Del Webb Communities, Inc. v. Roger Carlson
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-1347

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 1:13 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF by Appellees Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000089606] [17-1347] Alfred Rawl
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/26/2017. [1000069566] [17-1347] William Leath
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      BRIEF by Appellants Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/26/2017. [1000069555] [17-1347] William Leath
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[1000067785] [17-1347] Amanda Blundy
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee PulteGroup, Incorporated. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000053756] [17-1347] Alfred Rawl
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Del Webb Communities, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000053754] [17-1347] Alfred Rawl
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by A. Victor Rawl, Jr. for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[1000053751] [17-1347] Alfred Rawl
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Henry Wilkins Frampton, IV for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[1000053738] [17-1347] Henry Frampton
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert L. Widener for Del Webb Communities, Inc. and PulteGroup, Incorporated.[1000053715] [17-1347] Robert Widener
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000052542] [17-1347] William Leath
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson. [17-1347] William Leath
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael S. Seekings for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[1000052536] [17-1347] William Leath
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by W. Jefferson Leath, Jr. for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[1000052534] [17-1347] William Leath
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Phillip W. Segui, Jr. for Mary Jo Carlson and Roger F. Carlson.[1000052488] [17-1347] Phillip Segui
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/26/2017. Response Brief due 05/26/2017 [17-1347] (AW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-PMD.. [17-1347] (AW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 9:14-cv-01877-PMD. Case manager: AWalker. [17-1347] (AW)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?