie Flores Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) Bank of America, N.A.. (CFJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012663104 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Leah N. Jacob on behalf of Appellee(s) Seterus, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association. (LNJ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012658426 Filed: 6/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Sean Marotta on behalf of Appellee(s) Seterus, Inc. and Federal National Mortgage Association. (SMM)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012646302 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012643388 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Bank of America NA, filed. (PNC)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012640910 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            FOLLOW UP LETTER to Phoebe N. Coddington, Esq. for Bank of America NA requesting the following document: Disclosure Statement on or before 06/16/2017. (DW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012633956 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Federal National Mortgage Association, filed. (CB)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 003012634331 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Lauri Gordon, received. (JWD)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012634336 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Lauri Gordon, filed. (JWD)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012626653 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Phoebe Norton Coddington on behalf of Appellee(s) Bank of America, N.A.. (PNC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012619621 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Lauri Gordon in District Court No. 2-16-cv-03093. (DW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 14 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?