Cameron Jefferson v. Select Portfolio Servicing
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1884

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 1:02 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Local Rule 45 mandate issued. Originating case number: 8:15-cv-02031-PWG. Mailed to: Cameron Jefferson 11509 Brigit Court Bowie, MD 20720. [16-1884] (ABW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER filed [999935481] dismissing appeal for failure to prosecute (Local Rule 45) Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Cameron Jefferson 11509 Brigit Court Bowie, MD 20720. [16-1884] (ABW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Cameron Jefferson re: failure to file informal brief (Loc.R. 34(b)). Mailed to: Cameron Jefferson 11509 Brigit Court Bowie, MD 20720. [16-1884] (ABW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Party Cameron Jefferson re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1). Mailed to: Cameron Jefferson 11509 Brigit Court Bowie, MD 20720. [16-1884] (ABW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999913093] [16-1884] Daniel Glass
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Daniel A. Glass for BWW Law Group, LLC and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc..[999913091] [16-1884] Daniel Glass
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee BWW Law Group, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999912641] [16-1884] Adam Kaplan
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Adam M. Kaplan for BWW Law Group, LLC.[999912636] [16-1884] Adam Kaplan
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Cameron Jefferson 11509 Brigit Court Bowie, MD 20720 Adam Marc Kaplan Sarah Jean Shyr. Informal Opening Brief due 08/29/2016 Informal response brief, if any: 17 days after informal opening brief filed. [16-1884] (ABW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 53 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?