Gonzalez v. D'Alonzo
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-03519

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2019 at 2:24 AM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Manuel Gonzalez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Roman Mikhail Avshalumov +1 718 263 9591 +1 718 263 9598 avshalumovr@yahoo.com
Space Helen F Dalton +1 718 263 9591 +1 718 263 9598 hfdalton6912@yahoo.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Daniel John Hansen +1 212 697 3701 +1 212 697 3701 danieljhansen@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by a2xlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Austin W Anderson +1 361 452 1279 +1 361 452 1284 austin@a2xlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Charlip Law Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , David H. Charlip +1 954 921 2131 +1 954 921 2191 dcharlip@charliplawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Community Lawyers Group, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Celetha Chatman +1 312 757 1880 cchatman@communitylawyersgroup.com
Space Michael Jacob Wood +1 312 757 1880 +1 312 265 3227 mwood@communitylawyersgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Creed & Gowdy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , BRYAN SCOTT GOWDY +1 904 350 0075 +1 904 350 0086 bgowdy@appellate-firm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Izquierdo-San Miguel Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jorge M. Izquierdo-San-Miguel +7877237 767 725 4599 +1 787 723 6964 jizquierdo@izquierdosanmiguel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Carrissa M Villalobos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carrissa M Villalobos +1 818 826 3777

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Craig R. Zobel, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Craig Randall Zobel +1 561 277 1819 +1 561 630 9666 czobel@zobellawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Sanchez, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Robert Sanchez,. +1 305 687 8008 +1 305 821 1056 court@bankruptcyclinic.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jodi Westbrook Flowers +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9450 jflowers@motleyrice.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTIC Robert Turner Haefele +1 843 216 9184 +1 843 216 9450 rhaefele@motleyrice.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Outten & Golden LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 03/14/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED Lauren B. McGlothlin +1 410 206 2432 +1 212 765 8954 lmcglothlin@outtengolden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by phippsandersondeacon.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Martin J. Phipps +1 210 340 9877 +1 210 340 9899 mphipps@phippsandersondeacon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pitta Bishop Del Giorno & Giblin LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , Vincent Michael Giblin +1 212 652 3797 +1 212 652 3891 vgiblin@pittagiblin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schlichter, Bogard & Denton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael A. Wolff +1 314 621 6115 mwolff@uselaws.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jonathan Robert Gdanski +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Scott P. Schlesinger +1 954 467 8800 scott@schlesingerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sulaiman Law Group, LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Scott Davidson +1 630 575 8188 jdavidson@sulaimanlaw.com
Space Orlando Velazquez +1 630 575 8181 +1 630 575 8188

Toggle Switch Represented by Woodley & McGillivary

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY T Sarah Michelle Block +1 202 833 8855 smb@wmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , , , , Molly Ann Elkin +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 mae@wmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , Molly Ann Elkin +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 mae@wmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , Gregory Keith McGillivary +1 202 833 8855 +1 202 452 1090 gkm@wmlaborlaw.com
, , , , , , DIANA JANE NOBILE +1 202 833 8855 djn@wmlaborlaw.com
v.
No Logo Dom's Lawnmaker, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lipman & Plesur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert D Lipman +1 516 931 0050 +1 516 931 0030 lipman@lipmanplesur.com
, , , David A. Robins +1 516 931 0050 robins@lipmanplesur.com
No Logo Dominick D'Alonzo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lipman & Plesur, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , Robert D Lipman +1 516 931 0050 +1 516 931 0030 lipman@lipmanplesur.com
, , , David A. Robins +1 516 931 0050 robins@lipmanplesur.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/16/2019, Entered: None Affidavit/Declaration in Opposition to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/16/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Adjourn Conference or Convert the Conference to a Telephone Conference by Manuel Gonzalez. (Dalton, Helen) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Proposed Scheduling Order by Dominick D'Alonzo, Dom's Lawnmaker, Inc. (Robins, David) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 10/17/2017 in Courtroom 820 before Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. See order and attachments. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 8/4/2017. (Attachments: # 1 SIL Individual Rules, # 2 Scheduling Order Worksheet) (Gandiosi, Kristin)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Gonzalez. Dom's Lawnmaker, Inc. served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Dalton, Helen)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Manuel Gonzalez. Dominick D'Alonzo served on 6/21/2017, answer due 7/12/2017. (Dalton, Helen)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE by Dominick D'Alonzo, Dom's Lawnmaker, Inc. re 5 Answer to Complaint Rule 7.1 Statement (Robins, David)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D. Lipman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Lipman, Robert)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Robins, David)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Robins on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Robins, David)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                            In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Corsini, Alexander)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Corsini, Alexander) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Manuel Gonzalez. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Corsini, Alexander) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Electronic ORDER granting in part and denying in part DE 12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The request to appear for the 10/17/2017 initial conference telephonically is denied. The initial conference is adjourned to 10/23/2017 at 10:30 a.m. in courtroom 820 of the Central Islip courthouse. Any request to adjourn the conference should be electronically filed as a letter motion and propose three alternative dates acceptable to all parties. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke on 10/17/2017. (Vissichelli, Eric)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?